Unknown Case Title
Federal Court Proceeding Alabama Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-mc-00005

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 11, 2018 at 12:39 PM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jamie Alisa Wilson +1 251 415 7111 +1 251 441 5051 jamie.wilson@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo James Gordon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Barry A. Friedman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry A. Friedman +1 251 432 2660
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7402
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING the United States' 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Court's 8 Order of September 20, 2018 re: 7 Respondent's Suggestion of Bankruptcy and motion to stay. The United States's written notice confirming that the Respondent did comply with the summons and that no further relief was requested is due by October 5, 2018. Upon receipt of said notice, the motion to stay will be deemed moot as of October 5, 2018, and the clerk is directed to indicate on the docket this this action is closed. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 09/24/2018. (mab) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to District Judges Order as to 8 Order,, Set Deadlines, by United States of America. (Wilson, Jamie)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Order re: 7 Suggestion of Bankruptcy and motion to stay. On or before September 27, 2018, the United States is ORDERED to file a written notice confirming that the Respondent did comply with the summons and that no further relief was requested. Upon receipt of said notice, the motion to stay will be deemed moot as of September 27, 2018, and the clerk is directed to indicateon the docket this this action is closed. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 09/20/2018. (mab)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
              MOTION to Stay Suggestion of Bankruptcy by James Gordon. (Friedman, Barry)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Order Enforcing Internal Revenue Summons, 1 Petition to Enforce Internal Revenue Service summons is GRANTED. Respondent, James Gordon, is directed to produce the information as set out in Order by 3:00 p.m. this afternoon. Respondent's failure to comply with this Order may subject him to sanctions for contempt of court. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 09/06/2018. (mab)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Order, RESCHEDULING Show Cause Hearing re: petition to enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons for 9/6/2018 at 11:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 09/04/2018. (copy mailed to Respondent at address provided in Doc. 4 .) (mab)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 3 Order,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, Acknowledgement filed by United States of America. (Wilson, Jamie)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Order, hearing re: 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons set for September 5, 2018 at 11:00 a.m., in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL. Petitioner shall serve respondent with a copy of this Order and Petition within 21 days of the date of this Order. Petitioner shall file proof of service with the Clerk of Court. Respondent's defense or opposition to petition due 14 days prior to hearing. Petitioner's reply due 5 days prior to hearing. If respondent files a written pleading stating he has no objection, then respondent's appearance at hearing may be excused. Respondent's failure to comply with this order may subject him to sanctions for contempt of court. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 07/27/2018. (mab)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                        Memorandum in Support re 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Revenue Officer S. Montet, # 2 Exhibit 2 - IRS Administrative Summons) (Wilson, Jamie)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                          PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wilson, Jamie)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 5 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?