Gifford v. Ritch
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:93-cv-02464-FNS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Burton Gifford, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evans W North +1 301 421 1680 +1 301 421 1680
v.
No Logo Stacey Marie Ritch, Defendant

Represented by hardlaw.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George C Davis +1 410 727 0828 +1 410 727 5893 george@hardlaw.net
No Logo Margaret Seagears, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evans W North +1 301 421 1680 +1 301 421 1680
Office Baltimore
Filed 8/24/1993
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Jury Verdict
County 88888
Terminated 8/25/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, LEAD
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 34 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: 5/20/1996 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, said judgment has been fully paid to the plaintiff and APPROVAL J. SMALKIN dated 5/17/96. (cc Judgment Box) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 33 Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: 10/19/1995 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER dated 10/19/95 denying [31-1] motion for new trial ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: 10/19/1995 Add and Terminate Judges
      CASE NO LONGER REFERRED TO Magistrate Judge Catherine C. Blake (slf, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 32 Filed: 9/15/1995, Entered: 9/18/1995 Response in Opposition
        RESPONSE by Stacey Marie Ritch in 1:93-cv-02464 in opposition to [31-1] motion for new trial (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 31 Filed: 9/5/1995, Entered: 9/5/1995, Terminated: 10/19/1995 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
          MOTION by Burton Gifford for new trial (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 30 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Judgment*Court Filing
            JUDGMENT ORDER "ENTERED" in favor of the plaintiff Burton Gifford against the defendant Stacey Marie Ritch in the total amount of Eleven Thousand Three Hundred Twenty-Seven Dollars and Nineteen Cents ($11,327.19) ($7,525.19 for past lost wages; $2,402.00 for past medical expenses; and $1,400.00 for Non-Economic damages(pain and suffering) ( signed by Judge Catherine Blake ) dated Aug. 25, 1995 (c/m, jb and MICROFILMED 8/25/95 bbe) (rank, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Terminated Case
              Case closed (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 29 Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Remark
                Special Verdict Form (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 28 Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Exhibit
                  Exhibit list by Stacey Marie Ritch in 1:93-cv-02464, Burton Gifford in 1:93-cv-02464 (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 27 Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                    Certification re: exhibits submitted to Jury and APPROVAL ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake ) dated Aug. 18, 1995 (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Special Verdict Form
                      JURY VERDICT in favor of plaintiff, Burton Gifford against the defendant. (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Remark
                        Jury Panel returned to the bar of the Court. (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Remark
                          Special Verdict form submitted to the Jury (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Remark
                            Court Security Officer Sworn: Sharon Poole (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Remark
                              Court's Charge to the Jury (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Remark
                                Closing Arguments of Counsel (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Jury Trial Held
                                  JURY TRIAL - Day Three held before Blake, J. (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/17/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Remark
                                    Case Not concluded to continue Friday, Agusut 18, 1995 (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/17/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Jury Trial Held
                                      JURY TRIAL - Day Two held before , Blake, J. (Reporter: (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 8/18/1995 Jury Impaneled
                                        Jury sworn and empaneled before Blake, USDJ . Court's Preliminary Instruction to the Jurors. Opening Statement of Counsel. (Rep: Richardson) (jas, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/18/1995
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 8/18/1995 Description not available
                                          Jurors Sworn and Examined on Voir Dire. (Rep: Richardson) (jas, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 8/18/1995 Jury Trial Held
                                            JURY TRIAL - Day One held before Blake, J. (Rep: Richardson) (jas, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 26 Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995, Terminated: 8/25/1995 Response in Opposition
                                              RESPONSE by Stacey Marie Ritch in opposition to [23-1] motion in Limine (c/s Mag. J. Blake) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 25 Filed: 7/31/1995, Entered: 8/1/1995 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER dated 7/31/95. (3-day jury trial beginning Aug 16, 1995 at 10:00 a.m. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine C. Blake ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 7/27/1995, Entered: 7/28/1995 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  MOTION by Burton Gifford to include exhibits in Dr. Young's De Bene Esse Deposition (c/s Mag. J. Blake) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 7/27/1995, Entered: 7/28/1995 Motion in Limine
