Husain v. Interactive Brokers, LLC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-02387

Tags
Last Updated February 25, 2019 at 1:14 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Interactive Brokers LLC, Respondent
No Logo Huzaifa Husain, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by eslawpartners.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murtaza Fakhruddin Sutarwalla +1 832 716 7008 +1 713 583 8715 murtaza@eslawpartners.com
Citation Section 09 U.S.C. § 1
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None stipulation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of Resetting (FORM, noticing) - Civil
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and Order re Motions - FORM - Judge Gilmore
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None response
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Letter of Agreement
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Service
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Letter of Agreement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Designation of Attorney in Charge
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                        MOTION for Arthur C. Koski to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Huzaifa Husain, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/3/2018. (Sutarwalla, Murtaza)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 Summons - Request for Issuance
                          Request for Issuance of Summons as to Interactive Brokers LLC, filed.(Sutarwalla, Murtaza)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 Order for Initial Conference - FORMCourt Filing
                            ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/9/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT against Huzaifa Husain (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20445003) filed by Huzaifa Husain. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Sutarwalla, Murtaza)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Summons Issued as to Interactive Brokers LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(sanderson, 4)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Space Space

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?