Democratic National Committee v. The Russian Federation
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-03501-JGK
District Judge John G. Koeltl, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 3, 2019 at 6:09 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Democratic National Committee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alison Deich +1 202 408 4600 adeich@cohenmilstein.com
Space Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 meisenkraft@cohenmilstein.com
Space Geoffrey Aaron Graber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ggraber@cohenmilstein.com
Space Julia Horwitz +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jhorwitz@cohenmilstein.com
Space Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
v.
No Logo Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Defendant
No Logo Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A Carvin +1 202 879 7643 +1 202 626 1700 macarvin@jonesday.com
Space William D Coglianese +1 202 879 3710 wcoglianese@jonesday.com
Space James Matthew Gross +1 212 326 3733 +1 212 755 7306 jgross@jonesday.com
No Logo Trump, Donald J. Jr., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump, Jr."
No Logo Emin Araz Agalarov, Defendant
No Logo General Staff of the Armed Forces of the Russian Federation ("GRU"), Defendant
No Logo George Papadopoulos, Defendant
No Logo GRU Operative Using the Pseudonym "Guccifer2.0", Defendant
Kushner, Jared C. Kushner, Jared C., Defendant
Officially listed as "Jared C. Kushner"

Toggle Switch Represented by Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Abbe David Lowell +1 202 974 5605 +1 202 974 6705 ad.lowell@nortonrosefulbright.com
No Logo John Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Mifsud, Defendant
Assange, Julian Assange, Julian, Defendant
Officially listed as "Julian Assange"
Manafort, Paul J., Jr. Manafort, Paul J., Jr., Defendant
Officially listed as "Paul J. Manafort, Jr."
No Logo Richard W. Gates, III, Defendant
Stone, Roger J. Stone, Roger J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Roger J. Stone, Jr."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert C Buschel +1 954 530 5301 +1 954 320 6932 buschel@bglaw-pa.com
No Logo The Russian Federation, Defendant
No Logo WikiLeaks, Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 4/20/2018
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1964 Civil Remedies
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (292) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None Transcript
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 264 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: None Letter
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 262 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 261 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 260 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Oral Argument
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 259 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 258 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Letter
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 257 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 256 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Sanctions
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 254 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Oral Argument
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 252 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Oral Argument
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 251 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 250 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 249 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 248 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document 246 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 244 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 243 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 242 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 241 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 239 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None File Amicus Brief
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document 237 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 235 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 234 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 233 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 232 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 231 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 230 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 229 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 228 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 226 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 225 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 224 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 223 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 222 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 221 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 220 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 217 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 214 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 213 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 212 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 211 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 210 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 208 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 207 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 206 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 204 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 202 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 201 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 200 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 199 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 198 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 197 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 194 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 193 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 191 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 189 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 188 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 187 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 186 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 185 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/13/2018 before Judge John G. Koeltl. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 183 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Lewis Dratel on behalf of WikiLeaks. (Dratel, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 182 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 6 Complaint, against Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov, Julian Assange, Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Richard W. Gates, III, General Staff of the Armed Forces of the Russian Federation ("GRU"), Jared C. Kushner, Paul J. Manafort, Jr, Joseph Mifsud, George Papadopoulos, Roger J. Stone, Jr, The Russian Federation, Donald J. Trump, Jr, WikiLeaks with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Democratic National Committee. Related document: 6 Complaint,.