PAISLEY PARK ENTERPRISES, INC. AND COMERICA BANK & TRUST, N.A. AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PRINCE ROGERS NELSON v. DOMAIN CAPITAL, LLC

Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-12044
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 14, 2018 at 4:22 AM EDT (6.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo PAISLEY PARK ENTERPRISES, INC. AND COMERICA BANK & TRUST, N.A. AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PRINCE ROGERS NELSON, Plaintiff

Represented by Direct: 973-535-0500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED COLLEEN M. MAKER +1 973 757 1100 cmaker@walsh.law

Represented by Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON +1 973 757 1100 cgannon@thewalshfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PETER JOSEPH PIZZI +1 973 757 1100 +1 973 757 1090 ppizzi@thewalshfirm.com
v.
No Logo DOMAIN CAPITAL, LLC, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1125
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
Timeline
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 stipulation
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Respond by DOMAIN CAPITAL, LLC. (SCHAEFFER, JASON)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 summons returned executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAISLEY PARK ENTERPRISES, INC. AND COMERICA BANK & TRUST, N.A. AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PRINCE ROGERS NELSON. DOMAIN CAPITAL, LLC served on 7/26/2018, answer due 8/16/2018. (GANNON, CHRISTINE)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by COLLEEN M. MAKER on behalf of PAISLEY PARK ENTERPRISES, INC. AND COMERICA BANK & TRUST, N.A. AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PRINCE ROGERS NELSON (MAKER, COLLEEN)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by PETER JOSEPH PIZZI on behalf of PAISLEY PARK ENTERPRISES, INC. AND COMERICA BANK & TRUST, N.A. AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PRINCE ROGERS NELSON (PIZZI, PETER)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 Summons issued
SUMMONS ISSUED as to DOMAIN CAPITAL, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (byl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form
AO120 Patent Form filed. (byl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2018: # 1 Complaint) (byl, ).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: 7/25/2018 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Corporate Disclosure Statement by PAISLEY PARK ENTERPRISES, INC. AND COMERICA BANK & TRUST, N.A. AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PRINCE ROGERS NELSON. (GANNON, CHRISTINE)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: 7/25/2018 Complaint
COMPLAINT against DOMAIN CAPITAL, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8907841) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PAISLEY PARK ENTERPRISES, INC. AND COMERICA BANK & TRUST, N.A. AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PRINCE ROGERS NELSON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GANNON, CHRISTINE)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 0 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?