WILLETT v. POMPEO
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01707

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 10, 2021 at 4:28 PM DT (1.1 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JEFFREY WILLETT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Jenifer Building

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jenifer Wicks +1 202 393 3004 +1 202 478 0867 jenifer@jwickslaw.com
v.
No Logo ADRIENNE MESSER, Defendant
No Logo CHRISTINE MCLEAN, Defendant
No Logo DOUGLAS ROLOFF, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE PENN, Defendant
No Logo JOHN D WILCOCK, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 1-10, Defendant
No Logo JONATHAN M. ROLBIN, Defendant
No Logo MATTHEW DEUCHLER, Defendant
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL R. POMPEO"
No Logo MICHELLE THOREN BOND, Defendant
No Logo NANCY BERRYHILL, Defendant
No Logo PATRICK P. O'CARROLL, JR., Defendant
No Logo STEPHEN B. DIETZ, III, Defendant
No Logo SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, Interested Party
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Stay
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Stay
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Strike
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/27/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/27/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/27/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/15/2020, Entered: None Stay
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/31/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/23/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                                                                                          SUMMONS (28) Issued Electronically as to NANCY BERRYHILL, MICHELLE THOREN BOND, MATTHEW DEUCHLER, STEPHEN B. DIETZ, III, CHRISTINE MCLEAN, ADRIENNE MESSER, PATRICK P. O'CARROLL, JR, GEORGE PENN, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, JONATHAN M. ROLBIN, DOUGLAS ROLOFF, JOHN D WILCOCK, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jenifer Wicks on behalf of JEFFREY WILLETT (Wicks, Jenifer)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Complaint
                                                                                              COMPLAINT against NANCY BERRYHILL, MICHELLE THOREN BOND, MATTHEW DEUCHLER, STEPHEN B. DIETZ, III, JOHN DOE 1-10, CHRISTINE MCLEAN, ADRIENNE MESSER, PATRICK P O'CARROLL, GEORGE PENN, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, JONATHAN M. ROLBIN, DOUGLAS ROLOFF, JOHN D WILCOCK with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5598528) filed by JEFFREY WILLETT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M)(Wicks, Jenifer)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?