(Eisenkraft, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: If Plaintiff intends to file a Second Amended Complaint, the following schedule shall apply: Plaintiff shall file a Notice of intent to Amend by January 7, 2019. Plaintiff shall file the Second Amended Complaint by January 17, 2019. Defendants shall file their motions to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint by March 4, 2019. Plaintiff shall file oppositions to Defendants' motions to dismiss by April 18, 2019. Defendants shall file their replies, if any, to Plaintiffs' oppositions by June 3, 2019. Defendants Aras Agalarov and Emin Agalarov may file a 25 page opening brief and a 15 page reply brief; The plaintiff may file a 25 page in opposition. Defendant Donald Trump, Jr. may file a 25 page opening brief and a 15 page reply brief; The plaintiff may file a 25 page brief in opposition and page limits. The parties proposed briefing schedule is granted. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 10/3/2018, Motions due by 12/7/2018, Responses due by 2/11/2019, Replies due by 3/29/2019.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/1/2018) (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 180 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018 Proposed Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Horwitz, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 179 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Michael Paul Jones on behalf of Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov. New Address: Herbert Smith Freehills New York LLP, 450 Lexington Avenue, New York, NY, USA 10017, 917-542-7600. (Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: 9/18/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 97 Motion for Alison Sarah Deich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/18/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 177 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: As discussed at the hearing today, the parties should file a proposed scheduling order by September 28, 2018. The plaintiff should file an Amended Complaint by October 12, 2018. ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/12/2018.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/13/2018) (mro) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 169 Motion for Christopher D. Man to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/11/2018) (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 175 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Christopher Cross on behalf of Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov. (Cross, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 174 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: 9/11/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pamela Kathleen Terry on behalf of Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov. (Terry, Pamela)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 173 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: 9/11/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Paul Jones on behalf of Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov. (Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 172 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: 9/11/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Sonny Balber on behalf of Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov. (Balber, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: 9/11/2018 Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Personal Electronic Device Application addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Grant J. Smith dated September 11, 2018. Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Request for Electronic Device)(Smith, Grant) Modified on 9/20/2018 (db).
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 170 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Norman Lavigne on behalf of George Papadopoulos. (Lavigne, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Christopher D. Man to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15548135. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jared C. Kushner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: DC Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit B: MO Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Man, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 168 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT. Status Conference Statement Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Sellers, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 167 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Horwitz, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric M. Creizman on behalf of George Papadopoulos. (Creizman, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 160 Motion for Grant J Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HERE BY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/4/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: 7/19/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Declaration of Joseph M. Sellers, # (2) Exhibit B - Declaration of Julia Horwitz, # (3) Exhibit C - Affidavit of Due Diligence for Defendant Kushner, # (4) Exhibit D - Affidavit of Due Diligence for Defendant Aras Agalarov)(Sellers, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Order on Motion for conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 162 Letter Motion for Conference. The 9/13/18 conference can be used as a pre-motion conference for the plaintiff's application to file an amended complaint. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/3/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: 7/19/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE [138] Motion for William D. Coglianese to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules Governing discipline of a attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/18/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 163 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 161 Motion for Mary Ellen Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick Part I on 8/31/2018) (ne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: 7/19/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abbe David Lowell on behalf of Jared C. Kushner. (Lowell, Abbe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 162 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION for Conference (pre-motion conference) addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Joseph M. Sellers dated August 31, 2018. Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Sellers, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE [139] Motion for Michael A. Carvin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules Governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/17/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Mary Ellen Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15515789. