DiMasi v. G.M.A.C Mortgage Co.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-01130

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2020 at 6:41 PM ST (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jodi B. Rappaport, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jodi B. Rappaport

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jodi B. Rappaport +1 203 247 6226
No Logo Vincent P. DiMasi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Vincent P. DiMasi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent P. DiMasi +1 203 247 6226
v.
No Logo Blue Water Investment Trust, Defendant
No Logo Christiana Trust, Defendant
No Logo Fay Servicing, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sassoon & Cymrot LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Arthur Fredericks +1 617 720 0099 +1 617 720 0366 AFredericks@SassoonCymrot.com
No Logo G.M.A.C Mortgage Co., Defendant
No Logo Greentree Servicing LLC., Defendant
No Logo Ocwen Servicing LLC., Defendant
No Logo Selene Finance LP., Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Objection
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Vacate
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Good Standing
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Good Standing
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Order Returning Submission
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER denying 39 Motion for TRO and denying 23 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Both motions are denied for the reasons set forth in the attached document. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/12/18. (Dooley, Kari)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Electronic Filing Order (Self-Rep)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Default Entry 55(a)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Consent to Electronic Notice
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Substitute Party
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None waiver of service executed
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None waiver of service executed
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/29/2018. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 07/29/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 extension of time
                                                                                                          First MOTION for Extension of Time until August 20, 2018 to plead, move or otherwise respond to Complaint by Fay Servicing, LLC. (Fredericks, Aaron)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Arthur Fredericks on behalf of Fay Servicing, LLC and Certificate of Service (Fredericks, Aaron)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Blue Water Investment Trust, Christiana Trust, Fay Servicing, LLC, G.M.A.C Mortgage Co., Greentree Servicing LLC., Ocwen Servicing LLC., Selene Finance LP.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Vincent P. DiMasi* *1 Charcoal Hill* *Westport, CT 06880* (Fazekas, J.)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 Electronic Service Documents
                                                                                                                NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 4 Electronic Filing Order, 1 Complaint filed by Jodi B. Rappaport, Vincent P. DiMasi, 2 MOTION for Injunction filed by Jodi B. Rappaport, Vincent P. DiMasi, 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 7/10/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/9/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Electronic Filing Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Electronic Filing OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/9/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Pretrial Deadlines
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Pretrial Deadlines
                                                                                                                            Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 10/9/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 9/7/2018. Discovery due by 1/8/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 2/7/2019. Signed by Clerk on 7/9/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Injunction by Vincent P. DiMasi, Jodi B. Rappaport.Responses due by 7/30/2018 (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Blue Water Investment Trust, Christiana Trust, Fay Servicing, LLC, G.M.A.C Mortgage Co., Greentree Servicing LLC., Ocwen Servicing LLC., Selene Finance LP., filed by Jodi B. Rappaport, Vincent P. DiMasi.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?