                                                    MOTION with memorandum in support by Burton Gifford in Limine (c/s Mag. Blake) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 7/20/1995, Entered: 7/20/1995, Terminated: 7/20/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER dated 7/20/95 granting [22-1] joint motion to Extend Time for filing pretrial Order is extended to July 27, 1995. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine C. Blake ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 7/20/1995, Entered: 7/20/1995, Terminated: 7/20/1995 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                        JOINT MOTION by Stacey Marie Ritch , Burton Gifford , Margaret Seagears to Extend Time for filing pretrial Order (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 5/26/1995, Entered: 5/26/1995 Status Report
                                                          STATUS REPORT by Burton Gifford (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 4/11/1995, Entered: 4/11/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            Letter ORDER dated 4/11/95, informing parties the trial has been scheduled for Wednesday, August 16, 1995 at 10:00 a.m. The pretrial conference has been scheduled for Monday July 31, 1995 at 4:30 p.m. as therein set forth. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine C. Blake ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/7/1995, Entered: 4/7/1995 Telephone Conference
                                                              Tele-conference held before U.S.M.J. Blake on 4/7/95. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 4/4/1995, Entered: 4/4/1995 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                CONSENT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Catherine C. Blake for all proceedings and the entry of judgment. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m HG) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 3/6/1995, Entered: 3/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  Letter ORDER dated 3/6/95 informing counsel after all parties sign the consent form it should be returned to chambers and I will refer the case to a magistrate judge for pretrial and trial.( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 3/6/1995, Entered: 3/6/1995 Status Report
                                                                    STATUS REPORT by Stacey Marie Ritch Burton Gifford , Margaret Seagears (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 9/21/1994, Entered: 9/21/1994 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                      (copy, original in S 93-2465) STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice as to Civil Action S 93-2465 ONLY and APPROVAL J. SMALKIN DATED 9/21/94. (c/m Chambers) (microfilmed 9/21/94) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 8/11/1994, Entered: 8/11/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        Letter ORDER dated 8/11/94 advising attorneys a settlement conference has been scheduled for 8/26/94 at 10:00 a.m. as therein set forth. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Klein Jr. ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 7/29/1994, Entered: 7/29/1994 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER dated 7/25/94 REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Klein Jr. for Settlement Conference. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (JH) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 6/27/1994, Entered: 6/27/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            Letter ORDER dated 6/27/94, informing parties I should like a report from counsel by July 29, 1994 regarding status. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 6/23/1994, Entered: 6/24/1994 Status Report
                                                                              STATUS REPORT by Burton Gifford in 1:93-cv-02464 (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 2/24/1994, Entered: 2/24/1994 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER dated 2/24/94 ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 2/4/1994, Entered: 2/4/1994 Affidavit
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Evans W. North. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 2/3/1994, Entered: 2/4/1994 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                    ANSWER by Stacey Marie Ritch (Attorney George C. Davis) to amended complaint (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 1/27/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994 Remark
                                                                                      Status request letter mailed to parties. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 10/25/1993, Entered: 10/28/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER dated 10/22/93 "granting" [6-1] motion of defendant to Consolidate Cases 93-2464 with 93-2465 for purpose of both discovery and trial. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 10/25/1993, Entered: 10/28/1993, Terminated: 10/25/1993 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                          MOTION by Stacey Marie Ritch to Consolidate Cases 93-2464 with 93-2465 (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/25/1993, Entered: 10/28/1993 Create Case Association
                                                                                            Consolidated Lead Case (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 9/7/1993, Entered: 9/7/1993 Local Rule
                                                                                              Local Rule 103.3 of plaintiff. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 9/7/1993, Entered: 9/7/1993 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT by Burton Gifford , (Answer due 9/17/93 for Stacey Marie Ritch ) amending [1-1] complaint (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/24/1993, Entered: 8/24/1993 Local Rule
                                                                                                  Local Rule 103 of plaintiff. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 8/24/1993, Entered: 8/24/1993 Summons Issued
                                                                                                    SUMMONS(ES) issued for Stacey Marie Ritch (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 8/24/1993, Entered: 8/24/1993 Jury Demand
                                                                                                      DEMAND for jury trial by Burton Gifford (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 8/24/1993, Entered: 8/24/1993 Complaint
                                                                                                        COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 015539 (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 28 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?