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mary Ellen Powers, # 2 Exhibit to Affidavit of Mary Ellen Powers, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Powers, Mary Ellen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 143 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re: [141] MOTION to Serve Defendant Jared Kuschner by First Class Mail. filed by Democratic National Committee. The motion to serve Kushner by first class mail is therefore denied without prejudice to renewal. The Clerk is directed to close the motion at docket number 141. The Court also notes that service of process is intended to provide notice of a lawsuit to a defendant so that the issues of the case can be joined and the lawsuit decided on its merit or lack of merit. Service is not intended to be a game for the serving party or the party to be served. The Court is confident that the DNC's counsel can contact Kushner's counsel and arrange a mutually convenient means to effectuate service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/17/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Grant J. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15514700. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit certificate of good standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Grant)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 142 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Julia Horwitz in Support re: [141] MOTION to Serve Defendant Jared Kuschner by First Class Mail.. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 159 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Caroline Johnston Polisi on behalf of George Papadopoulos. New Address: Pierce Bainbridge Beck Price & Hecht LLP, 20 West 23rd Street, 5th Fl., New York, NY, USA 10010, (213) 262-9333. (Polisi, Caroline)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018, Terminated: 7/17/2018 Motion to Serve
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Serve Defendant Jared Kuschner by First Class Mail. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit of Due Diligence, # (2) Exhibit Affidavit of Due Diligence, # (3) Exhibit USPS Tracking, # (4) Exhibit Affidavit of Due Diligence)(Sellers, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 158 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caroline Johnston Polisi on behalf of George Papadopoulos. (Polisi, Caroline)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Order on Motion to ServeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting [137] Motion to Serve Defendant Paul J. Manafort, Jr. by First Class Mail and Email to His Criminal Attorneys. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/17/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Declaration (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Julia A. Horwitz of service of process. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certification, # 2 Exhibit B - Witness statement, # 3 Exhibit C - Prefatory materials)(Horwitz, Julia) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018, Terminated: 7/18/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Michael A. Carvin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15333043. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Michael A. Carvin, # (2) Exhibit to Affidavit of Michael A. Carvin, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Carvin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to ServeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting 149 Motion to Serve Wikileaks by Twitter and Mail on 148 NOTICE of Motion, filed by Democratic National Committee. ENDORSEMENT: The motion is granted. The Clerk is directed to close Docket No. 149. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/6/18) (yv) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018, Terminated: 7/19/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for William D. Coglianese to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15332481. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of William D. Coglianese, # (2) Exhibit to Affidavit of William D. Coglianese, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Coglianese, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to ServeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting 151 Motion to Serve Aras Agalarov by Alternate Means. ENDORSEMENT: The motion is granted. The Clerk is directed to close Docket No. 151. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/6/18) (yv) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [139] MOTION for Michael A. Carvin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15333043. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [138] MOTION for William D. Coglianese to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15332481. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 154 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion re: 151 MOTION to Serve Defendant Aras Agalarov by Alternate Means.. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018, Terminated: 7/17/2018 Motion to Serve
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Serve Defendant Paul J. Manafort, Jr. by First Class Mail and Email to His Criminal Attorneys. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Eisenkraft, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Julia A. Horwitz in Support re: 151 MOTION to Serve Defendant Aras Agalarov by Alternate Means.. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sellers, Joseph) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 136 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting [134] Motion for Robert Craig Buschel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/10/2018) (ama)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Geoffrey Graber in Support re: 151 MOTION to Serve Defendant Aras Agalarov by Alternate Means.. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 135 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Inga Madzule. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Serve
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Serve Defendant Aras Agalarov by Alternate Means. Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Sellers, Joseph) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018, Terminated: 7/10/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Robert Craig Buschel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15294751. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit good standing Florida, # (3) Exhibit good standing California, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Buschel, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Julia Horwitz in Support re: 149 MOTION to Serve Defendant Wikileaks by Twitter and Mail.. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Sellers, Joseph) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [134] MOTION for Robert Craig Buschel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15294751. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Serve
