Seagears v. Ritch
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:93-cv-02465-FNS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Margaret Seagears, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evans W North +1 301 421 1680 +1 301 421 1680
v.
No Logo Stacey Marie Ritch, Defendant

Represented by hardlaw.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George C Davis +1 410 727 0828 +1 410 727 5893 george@hardlaw.net
Office Baltimore
Filed 8/24/1993
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $100000
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County 88888
Terminated 9/21/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: 10/19/1995 Add and Terminate Judges
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED TO Magistrate Judge Catherine C. Blake (slf, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 9/21/1994, Entered: 9/21/1994 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice as to S 93-2465 and APPROVAL J. SMALKIN DATED 9/21/94. (c/m Chambers) (microfilmed 9/21/94) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/21/1994, Entered: 9/21/1994 Terminated Case
      Case closed (slf, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 10/25/1993, Entered: 10/28/1993 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER (copy) dated 10/22/93 "granting" [7-1] motion of defendant to Consolidate Cases 93-2464 with 93-2465 for purpose of both discovery and trial. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m chambers) (For oriignal see Case No. 2464) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 10/25/1993, Entered: 10/28/1993, Terminated: 10/25/1993 Motion to Consolidate Cases
          MOTION (copy) by Stacey Marie Ritch to Consolidate Cases 93-2464 with 93-2465 (c/s) (For original see Case No. 2464) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/25/1993, Entered: 10/28/1993 Create Case Association
            Consolidated Member Case. Lead Case Number: cv 93 -2464 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 10/25/1993, Entered: 10/28/1993 Remark
              FOR ALL SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS SEE CIVIL CASE NO. 93-2464 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 10/15/1993, Entered: 10/15/1993, Terminated: 9/21/1994 Answer to Amended Complaint
                ANSWER by Stacey Marie Ritch (Attorney George C. Davis) to amended complaint (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 9/7/1993, Entered: 9/7/1993 Local Rule
                  Local Rule 103.3 of plaintiff. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 9/7/1993, Entered: 9/7/1993 Amended Complaint
                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by Margaret Seagears , (Answer due 9/17/93 for Stacey Marie Ritch ) amending [1-1] complaint (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 8/24/1993, Entered: 8/24/1993 Local Rule
                      Local Rule 103 of Plaintiff. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 2 Filed: 8/24/1993, Entered: 8/24/1993 Summons Issued
                        SUMMONS(ES) issued for Stacey Marie Ritch (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 8/24/1993, Entered: 8/24/1993 Jury Demand
                          DEMAND for jury trial by Margaret Seagears (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 8/24/1993, Entered: 8/24/1993 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 015539 (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 17 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?