Sheets v. F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-04565

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 21, 2019 at 3:21 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Andrew Sheets, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Panish Shea & Boyle LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R Boyle +1 310 477 1700 +1 310 477 1699 boyle@psblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jesse Max Creed +1 310 477 1700 +1 310 477 1699 creed@psblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter L Kaufman +1 310 477 1700 +1 310 477 1699 kaufman@psblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory M. Sonstein +1 310 477 1700 +1 310 477 1699 sonstein@psblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Israel Siminou +1 858 877 4184 ben@siminouappeals.com
No Logo Kristie Sheets, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Panish Shea & Boyle LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R Boyle +1 310 477 1700 +1 310 477 1699 boyle@psblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jesse Max Creed +1 310 477 1700 +1 310 477 1699 creed@psblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter L Kaufman +1 310 477 1700 +1 310 477 1699 kaufman@psblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory M. Sonstein +1 310 477 1700 +1 310 477 1699 sonstein@psblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Israel Siminou +1 858 877 4184 ben@siminouappeals.com
v.
No Logo F. Hoffmann-la Roche Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Harrty and Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Weissenberger Emily +1 415 544 1900 +1 415 391 0281 eweissenberger@shb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alexander A. Guney +1 415 544 1900 +1 415 391 0281 aguney@shb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael F. Healy ,. +1 415 544 1900 +1 415 391 0281 mfhealy@shb.com
No Logo GENENTECH, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Weissenberger Emily +1 415 544 1900 +1 415 391 0281 eweissenberger@shb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alexander A. Guney +1 415 544 1900 +1 415 391 0281 aguney@shb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael F. Healy ,. +1 415 544 1900 +1 415 391 0281 mfhealy@shb.com
No Logo Hoffman-La Roche, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Hoffmann-La Roche Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Weissenberger Emily +1 415 544 1900 +1 415 391 0281 eweissenberger@shb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alexander A. Guney +1 415 544 1900 +1 415 391 0281 aguney@shb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael F. Healy ,. +1 415 544 1900 +1 415 391 0281 mfhealy@shb.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Transcript
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Clerk's Notice
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Relate Case
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Receipt
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Remark
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Remand
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Objection
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Objection
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Quash
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER TO RESET HEARING DATES FOR MOTION TO REMAND [ECF 10] AND MOTION TO DISMISS [ECF 26]; AND REVISE BRIEFING SCHEDULE PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV. P. 6(b) AND CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-1(b) filed by Hoffmann-La Roche Inc., Genentech, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 17, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Reset Hearing Date for re 10 MOTION to Remand Case Back to State Court, Revise Briefing Schedule, and Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline filed by Andrew Sheets, Kristie Sheets. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 4, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Notice
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Errata
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Remand*
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 7/27/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2018) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/10/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2018) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 notice of removal
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C SECTION 1441(b); (NO PROCESS); from Sonoma County Superior. Their case number is SCV-262710. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12548904). Filed byHoffmann-La Roche Inc., Genentech, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Declaration A. Guney (Exhibits 1 - 4 attached), # 3 Declaration Gerald Bohm)(Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 7/27/2018) Modified on 7/30/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?