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Serve Defendant Wikileaks by Twitter and Mail. Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Sellers, Joseph) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was made by Mail (Fed Ex). Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Fed Ex Tracking Proof)(Sellers, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 148 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 132 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to return any filings sent to the Court in this case by Mr. Farrell without docketing them. Mr. Farrell may bring any other case consistent with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/6/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 130 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/27/2018 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATION & NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (LOCAL RULE 7.1-1). Document filed by Patrick Farrell. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 129 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Emin Araz Agalarov served on 6/13/2018, answer due 7/5/2018. Service was accepted by Inga Madzule - Live In Nanny. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice Regarding Deleted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [130] Letter. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (sc) Modified on 6/25/2018 (sc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice Regarding Deleted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [129] Letter. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 127 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Mr. Christenson is free to bring any civil actions for relief in the Court by bringing new actions that seek proper relief. He may not, however, continue to attempt to file papers in this action, in which he is not a party and has been denied intervention. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/21/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 126 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David Christenson, dated 6/13/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED AND CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) - AMICUS (TWENTY-NINE). (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 128 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, dated 6/14/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS (THIRTY). (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 125 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, dated 6/13/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) - OBJECTION & MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/20/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David Christenson,dated 6/13/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS (TWENTY-EIGHT). (sc) Modified on 7/19/2018 (sc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/20/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David Christenson, dated 6/11/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) / AMICUS(TWENTY-FOUR). (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/19/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David Christenson, dated 6/12/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED AND CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) - AMICUS(TWENTY-SEVEN). (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Order on Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting [108] Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting [110] Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting [111] Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. ENDORSEMENT: 1. Conference adjourned to 9/13/2018 at 04:30 P.M. 2. Time for all defendants to respond to the complaint extended to a time to be set at the 9/13/18 conference. So Ordered. (Initial Conference set for 9/13/2018 at 04:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/15/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 120 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David Christenson, dated 6/11/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED AND CORRPUT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) - AMICUS(TWENTY-SIX). (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 118 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David Christenson dated 6/11/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCD & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) -AMICUS(TWENTY-FIVE)FIRST RESPONDERS & SUICIDES. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Affidavit of Service OtherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, ECF Filing Rules & Instructions, Individual Practices of Judge John G. Koeltl served on Richard W. Gates III on 06/11/2018. Service was accepted by Brooke Gates, Wife of Richard W. Gates, III. Service was made by In Person. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 111 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Suspend Deadline for Responding to the Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Robert Buschel dated June 14, 2018. Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr.(Buschel, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 119 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, dated 6/8/18 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that he has a right to file a Motion for Reconsideration; that the Court may not grant the motion, but it must be considered; and that he is waiting for the appropriate time to file. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 116 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER from David A. Christenson, dated 6/6/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) / AMICUS(NINETEEN). (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 113 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, dated 6/6/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) - AMICUS(TWENTY-TWO). (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 110 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Suspend Deadline for Responding to the Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Defendant Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. dated June 13, 2018. Document filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc..(Gross, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Matthew Gross on behalf of Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. (Gross, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 115 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David Christenson dated 6/8/18 re: RACKETEER INFUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS(TWENTY-THREE). (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 114 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, dated 6/6/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS(TWENTY). (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 112 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, dated 6/6/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) - AMICUS (TWENTY-ONE) -HERE IS PROOF THAT NATHAN FOREMAN IS INNOCENT AND THIS IS ONLY A DROP IN THE BUCKET. ATTACHED IS JONATHAN BAILEY'S AFFIDAVIT ETC. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Suspend the Deadline for Responding to the Complaint. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sellers, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, dated 6/5/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) - AMICUS(EIGHTEEN A). (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 105 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson dated 6/4/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) - AMICUS (SEVENTEEN B). (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 104 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, dated 6/4/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) - AMICUS (SEVENTEEN A). (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 102 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 Clerk Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the summonses and complaint, notice of suit, copy of the electronic case filing rules and instructions, court's individual practices in English and Russian and notarized translation certifications for each document. And a check for $2,275.00 mailed to GRU Operative Using Pseudonym "Guccifer 2.0" on June 12, 2018 by Federal Express tracking # FedEx 810606318718, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. ?? 