EUROPEAN ADOPTION CONSULTANTS, INC. v. POMPEO
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01676

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 28, 2020 at 4:04 PM DT (11.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo EUROPEAN ADOPTION CONSULTANTS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sale & Quinn PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D. Quinn +1 202 872 4713 +1 202 887 5137 quinn.j@salequinn.com
v.
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO"
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 0706
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None sealed reply
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None sealed reply
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Seal Case
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/21/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Sealed document
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None SEALED Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018 Complaint
                                                                              COMPLAINT against MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5590345) filed by EUROPEAN ADOPTION CONSULTANTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Quinn, John)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?