Viray v. Saba
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-04634

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 20, 2018 at 4:18 PM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1442
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/9/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
      CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER.Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 6/6/2019 09:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2019 01:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 10/25/2019, 10/28/2019 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 10/28/2019, 10/29/2019, 10/30/2019, 10/31/2019, 11/1/2019, 11/4/2019, 11/5/2019, 11/6/2019, 11/7/2019, 11/8/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman.Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/29/2018. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
        ORDER GRANTING 7 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/27/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None notice of removal
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?