1608(a)(4). (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 101 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 Clerk Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the summonses and complaint, notice of suit, copy of the electronic case and filing rules and instructions, court's individual practices in English and Russian, notarized translation certifications for each document. Also a check for $2,275.00 mailed to The Russian Federation on June 12, 2018 by Federal Express tracking # FedEx 810606318707, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. ?? 1608(a)(4). (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 100 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 Clerk Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the summonses and complaint, notice of suit, electronic case filing rules and instructions, court's individual practices in English and Russian and notarized translation certifications for each document. Also a check for 2,275.00 mailed to General Staff of the Armed Forces of the Russian Federation on June 12, 2018 by Federal Express tracking # FedEx 810606318729, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. ?? 1608(a)(4). (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, dated 6/5/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) - AMICUS(EIGHTEEN B). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 103 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE THAT Patrick Farrell INTENDS TO FILE RICO & COUNTER COMPLAINT IN THIS CASE AGAINST DEFENDANTS-EVIDENCE OF TRUMP-RUSSIA COLLUSION. (Attachments: # (1) Main Document, # (2) Main Document)(sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 99 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER from David A. Christenson, dated 6/2/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPTION ACT(RICO) -AMICUS(SIXTEEN). (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 98 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. Dkt. No. 95 is stricken. There was no permission granted to file the amicus brief. If Mr. Farrell continues to make filings that do not seek any appropriate relief, he may be subject to an anti-filing injunction. So ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/7/2018) (rjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Alison Sarah Deich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15168761. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Deich, Alison)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 96 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 Order Striking Document from RecordCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER....The Court has reviewed the filings of David Christenson, which do not seek any relief in this case to which Mr. Christenson is entitled. In particular, Dkt. Nos. 90 and 91 are stricken. Mr. Christenson is advised that if he continues to make filings that do not seek appropriate relief in this case he may be subject of an anti-filing injunction. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/6/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [97] MOTION for Alison Sarah Deich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15168761. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 94 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: 6/6/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Certificate of good standing re: [93] MOTION for Robert Craig Buschel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15164095. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr. (Buschel, Robert) Modified on 6/6/2018 (jc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: 6/6/2018, Terminated: 6/6/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Robert Craig Buschel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15164095. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Buschel, Robert) Modified on 6/6/2018 (jc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 92 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: 6/6/2018 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. George Papadopoulos waiver sent on 5/2/2018, answer due 7/2/2018. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Note Regarding Stricken Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [95] from the case record. The document was stricken in its entirety from this case pursuant to [98] Order. (rjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Robert Craig Buschel to RE-FILE Document [94] Notice (Other). The Certificate of Good Standing needs to be issued by the Supreme Court of Florida (not the state bar) and filed as an attachment to your Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (jc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. [93] MOTION for Robert Craig Buschel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15164095. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificates of Good Standing from Supreme Courts of California and Florida. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit - attach Proposed Order. (jc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [77] Motion for Julia Ann Horwitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Julia Ann Horwitz for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/5/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 88 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER from David A. Christenson, dated 5/28/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED AND CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS(TWELVE). (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 87 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER from David Christenson, dated 5/28/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS (ELEVEN). (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 86 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER from David Christenson, dated 5/28/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ MEMORIAL DAY 2018. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 85 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Donald J. Trump, Jr waiver sent on 5/2/2018, answer due 7/2/2018. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Note Regarding Stricken Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [91] from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to [96] Order Striking Document from Record,. (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 84 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER from David A. Christenson, dated 5/28/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS (TEN). (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Roger J. Stone, Jr waiver sent on 5/2/2018, answer due 7/2/2018. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 95 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF AMICUS CURIAE & EVIDENCE OF TRUMP-RUSSIA COLLUSION. (sc) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Note Regarding Stricken Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [90] from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to [96] Order Striking Document from Record,. (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 82 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Order Striking Document from RecordCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. Dkt. No. 78 is stricken. There was no permission granted to file the amicus brief. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/30/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Chrisenson, dated 5/22/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS(SEVENTH) - OPEN LETTER TO JUDGES KOELTL, SULLIVAN MOSS, JACKSON, STEWART, HIGGINBOTHAM, BATTANI, ELLIS ET AL. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 80 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER from David A. Christenson dated 5/25/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ SUICIDE - AMICUS (EIGHT) - SUICIDE. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER from David A. Christenson, dated 5/31/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED AND CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS(FOURTEEN) - READ THEODORE KACZYNSKI'S MANIFESTO - WAS HE WRONG? HE WAS TRYING TO WARN & SAVE US ETC. (sc) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 79 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER from David A. Christenson, a non-party, dated 5/20/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS(SIXTH) - WHAT IF? WHAT IF THIS IS WHY TRUMP WAS ELECTED? WHAT IF THEY NEEDED AN IDIOT/PUPPET AND TRUMP FIT THE BILL? WHAT IF TRUMP IS THE MANCHURIAN CANDIDATE? JUST WHAT IF?. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 90 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER from David A. Christenson, dated 6/1/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS(FIFTEEN) - HERE IS THOMAS JOHN KACZYNSKI'S MANIFESTO BUT BEFORE YOU READ IT ASK YOURSELF: WHO SHOULD CONTROL THESE FOUR MILITARY GRADE DOOMSDAY WEAPONS? (sc) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Note Regarding Stricken Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [78] from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to [82] Order Striking Document from Record. (yv) Modified on 5/31/2018 (yv).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 77 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: 5/24/2018, Terminated: 6/5/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Julia Ann Horwitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15115096. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Horwitz, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 76 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: 5/24/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER from David A. Christenson, dated 5/20/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/AMICUS(SEVENTH AND FINAL). (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [77] MOTION for Julia Ann Horwitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15115096. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 75 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: 5/24/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 64 Motion for Leave to Serve Three Foreign Defendants Through the Secretary of State under 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Three Foreign Defendants Through the Secretary of State Under 28 U.S.C. ?? 1608(a)(4) is GRANTED, and it is further ORDERED that for each Defendant to be served pursuant to this Order, Plaintiff shall send two copies of the summons and complaint, a notice of suit, a copy of the Electronic Case Filing Rules and Instructions, and this Court's individual practices, together with a translation of each into Russian, by any form of mail requiring a signed receipt to the Clerk, and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall address and dispatch these documents to the Secretary of State in Washington, District of Columbia, to the attention of the Director of Special Consular Services, and it is further ORDERED that the Secretary shall transmit one copy of the papers through diplomatic channels to the Russian Federation and shall send to the clerk of the court a certified copy of the diplomatic note indicating when the papers were transmitted. Because this Order is necessarily issued without input from the Three Foreign Defendants to be served, it is without prejudice to any argument they may make in opposition to the requested service. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/23/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: 5/23/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER from David Christenson, a non-party, re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATIONS ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS(FIFTH). (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 72 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: 5/23/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER from David Christenson, a non-party, re: RACKETEER INFLUENCES & CORRUPT ORGANIZATIONS ACT(RICO)/ MOTION TO APPOINT CHIEF JUDGE CARL E. STEWART(5TH), JUSTICE PATRICK E. HIGGINBOTHAM(5TH), MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOSEPH C. WILKINSON JR.(EDLA) AND CLERK LYLE W. CAYCE(5TH) TO REPRESENT THE FEDERAL JUDICIARY AS A PARTY. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 71 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: 5/23/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER from David Christenson, a non-party, re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED AND CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS(FOURTH). (sc) Modified on 5/23/2018 (sc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: [75] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 74 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: 5/23/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER from David A. Christenson, re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ UNDER SEAL QUESTION? CHIEF JUSTICE CARL STEWART, JUSTICE PATRICK HIGGINBOTHAM AND JUDGE JOHN KOELTL, AM I A VEXATIOUS LITIGANT?ETC. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 70 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: 5/22/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER from David Christenson, a non-party re: AMICUS(THIRD)(PART 2 OF 2). (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: 5/22/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER from David A. Christenson, a non-party re: AMICUS(SECOND) (PART 1 OF 2). (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 78 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF AMICUS CURIAE & EVIDENCE OF TRUMP-RUSSIA COLLUSION. Document filed by Patrick Farrell, a non-party. (Attachments: # 1 Main Document, # 2 Main Document)(sc) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: 5/22/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Non-party David Andrew Christenson has made numerous filings with the Court in this case (see Dkt. Nos. 45, 46, 47, 48, 49, 50, 51, 52, 53, 54, 55, 56, 58, 60, 61, 62, 63). Many of these filings seek to alert the Court to Mr. Christenson's filings in other courts. None of these filings require any action by the Court. To the extent that any of these filings request relief from the Court, they are denied because Mr. Christenson has not shown that he is entitled to any relief. