Jerry Smith v. Sonya L Simpson et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC684076

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 30, 2018 at 3:44 PM DT (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo 4021 Kenway Avenue Llc, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paino Brian A..
No Logo Asset Resolution Consulting Company Llc, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paino Brian A..
No Logo Chicago Title Company, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paino Brian A..
No Logo Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paino Brian A..
No Logo Simpson Sonya L. Individually And As, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paino Brian A..
No Logo The Bank Of New York Trust Company, NA, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paino Brian A..
No Logo Western Progresive Llc, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paino Brian A..
No Logo Western Progressive LLC, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paino Brian A..
No Logo Wmc Mortgage Corporation, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paino Brian A..
No Logo Smith, Jerry, Plaintiff & Plaintiff in Pro Per
Type Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 24 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Notice-Related Cases
    Blank 23 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Notice Of Ruling
      Blank 22 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 Substitution of Attorney
        Blank 21 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Brief
          Blank 20 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Notice of Continuance
            Blank 19 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: 3/21/2018 Statement-Case Management
              Blank 18 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: 3/21/2018 Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail
                Blank 17 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: 3/21/2018 Answer
                  Blank 16 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Substitution of Attorney
                    Blank 15 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Statement-Case Management
                      Blank 14 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Declaration
                        Blank 13 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 Request For Judicial Notice
                          Blank 12 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 Demurrer
                          TO FAC
                            Blank 11 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Notice of Continuance
                              Blank 10 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Proof of Service
                                Blank 9 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: 1/10/2018 Declaration
                                DEFT WESTERN PROGRESSIVE TRUSTEE, LLC, DBA WESTERN PROGRESSIVE, LLC'S DECLARATION OF NONMONETARY STATUS
                                  Blank 8 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: 1/10/2018 Receipt
                                  CIVIL DEPOSIT .... 1ST APPEARANCE
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017 response
                                    TO VERIFIED COMPLIANT
                                      Blank 6 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017 Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017 Substitution of Attorney
                                          Blank 4 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                            Blank 3 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
                                              Blank 2 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Complaint
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Notice
                                                LIS PENDENS

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?