Amany Simmonds v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:18-cv-01280

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2019 at 6:26 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Amany Simmonds, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Amany Simmonds

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amany Simmonds
v.
No Logo Does 1 to 100, inclusive, Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Defendant
Officer/Director, NORWEST CORP
Officer/Director, Day Runner, Inc.
Officer/Director, Yucca Uranium Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Anglin Flewelling Rasmussen Campbell & Trytten, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Michael Newman +1 626 535 1900 +1 626 577 7764 dnewman@afrct.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1444
Nature of Suit Real Property: Foreclosure
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Attorney Fees
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Attorney Fees
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Reply
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: None Supplement
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Amended Minutes
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Show Cause Hearing - optional html form
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Response
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          TEMPORARY RESTAINING ORDER and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 18 by Judge James V. Selna. Defendant Wells Fargo is hereby ordered to appear before this Court, in Courtroom 10C, located at 411 West 4th Street, Santa Ana, California, at 9:00 A.M., on September 21, 2018, and there and then to show cause [See document for further information.] (es) Modified on 9/7/2018 (es).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/26/2018, Entered: None Remand Case to State Court
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Remand Case to State CourtCourt Filing
                                                      MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Denying Plaintiffs Motion to Remand 10 by Judge James V. Selna: Accordingly, the Court denies Simmonds's motion to remand without prejudice. The Court vacates the September 10, 2018, hearing date. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. (es)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Remand Case to State Court
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Dismiss (cause or other)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Reassign Case pursuant to GO 16-05 (CV-81)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., identifying Wells Fargo and Co.. (Newman, David) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                                          CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Newman, David)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2018-01001341-CU-OR-CJC Receipt No: 0973-22138406 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - F to Removal) (Attorney David Michael Newman added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Newman, David) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?