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/21/2018) (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 68 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/22/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER from David A. Christenson, a non-party re: UNDER SEAL LETTER AND MOTION TO AMEND. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 67 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/22/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, a non-party re: AMICUS / THIS IS ELECTION TAMPERING/ WHY ARE POLITICIANS NOT TALKING ABOUT THIS?. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 65 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Donald J. Trump For President, Inc. waiver sent on 5/2/2018, answer due 7/2/2018. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018, Terminated: 5/23/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Serve Three Foreign Defendants Through the Secretary of State under 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4) . Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # (1) Complaint - English, # (2) Complaint - Russian, # (3) ECF Instructions - Eng., # (4) ECF Instructions - Russian, # (5) FSIA English, # (6) FSIA Russian, # (7) GRU Summons English, # (8) GRU Summons Russian, # (9) Guccifer Summons English, # (10) Guccifer Summons Russian, # (11) Koetl Practices English, # (12) Koetl Practices - Russian, # (13) Notice of Suit Russian, # (14) Notice of Suit, # (15) Russian Fed. Summons English, # (16) Russian Fed. Summons Russian, # (17) Translation Certificate, # (18) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sellers, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER from David A. Christenson, a non-party, dated 5/12/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/OPEN LETTER. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 60 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER from David A. Christenson, a non-party, dated 5/11/18 re: ADDENDUM EIGHTEEN TO WRIT OF MANDAMUS & PROHIBITION. (sc) Modified on 5/16/2018 (sc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 62 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION FOR EXTENSION TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Document filed by David A. Christenson, a non-party. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to GRU Operative Using the Pseudonym "Guccifer2.0". (jgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER from David Christenson, dated 5/8/18 re: ADDENDUM SIXTEEN TO WRIT OF MANDAMUS & PROHIBITION/ WHO IS NATHAN FOREMAN? (sc) Modified on 5/15/2018 (sc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER from David A. Christenson, a non-party, dated 5/9/18 re: ADDENDUM SEVENTEEN TO WRIT OF MANDAMUS & PROHIBITION. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GRU Operative Using Pseudonym "Guccifer 2.0", re: [6] Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 56 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER from David A. Christenson, dated 5/8/18 re: ADDENDUM FIFTEEN TO WRIT OF MANDAMUS & PROHIBITION. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 55 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, a non-party movant, re: ADDENDUM FOURTEEN TO WRIT OF MANDAMUS & PROHIBITION "UNFETTERED POWER". (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 54 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: 5/10/2018 Order on motion to interveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [46] Motion to Intervene. The emergency motion to intervene and join (Dkt. No. 46) is denied for the same reasons stated in the Court's Order of April 28, 2018 (Dkt. No. 44). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/9/2018) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 53 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: 5/9/2018 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [51] Letter. ENDORSEMENT: This paper should be filed. To the extent it requests any relief, it is denied because there is no showing of any relief that the plaintiff requests to which he is entitled. So ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/8/2018) (anc) Modified on 7/16/2018 (anc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: 5/9/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. The attached motion to dismiss the plaintiff's complaint is denied because the Court has already denied the petitioner's motion to intervene. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/8/2018) (rjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 51 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: 5/9/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER from David A. Christenson, dated 5/1/18 re: RESPONSE & MOTION TO JUDGE KOELTL'S ORDER DENYING MY MOTION TO JOIN, ETC. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 50 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: 5/9/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER from David A. Christenson, re: MOTION TO DISMISS THE DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE'S COMPLAINT. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 49 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: The motion for a continuance and/or extension (Dkt. No. 48) is denied as moot based on the Court's denial of the petitioner's previous motion to intervene. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/5/2018) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER from David A. Christenson, re: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE/ EXTENSION(until 9/1/18). (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David Andrew Christenson dated 4/24/2018 re: You and the American People have a Constitutional Right to know what escaped from the World Trade Centers during 911 and what escaped from the Strategic National Stockpile during Hurricane Katrina. ENDORSEMENT: This should be filed along with previous filings. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/30/2018) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 44 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [25] Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The motion to intervene (Dkt. No. 25) is denied because the movant has failed to show any basis for intervention, whether as of right or otherwise. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/28/2018) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 46 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Motion to intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EMERGENCY MOTION TO INTERVENE & EMERGENCY MOTION TO JOIN.(sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 45 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE that David Andrew Christenson Intends to File a Rackateer Influence & Corrupt Organization Act(RICO) Complaint etc. and Counter Complaint in this Case Against All Plaintiffs and Defendants. