Securities and Exchange Commission v. McFarland
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-06634

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 24, 2019 at 6:25 PM EDT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah Heaton Concannon +1 202 551 5361 ConcannonS@sec.gov
v.
No Logo Daniel, Simon, Defendant
Fyre Media, Inc. Fyre Media, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Grant Margolin, Defendant
No Logo Magnises, Inc., Defendant
McFarland, William McFarland, William, Defendant
Officially listed as "William McFarland"
Office Foley Square
Filed 7/24/2018
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition
County Albany
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 Civil Cover Sheet
                CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Concannon, Sarah)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT against Fyre Media, Inc., Magnises, Inc., Grant Margolin, William McFarland, Daniel Simon. Document filed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission.(Concannon, Sarah)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 51 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?