Hinojosa Maldonado v. Limon
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00114

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 19, 2020 at 12:27 PM DT (7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jose Julian Hinojosa Maldonado, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jaime M Diez +1 956 544 3565 +1 956 550 0006 jaimemdiez@aol.com
v.
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mike Pompeo"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nancy Lynn Masso +1 956 548 2554 +1 956 548 2549 nancy.masso@usdoj.gov
No Logo Norma Limon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nancy Lynn Masso +1 956 548 2554 +1 956 548 2549 nancy.masso@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nancy Lynn Masso +1 956 548 2554 +1 956 548 2549 nancy.masso@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None Stay
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Modify
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: None Modify
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None Reopen
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Modify
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Modify
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None Other Notice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: None Protective Order (FORM)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Entry Of Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/27/2018, Entered: None Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 Certificate of Interested Parties
                                          CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Norma Limon, Mike Pompeo, United States of America, filed.(Masso, Nancy)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Order for Initial Conference - FORMCourt Filing
                                            ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/2/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018 SEALED Exhibits
                                              Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20473888) filed by Jose Julian Hinojosa Maldonado.(Diez, Jaime)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?