Paul Achiro et al v. Coldwell Banker et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC682732

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 30, 2018 at 2:44 PM DT (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Achiro Dina, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce J Altshuler +1 310 275 4475 bjaltshuler@sbcglobal.net
No Logo Achiro Paul, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce J Altshuler +1 310 275 4475 bjaltshuler@sbcglobal.net
No Logo Brennan M. Wighton Dba Eagle, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cole Montgomery
Coldwell Banker Corporation Coldwell Banker Corporation, Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "Coldwell Banker"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cole Montgomery
No Logo Does 1 To 15, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cole Montgomery
No Logo Donaldson Matt, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cole Montgomery
No Logo Merrill Nancy, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cole Montgomery
No Logo Smith, Gary M., Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cole Montgomery
No Logo Ravaglioli Realty, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Ravaglioli Steven, Cross-Defendant
Type Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 Amendment To Cross Complaint
ROE 1 IS STEVEN RAVAGLIOLI AND ROE 2 IS RAVAGLIOLI REALTY
    Blank 31 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 Notice
    OF ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
      Blank 30 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: 5/9/2018 Partial Dismissal
      with Prejudice) (WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT NANCY MERRILL ONLY
        Blank 29 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 Default Entered
        MATT DONALDSON
          Blank 28 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 Order
          ON GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
            Blank 27 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Notice Of Ruling
            BY DEFENDANT
              Blank 26 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 Notice of Continuance
                Blank 25 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 Receipt
                CIVIL DEPOSIT JURY FEE OF $150 PAID BY DEFENDANT RECEIPT# CCH465980067
                  Blank 24 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 Notice
                  OF POSTING JURY FEES
                    Blank 23 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: 4/5/2018 Statement-Case Management
                    BY DEFENDANT
                      Blank 22 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 Declaration
                      OF PUBLICATION BY PLAINTIFF
                        Blank 21 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 Joinder
                        PLAINTIFFS PAUL ACHIRO AND DANA ACHIRO'S JOINDER IN APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
                          Blank 20 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Motion
                          FOR ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT
                            Blank 19 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Notice of Continuance
                            OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OTHER ORDERS
                              Blank 18 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018 Notice
                              OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
                                Blank 17 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018 Appl for Pub of Summons/Cit/Ntc
                                MATT DONALDSON
                                  Blank 16 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: 2/22/2018 Order for Publication
                                  MATT DONALDSON
                                    Blank 15 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/13/2018 Statement-Case Management
                                    BY DEFENDANTS
                                      Blank 14 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Notice of Continuance
                                      OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Proof of Service
                                        OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS WITH DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Summons Filed
                                          BY CROSS-COMPLAINANT
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Statement-Case Management
                                            BY DEFENDANT
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Statement-Case Management
                                              BY DEFENDANT
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Answer
                                                BY DEFENDANTS
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Statement-Case Management
                                                  BY PLAINTIFF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Cross Complaint
                                                    OF BEACHSIDE REALTORS DBA: COLDWELL BANKER BEACHSIDE REALTORS AND GEARY M. SMITH
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 Complaint
                                                      CIVIL DEPOSIT JURY FEE OF $150 PAID BY PLAINTIFF RECEIPT# CCH524880090
                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                        PARTY SERVED: COLDWELL BANKER
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                          PARTY SERVED: GARY M. SMITH
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: 11/8/2017 Amendment to Complaint
                                                            INCORRECT NAME OF EAGLE RESTORATION AND TRUE NAME: BRENNAN W. WIGHTON DBA EAGLE RESTORATION
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: 11/8/2017 OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: 11/7/2017 Notice-Case Management Conference

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?