LEEDER v. FEINSTEIN
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-12384

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 8, 2021 at 3:53 PM DT (1.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo YISROEL MEIR LEEDER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Avram E. Frisch LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Avram Eliezer Frisch +1 201 289 5352 +1 201 443 1339 frischa@avifrischlaw.com
v.
No Logo 726 41ST LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COURT PLAZA NORTH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA +1 201 342 6770 ndoria@dorialegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sragow & Sragow

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Allen Phillip Sragow +1 310 639 0782 +1 310 639 7210 a.sragow@sragowlawfirm.com
No Logo AM DISPLAY DIST. INC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COURT PLAZA NORTH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA +1 201 342 6770 ndoria@dorialegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sragow & Sragow

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Allen Phillip Sragow +1 310 639 0782 +1 310 639 7210 a.sragow@sragowlawfirm.com
No Logo AMBER CAPITAL, Defendant
No Logo ARON WASSERLAUF, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COURT PLAZA NORTH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA +1 201 342 6770 ndoria@dorialegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sragow & Sragow

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Allen Phillip Sragow +1 310 639 0782 +1 310 639 7210 a.sragow@sragowlawfirm.com
No Logo AYN OD MILVADO LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 305

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David J. Fryman +1 212 678 0405 +1 212 678 0405 david@gulkoschwed.com
No Logo CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COURT PLAZA NORTH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA +1 201 342 6770 ndoria@dorialegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sragow & Sragow

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Allen Phillip Sragow +1 310 639 0782 +1 310 639 7210 a.sragow@sragowlawfirm.com
No Logo CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COURT PLAZA NORTH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA +1 201 342 6770 ndoria@dorialegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sragow & Sragow

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Allen Phillip Sragow +1 310 639 0782 +1 310 639 7210 a.sragow@sragowlawfirm.com
No Logo CHAVIVA FEINSTEIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CHAVIVA FEINSTEIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHAVIVA FEINSTEIN
No Logo DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COURT PLAZA NORTH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA +1 201 342 6770 ndoria@dorialegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sragow & Sragow

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Allen Phillip Sragow +1 310 639 0782 +1 310 639 7210 a.sragow@sragowlawfirm.com
No Logo GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COURT PLAZA NORTH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA +1 201 342 6770 ndoria@dorialegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sragow & Sragow

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Allen Phillip Sragow +1 310 639 0782 +1 310 639 7210 a.sragow@sragowlawfirm.com
No Logo IADVANCEU LLC, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOES 1-30, Defendant
No Logo KASTNER'S MARKET, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COURT PLAZA NORTH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA +1 201 342 6770 ndoria@dorialegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sragow & Sragow

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Allen Phillip Sragow +1 310 639 0782 +1 310 639 7210 a.sragow@sragowlawfirm.com
No Logo KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COURT PLAZA NORTH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA +1 201 342 6770 ndoria@dorialegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sragow & Sragow

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Allen Phillip Sragow +1 310 639 0782 +1 310 639 7210 a.sragow@sragowlawfirm.com
No Logo LIAM DOE, Defendant
No Logo NISSIM OHAYON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 305

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David J. Fryman +1 212 678 0405 +1 212 678 0405 david@gulkoschwed.com
No Logo SAPPHIRE FUNDING LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowenstein Sandler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY R. SCOTT THOMPSON +1 973 597 2500 +1 973 597 2533 sthompson@lowenstein.com
No Logo SHLOMO YEHUDA FEINSTEIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowenstein Sandler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY R. SCOTT THOMPSON +1 973 597 2500 +1 973 597 2533 sthompson@lowenstein.com
No Logo UHCS, INC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COURT PLAZA NORTH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/24/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA +1 201 342 6770 ndoria@dorialegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sragow & Sragow

