Ye Andrew Duan v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC701295

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 31, 2018 at 6:57 PM DT (3.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dere Tsu Insurance And Fianancial Service, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Shaver Korff & Castronovo LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space O'neill, Michael J
No Logo Does 1 To 20, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Shaver Korff & Castronovo LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space O'neill, Michael J
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Inc. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Inc., Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance"

Toggle Switch Represented by Shaver Korff & Castronovo LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space O'neill, Michael J
No Logo Duan Ye Andrew, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lin David S..
Type Ins Coverage (not Complex) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: 6/20/2018 Stipulation and Order
TO CONTINUE THE UPCOMING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET IN THIS ACTION
    Blank 6 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/19/2018 Answer
      Blank 5 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Receipt
        Blank 4 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Answer
          Blank 3 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Notice-Case Management Conference
            Blank 2 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 Proof-Service/Summons
              Blank 1 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Complaint

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 0 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?