FIX THE COURT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01620
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 17, 2019 at 1:37 PM EDT (5.9 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Fix The Court, Plaintiff

Represented by American Oversight

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Katherine Marie Anthony +1 202 897 3918 +1 202 871 6523 katherine.anthony@americanoversight.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Austin Ridgely Evers +1 202 869 5241 austin.evers@americanoversight.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Elizabeth France +1 202 869 5246 beth.france@americanoversight.org
v.
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED REBECCA M. KOPPLIN +1 202 514 3953 rebecca.m.kopplin@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Elizabeth J. Shapiro +1 202 514 5302 +1 202 616 8470 Elizabeth.Shapiro@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Danielle Wolfson Young +1 202 616 2035 +1 202 616 8470 danielle.young2@usdoj.gov
Attributes
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Timeline
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Young, Danielle)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Change of Address by Rebecca Michelle Kopplin (Kopplin, Rebecca)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Young, Danielle)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: 9/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Change of Address by Danielle Wolfson Young (Young, Danielle)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 Answer
ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Young, Danielle)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 Notice of withdrawal of motion
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by FIX THE COURT re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (France, Elizabeth)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER. Defendant shall comply with the processing and production schedule set forth in this Order. The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report not later than OCTOBER 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 24, 2018. (lcckk1)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 Status report
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Shapiro, Elizabeth)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 Status report
First STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Young, Danielle)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Michelle Kopplin on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kopplin, Rebecca)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Ridgely Evers on behalf of FIX THE COURT (Evers, Austin) (Main Document 11 replaced on 7/17/2018) (ztd).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Notice - Other
NOTICE of Declaration in Further Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Katherine M. Anthony by FIX THE COURT (France, Elizabeth)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/12/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/11/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/16/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/16/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(France, Elizabeth)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katherine M. Anthony, :Firm- American Oversight, :Address- 1030 15th St NW, B-255, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 2028973918. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5589254. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FIX THE COURT (France, Elizabeth)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Shapiro on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Shapiro, Elizabeth)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Wolfson Young on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Young, Danielle)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018 Preliminary Injunction
WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 7/24/2018..... MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by FIX THE COURT (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A to Roth Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Roth Declaration)(France, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/7/2018 (znmw).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 07/11/2018. (DM)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FIX THE COURT (France, Elizabeth)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 Complaint
COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5578844) filed by FIX THE COURT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(France, Elizabeth)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, which indicates that Defendant completed its processing and productions and that "the parties are working on resolving the matter without judicial involvement." Accordingly, the Court adopts the parties' proposal that they file a further Joint Status Report by NOVEMBER 30, 2018, indicating the status of their efforts to conclude proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 9, 2018. (lcckk1)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2018, indicating the status of their efforts to conclude proceedings in this case. (dot)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/1/2018. (dot)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall confer and submit a Joint Status Report by JULY 24, 2018, at 5:00 PM, with their joint proposed plan for review and release of the documents at issue. (dot)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE ORDER: The Court held a teleconference on the record with the parties on July 17, 2018, regarding Plaintiff's 5 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. The parties agreed that the Government's current process of assembling documents potentially responsive to the FOIA request at issue and indicating the rate at which it can process those documents should obviate the need for further briefing of Plaintiff's 5 Motion. With the parties' consent, the Court sets the following expedited deadlines for Defendant's response to the merits of Plaintiff's FOIA case. Defendant shall file a Status Report identifying the number of potentially responsive documents at issue by JULY 23, 2018, at 5:00 PM. Defendant shall provide Plaintiff with further information regarding Defendant's anticipated rate of processing, proposed schedule for production, any intention of interagency consultation, and any expected claims of exemptions by JULY 24, 2018, at 12:00 PM. The parties shall confer and submit a Joint Status Report by JULY 24, 2018, at 5:00 PM, with their joint proposed plan for review and release of the documents at issue. The Court shall HOLD IN ABEYANCE Plaintiff's 5 Motion pending further order of the Court.The Court also notes that at least one counsel for each party that appeared in the teleconference on July 17, 2018, had not previously entered an appearance in this case. The Court instructs each such counsel to enter an appearance on the docket.Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 17, 2018. (lcckk1)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Telephone Conference held on 7/17/2018. (Court Reporter Lisa Edwards.) (dot)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference on the record set for 7/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's 5 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. The Court has arranged a teleconference on the record with the parties on JULY 17, 2018, at 10:00 AM, to discuss the status of the FOIA request at issue and to identify a briefing schedule for Plaintiff's 5 motion. The Court requests that the parties call Chambers, preferably via the same telephone line.The Court also has received Plaintiff's 8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, with respect to Katherine M. Anthony. Plaintiff's 8 motion is GRANTED CONTINGENT upon Ms. Anthony's submission of a declaration by JULY 23, 2018, stating that she has reviewed and is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court.Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 16, 2018. (lcckk1)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zjd)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 13 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?