St. John the Baptist Parish v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-07070

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 7, 2018 at 7:35 PM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo St. John the Baptist Parish, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baron & Budd, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Ann Saucer +1 214 521 3605 +1 214 520 1181 asaucer@baronbudd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hill Peterson Carper Bee & Deitzler PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES C. PETERSON +1 304 345 5667 jcpeterson@hpcbd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Richard D. Grossman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ike Spears +1 504 593 9500 ikespears@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Powell & Majestro, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony J. Majestro +1 304 346 2889 +1 304 346 2895 amajestro@powellmajestro.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Burton LeBlanc +1 214 521 3605 +1 214 520 1181 bleblanc@baronbudd.com
v.
No Logo Actavis Inc., Defendant
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, Defendant
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Defendant
No Logo Noramco, Inc., Defendant
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd"
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
Wal-mart, Inc. Wal-mart, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Receipt
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Order of MDL Transfer
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Pursuant to Canon 3-C(1) of the Code of Judicial Conduct, I disqualify myself from acting on this case. Case re-allotted and re-assigned to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 7/31/2018. (NEF: Section G)(sa)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 Complaint
            COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7029894) filed by Parish of St. John the Baptist, Louisiana. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney J. Burton LeBlanc, IV added to party Parish of St. John the Baptist, Louisiana(pty:pla).(LeBlanc, J.)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 13 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?