Doe v. Ohio State University
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00712-MHW-EPD
District Judge Michael H. Watson, presiding

Tags
Last Updated November 23, 2019 at 1:54 AM EST (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo John Doe 1, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R. Karon +1 216 622 1851 +1 216 241 8175 dkaron@karonllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by sstriallawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph G. Sauder +1 610 200 0580 +1 610 727 4360 jgs@sstriallawyers.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph G. Sauder +1 610 200 0580 +1 610 727 4360 jgs@sstriallawyers.com
v.
No Logo Does 1-100, Defendant
The Ohio State University The Ohio State University, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ohio State University"

Toggle Switch Represented by Carpenter & Lipps LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David John Barthel +1 614 365 4126 +1 614 365 9145 barthel@carpenterlipps.com
Space Timothy R Bricker +1 614 365 4100 +1 614 365 9145 bricker@carpenterlipps.com
Space Stephen Edwin Dutton +1 614 365 4134 +1 614 365 9145 dutton@carpenterlipps.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carpenter Lipps & Leland LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David John Barthel +1 614 365 4126 +1 614 365 9145 barthel@carpenterlipps.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy R Bricker +1 614 365 4100 +1 614 365 9145 bricker@carpenterlipps.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Hiram Carpenter +1 614 365 4100 +1 614 364 9145 carpenter@carpenterlipps.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edwin Dutton +1 614 365 4134 +1 614 365 9145 dutton@carpenterlipps.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Office Columbus
Filed 7/17/2018
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $5000000
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County FRANKLIN
Terminated 10/30/2018
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
218-cv-00692-MHW-EPD
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,JURY,LC3
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 OrderCourt Filing
RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 19-cv-4634 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Michael H. Watson and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge George C. Smith and Judge Michael H. Watson on 10/31/2019. (mdr)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: 7/30/2019 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER regarding consolidation of cases. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 7/30/19. (jk)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019 OrderCourt Filing
      RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:19-cv-3165 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Michael H. Watson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson and Judge George C. Smith on 7/25/19. (mdr)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019 OrderCourt Filing
        Related Case Memorandum filed in 2:19-cv-1911 relating that case with this case, 2:18-cv-712 and 2:18-cv-736. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson and Judge George C. Smith on 5/14/19. (sem)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Notice - other
          NOTICE by Plaintiff John Doe 1 of Dismissal (Karon, Daniel)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018, Terminated: 10/30/2018 Motion To Stay
            MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant Ohio State University. (Carpenter, Michael)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [21] Motion for Extension of Time: Response to [18] Motion to Dismiss or File an Amended Complaint due by 10/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/28/2018. (ew)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018, Terminated: 9/28/2018 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [18] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction New date requested 10/26/2018. by Plaintiff John Doe 1. (Karon, Daniel)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER vacating the Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2018. If Defendant intends to seek a stay of discovery, it shall file a motion to stay by 10/12/2018. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/28/2018. (ew)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Rule 26(f) Report
                    RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Ohio State University. (Carpenter, Michael)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018, Terminated: 10/30/2018 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                      MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Responses due by 9/28/2018) by Defendant Ohio State University. (Carpenter, Michael)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                        NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2018 10:00 AM in Chambers, room 208, before Judge Michael Watson and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Notice - other
                          NOTICE - Status Conference set for 9/13/18 at 2:30 p.m. is VACATED. (jk)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 stipulation
                            STIPULATION CONSENT TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT by Defendant Ohio State University. (Carpenter, Michael)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 Notice of appearance
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Edwin Dutton for Defendant Ohio State University (Dutton, Stephen)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 Notice of appearance
                                NOTICE of Appearance by David John Barthel for Defendant Ohio State University (Barthel, David)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 Notice of appearance
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy R Bricker for Defendant Ohio State University (Bricker, Timothy)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 Notice of appearance
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Hiram Carpenter for Defendant Ohio State University (Carpenter, Michael)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                      Reset deadlines pursuant to [16] as to Ohio State University: Answer due 9/7/2018. (ew)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 summons returned executed
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Ohio State University. Served on 7/27/2018. Answer due 8/17/2018. (ew)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 Certificate of Clerk
                                          CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: The complaint and issued summons were sent via certified mail to Defendant Ohio State University. (ew)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 Related Case MemorandumCourt Filing
                                            RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:18-cv-692 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Michael H. Watson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson and Judge George C. Smith on 7/23/18. (sem)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                              NOTATION ORDER granting [4] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph G. Sauder. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 7/20/2018. (er)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Summons issued
                                                Summons Issued as to Ohio State University. (er)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER transferring case to the Eastern Division at Columbus of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio for reassignment to a Judge at that location. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/20/18. (sct)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018, Terminated: 7/20/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6526405) of Joseph G. Sauder by Plaintiff John Doe 1. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Sauder, Joseph)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                      REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Service of Process (Karon, Daniel)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6522340), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons Form Summons) (Karon, Daniel)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 22 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?