Kelley v. Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-01774

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 24, 2019 at 12:35 PM DT (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Julie Kelley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Behnke, Martin & Schulte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen D. Behnke +1 937 435 7500 +1 937 435 7511 sbehnke@legaldayton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright & Schulte - Cleveland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Jacob A. Gebelle +1 937 435 7500 +1 937 435 7511 jgebelle@yourlegalhelp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis P Mulvihill +1 216 591 0133 +1 216 591 0622 dmulvihill@yourlegalhelp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Schulte +1 937 435 7500 +1 937 435 7511 rschulte@yourlegalhelp.com
No Logo Michael Kelley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Behnke, Martin & Schulte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen D. Behnke +1 937 435 7500 +1 937 435 7511 sbehnke@legaldayton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright & Schulte - Cleveland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Jacob A. Gebelle +1 937 435 7500 +1 937 435 7511 jgebelle@yourlegalhelp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis P Mulvihill +1 216 591 0133 +1 216 591 0622 dmulvihill@yourlegalhelp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Schulte +1 937 435 7500 +1 937 435 7511 rschulte@yourlegalhelp.com
v.
No Logo Insys Manufacturing, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlton Fields, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam P. Schwartz +1 813 229 4336 +1 813 229 4133 aschwartz@carltonfields.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spengler Nathanson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gerald R. Kowalski +1 419 241 2201 +1 419 241 8599 gkowalski@snlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah K. Skow +1 419 241 2201 +1 419 241 8599 sskow@snlaw.com
No Logo Insys Pharma, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlton Fields, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam P. Schwartz +1 813 229 4336 +1 813 229 4133 aschwartz@carltonfields.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spengler Nathanson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gerald R. Kowalski +1 419 241 2201 +1 419 241 8599 gkowalski@snlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah K. Skow +1 419 241 2201 +1 419 241 8599 sskow@snlaw.com
Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlton Fields, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam P. Schwartz +1 813 229 4336 +1 813 229 4133 aschwartz@carltonfields.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spengler Nathanson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gerald R. Kowalski +1 419 241 2201 +1 419 241 8599 gkowalski@snlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah K. Skow +1 419 241 2201 +1 419 241 8599 sskow@snlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Extension (of deadlines)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Reply in support of 6 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Insys Manufacturing, LLC, Insys Pharma, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc.. (Schwartz, Adam) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Opposition to 6 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and alternative Motion to Amend Complete filed by All Plaintiffs. (Behnke, Stephen) Modified text on 11/18/2018 (M,L). (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Attorney Appearance by Stephen D. Behnke filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Behnke, Stephen) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      FILING ERROR: Refiled as 11 Attorney Appearance of Stephen D. Behnke. Modified on 10/19/2018. (B,JL) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Insys Therapeutics, Inc. for Insys Manufacturing, LLC filed by Insys Manufacturing, LLC. (Skow, Sarah) Modified corporate parents on 11/5/2018 (M,L). (Entered: 10/02/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Insys Therapeutics, Inc. for Insys Pharma, Inc. filed by Insys Pharma, Inc. (Skow, Sarah) Modified corporate parents on 11/5/2018 (M,L). (Entered: 10/02/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Insys Therapeutics, Inc. (Skow, Sarah) Modified filers on 11/5/2018 (M,L). (Entered: 10/02/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Dismiss
                              Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Insys Manufacturing, LLC, Insys Pharma, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Insys' Motion to Dismiss)(Skow, Sarah)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: 9/11/2018 Extension (answer complaint)
                                Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 09/21/18 to answer filed by Insys Manufacturing, LLC, Insys Pharma, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc.. (Skow, Sarah)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                  Motion for attorney Adam P. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8874675, filed by Insys Manufacturing, LLC, Insys Pharma, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Adam Schwartz, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Admission PHV - Adam Schwartz)(Skow, Sarah)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Extension of Deadlines
                                    Unopposed Motion for extension of Deadline to Respond to Complaint until 09/14/18 filed by Insys Manufacturing, LLC, Insys Pharma, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc. (Skow, Sarah)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 notice of removal
                                        Notice of Removal from Common Pleas Court of Erie County, Ohio, case number 2018 CV 0395 with jury demand. Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8834262, filed by Insys Pharma, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Insys Manufacturing, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Docket Sheet, # 2 Exhibit B - Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Skow, Sarah)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Order [non-document] of Status Conference held on 10/30/18. Time: 30 Minutes. Reply to defendant's motion to dismiss (Doc 6 ) due by November 20, 2018. Case to be designated as complex. Deadline for the parties to exchange discovery pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 to be held in abeyance pending the adjudication of defendant's motion to dismiss. Counsel for the parties are to work cooperatively to expedite the process for discovery, in the event the motion to dismiss should be overruled in part. Further proceedings held in abeyance pending adjudication of the motion to dismiss. Judge James G. Carr on 11/2/18. (C,D)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Notice [non-document] of Initial Status Conference set for 10/30/2018 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge James G. Carr. The court will initiate the call to the numbers indicated on the docket unless alternate contact information has been provided to JudgeCarr_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov prior to the conference. Related document(s) 6, 1 . (C,D)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Adam P. Schwartz for Insys Manufacturing, LLC, Insys Pharma, Inc. and for Insys Therapeutics, Inc.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc # 4 ). Judge James G. Carr on 10/18/18.(C,D)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Order [non-document] granting 3 Motion for extension of Deadline to Respond to Complaint until 09/14/18. Judge James G. Carr on 8/17/18.(C,D)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Notice to Attorney Jacob A. Gebelle. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) 1 . (P,WL)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (M,TL)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,TL)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?