Webster Parish v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Middle District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00720

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 5, 2018 at 3:30 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Webster Parish, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Alvendia Kelly & Demarest LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roderick Alvendia +1 504 482 5811 +1 504 684 6016 rico@akdlalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanne K Demarest +1 504 482 5811 +1 504 684 6016 jeanne@akdlalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Bartholomew Kelly, III +1 504 200 0000 bart@akdlalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Chehardy,Sherman,Ellis,Murray,Recile,Griffith,Stakelum&Hayes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Williams +1 504 833 5600 +1 504 833 8080 jmw@chehardy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Curry & Friend, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F. Young, Jr. +1 504 524 8556 johnyoung@curryandfriend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Irpino Law Firm, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Anthony D. Irpino +1 504 525 1500 airpino@irpinolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith & Fawer, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen M. Gele' +1 504 836 7537 +1 504 836 7538 sgele@smithfawer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randall A. Smith +1 504 525 2200 rasmith@smithfawer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Stag, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ashley M. Liuzza +1 504 593 9600 aliuzza@smithstag.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Douglas Rogenes +1 504 593 9600 mrogenes@smithstag.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael G. Stag +1 504 593 9600 +1 504 593 9601 mstag@smithstag.com
v.
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Noramco, Inc., Defendant
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Defendant
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Andrx Corp
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Order Transferring Case to JPML Court
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (NLT) (Entered: 07/28/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 Complaint (Complete Case Opening First)
      COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1800862.), filed by Webster Parish. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Irpino, Anthony)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 14 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?