Porsche Leasing Ltd et al v. Christopher Usude
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC693933

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 30, 2018 at 11:39 PM DT (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bentley Financial Services, Plaintiff/Petitioner's DBA
No Logo Does 1 To 10, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Usude Christopher, Defendant/Respondent
Porsche Financial Services, Inc. Porsche Financial Services, Inc., Plaintiff/Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Miller, Stacey A.
No Logo Porsche Leasing Ltd, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Miller, Stacey A.
Type Other Promissory Note/Collections (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 04/18/2018
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Request and Entry of Dismissal
ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (MAILED
    Blank 4 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Proof-Service/Summons
      Blank 3 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: 2/22/2018 OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
        Blank 2 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: 2/22/2018 Notice-Case Management Conference
          Blank 1 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 Complaint

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 2 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?