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting [41] Motion for Geoffrey Graber to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/26/2018) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 42 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: You are directed to appear for a pretrial conference, to be held on Thursday, July 5, 2018, in Courtroom 14A, at 10:30 am, in front of the Honorable John G. Koeltl. Initial Conference set for 7/5/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (js)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018, Terminated: 4/27/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED MOTION for Geoffrey Aaron Graber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Geoffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [41] AMENDED MOTION for Geoffrey Aaron Graber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [41] AMENDED MOTION for Geoffrey Aaron Graber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Russian Federation. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Russian Federation, re: [6] Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to WikiLeaks. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Roger J. Stone, Jr. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard W. Gates, III. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Julian Assange. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph Mifsud. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jared C. Kushner. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to George Papadopoulos. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to General Staff of the Armed Forces of the Russian Federation ("GRU"). (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Emin Araz Agalarov. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donald J. Trump, Jr. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donald J. Trump For President, Inc. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft to RE-FILE Document No. [21] Request for Issuance of Summons, [15] Request for Issuance of Summons, [11] Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reasons: Summons can only be requested for named defendants [11, 15]; the name of the party for whom the summons is being requested is incorrect in the docket entry text [21]. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018, Terminated: 4/28/2018 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO INTERVENE AND MOTION TO JOIN. Document filed by David Andrew Christenson, a non-party.(sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018, Terminated: 4/24/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Geoffrey A. Graber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14982301. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - CGS of DC, # (2) Exhibit B - CGS of California, # (3) Exhibit C - Affidavit of Geoffrey Graber, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Geoffrey) Modified on 4/24/2018 (wb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. [24] MOTION for Geoffrey A. Graber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14982301. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [5] Motion for Joseph M. Sellers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/20/2018) (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WikiLeaks, re: [6] Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to the Ministry of Justice, Russian Federation, re: [6] Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael) Modified on 4/25/2018 (pne).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Roger J. Stone, Jr., re: [6] Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Richard W. Gates, III, re: [6] Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr., re: [6] Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Julian Assange, re: [6] Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph Mifsud, re: [6] Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jefferson Beauregard Session III, Attorney General of the United States, re: [6] Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael) Modified on 4/25/2018 (pne).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jared C. Kushner, re: [6] Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to General Staff of the Armed Forces of the Russian Federation ("GRU"), re: [6] Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to George Papadopoulos, re: [6] Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Geoffrey S. Berman, U.S. Attorney, re: [6] Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael) Modified on 4/25/2018 (pne).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Emin Araz Agalarov, re: [6] Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donald J. Trump, Jr., re: [6] Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., re: [6] Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, re: [6] Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov, Julian Assange, Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., GRU Operative Using the Pseudonym "Guccifer2.0", Richard W. Gates, III, General Staff of the Armed Forces of the Russian Federation, John Does 1-10, Jared C. Kushner, Paul J. Manafort, Jr, Joseph Mifsud, George Papadopoulos, Roger J. Stone, Jr, The Russian Federation, Donald J. Trump, Jr, WikiLeaks. Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Eisenkraft, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018, Terminated: 4/20/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Joseph M. Sellers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14969145. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (2) Affidavit, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Sellers, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Russian Federation, General Staff of the Armed Forces of the Russian Federation ("GRU"), Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov, Joseph Mifsud, WikiLeaks, Julian Assange, Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Donald J. Trump, Jr., Paul J. Manafort, Jr., Roger J. Stone, Jr., Jared C. Kushner, George Papadopoulos, Richard W. Gates, III, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, Geoffrey S. Berman, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael) Modified on 4/20/2018 (laq).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Eisenkraft, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14967553)Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Eisenkraft, Michael) Modified on 4/20/2018 (laq).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael Eisenkraft to RE-FILE Document No. [4] Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; IF YOU WANT TO REQUEST A SUMMONS, YOU MUST ATTACH ONLY ONE PDF PER SUMMONS REQUEST ENTRY, OR YOU CAN REQUEST ONE SUMMONS FOR ALL DEFENDANTS WITH ATTACHING A RIDER WITH DEFENDANTS LISTED. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (laq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael Eisenkraft to RE-FILE Document No. [1] Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (laq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Designated ECF. (laq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (laq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (laq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [5] MOTION for Joseph M. Sellers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14969145. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 176 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?