Jackson County, Missouri v. Purdue Pharma L.P.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Western District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-00571

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 7, 2018 at 8:13 PM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jackson County, Missouri, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Boulware Law, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon J.B. Boulware +1 816 492 2826 brandon@boulware-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson County Counselor's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Travis Willingham +1 816 881 3355 +1 816 881 3398 Twillingham@jacksongov.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Kapke & Willerth, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin D Lawrence +1 816 461 3800 +1 816 254 8014 edl@kapkewillerth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams Dirks Dameron LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lee Dameron +1 816 876 2600 +1 816 221 8763 matt@williamsdirks.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric L. Dirks +1 816 876 2600 +1 816 221 8763 dirks@williamsdirks.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Williams +1 816 876 2600 +1 816 221 8763 mwilliams@williamsdirks.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams Dirks, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy R Jackson +1 816 945 7127 +1 816 945 7118 amy@williamsdirks.com
v.
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Actavis PLC, Defendant
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC Allergan Finance, LLC, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, Defendant
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo H.D. Smith Holding Company, Defendant
No Logo H.D. Smith Holdings, LLC, Defendant
No Logo H. D. Smith, LLC, Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
No Logo MIAMI-LUKEN, INC., Defendant
No Logo Noramco, Inc., Defendant
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
No Logo RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Kroger Co., Defendant
No Logo THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Defendant
Wal-mart, Inc. Wal-mart, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None MDL Conditional Transfer Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 Notice of MAPADMIN
    NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: # 1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: 7/25/2018 Complaint
      COMPLAINT Complaint against All Defendants filed by Matthew Lee Dameron on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-5867739. Service due by 10/23/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Dameron, Matthew)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 12 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?