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Allen Phillip Sragow +1 310 639 0782 +1 310 639 7210 a.sragow@sragowlawfirm.com
No Logo MOSHE FEINSTEIN, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MOSHE FEINSTEIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MOSHE FEINSTEIN
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1964
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (113) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal (aty)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal (aty)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal (aty)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Default Judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/24/2021, Entered: None Order on Report and Recommendations
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: None Application/Petition
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal (aty)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Remark
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by SHLOMO YEHUDA FEINSTEIN, SAPPHIRE FUNDING LLC re 50 MOTION to Dismiss (THOMPSON, R.) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by SHLOMO YEHUDA FEINSTEIN, SAPPHIRE FUNDING LLC re 46 MOTION to Dismiss and for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 11 (THOMPSON, R.) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        DECLARATION of Avram E. Frisch re 50 MOTION to Dismiss, 46 MOTION to Dismiss and for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 11 regarding service on Non-ECF defendants by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. (FRISCH, AVRAM) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re 50 MOTION to Dismiss (FRISCH, AVRAM) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re 46 MOTION to Dismiss and for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 11 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exh A to Frisch Decl)(FRISCH, AVRAM) (Entered: 12/23/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER that the time within Defendant Feinstein must respond to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint is extended to 1/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/18/2018. (mmh) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re 50 MOTION to Dismiss . (FRISCH, AVRAM) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Set Aside Default [ECF No. 34 ] is GRANTED; that Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment [ECF No. 20 ] is DISMISSED as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/20/2018. (mmh) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss by 726 41ST LLC, AM DISPLAY DIST. INC, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, KASTNER'S MARKET, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF. Responses due by 12/26/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(SRAGOW, ALLEN) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 12/18/2018 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please do not e-file. Please e-mail this document to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov(ce3) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND, CROSSCLAIM against MOSHE FEINSTEIN by AYN OD MILVADO LLC, NISSIM OHAYON.(FRYMAN/, DAVID) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re 46 MOTION to Dismiss and for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 11 . (FRISCH, AVRAM) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss and for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 11 by SHLOMO YEHUDA FEINSTEIN, SAPPHIRE FUNDING LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, # 2 Brief in Support of Motion Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 11 for Sanctions, # 3 Certification of R. Scott Thompson, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(THOMPSON, R.) (Entered: 11/12/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Request for Default by All Plaintiffs against Shlomo Yehuda Feinstein and Sapphire Funding LLC. (FRISCH, AVRAM) (Entered: 11/12/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Letter. (BOYER, LEONARD) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re 34 MOTION to Set Aside Default (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(FRISCH, AVRAM) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by R. SCOTT THOMPSON on behalf of SHLOMO YEHUDA FEINSTEIN, SAPPHIRE FUNDING LLC (THOMPSON, R.) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      CONSENT ORDER that the time within which Defendants may respond to the Complaint is extended to 11/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/5/2018. (mmh) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE by SHLOMO YEHUDA FEINSTEIN, SAPPHIRE FUNDING LLC (Attachments: # 1 Certification Certification of R. Scott Thompson, Esq., # 2 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 3 Brief Brief in Support of Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.11 for Sanctions, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Order)(THOMPSON, R.) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          APPLICATION/PETITION for Consent Order Extending time to respond to Complaint for by AM DISPLAY DIST. INC, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, KASTNER'S MARKET, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF. (SRAGOW, ALLEN) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Aron Wasserlauf A/K/A Mr. Wasser; Kastner's Market; Kosher Delight LLC; Double Decker Deli, LLC; Capri Ristorante LLC; 726 41st LLC; Group Eighteen, Inc; Am Display Dist. Inc.; UHCS, Inc; and Carlos & Gabbys Miami.. (SRAGOW, ALLEN) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by All Plaintiffs re 34 MOTION to Set Aside Default (FRISCH, AVRAM) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/24/2018. (mmh) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  CONSENT ORDER that the Ohayon Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint is extended to 11/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/22/2018. (mmh) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Set Aside Default by AMBER CAPITAL, CHAVIVA FEINSTEIN, MOSHE FEINSTEIN, IADVANCEU LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(mmh) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Letter from David J. Fryman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(FRYMAN/, DAVID) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J. FRYMAN/ on behalf of AYN OD MILVADO LLC, NISSIM OHAYON (FRYMAN/, DAVID) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          CONSENT ORDER that the time for Defendants to respond to the Complaint is extended to 11/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/17/2018. (mmh) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (THOMPSON, R.) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              APPLICATION/PETITION for Consent Order Extending time to respond to Complaint for by 726 41ST LLC, AM DISPLAY DIST. INC, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, KASTNER'S MARKET, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF. (SRAGOW, ALLEN) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. SHLOMO YEHUDA FEINSTEIN served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018; SAPPHIRE FUNDING LLC served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. (FRISCH, AVRAM) (Entered: 10/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. AYN OD MILVADO LLC served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018; NISSIM OHAYON served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (FRISCH, AVRAM) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER that the time for Defendants Aron Wasserlauf A/K/A Mr. Wasser, Kastner's Market; Kosher Delight, LLC; Double Decker Deli, LLC; Capri Ristorante LLC; 726 41 ST LLC; Group Eighteen, Inc.; AM Display Dist. Inc.; UHCS, Inc; Carlos & Gabby's Miami to respond to the Complaint is extended to 10/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/20/2018. (mmh) Modified on 10/3/2018 for spelling (eaj). (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION in Support filed by 726 41ST LLC, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, KASTNER'S MARKET, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, SAPPHIRE FUNDING LLC, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF re 23 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Nicholas R. Doria (DORIA, NICHOLAS) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney NIcholas R. Doria by 726 41ST LLC, AMBER CAPITAL, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, KASTNER'S MARKET, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, SAPPHIRE FUNDING LLC, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF. (DORIA, NICHOLAS) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Nicholas R. Doria by 726 41ST LLC, AM DISPLAY DIST. INC, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, KASTNER'S MARKET, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF. (DORIA, NICHOLAS) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION/PETITION for Consent Order Extending time to respond to Complaint for by 726 41ST LLC, AM DISPLAY DIST. INC, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, KASTNER'S MARKET, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order)(SRAGOW, ALLEN) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by ALLEN PHILIP SRAGOW on behalf of 726 41ST LLC, AM DISPLAY DIST. INC, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, KASTNER'S MARKET, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF (SRAGOW, ALLEN) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Motion for Default Judgment by All Plaintiffs against Moshe Feinstein; Chaviva Feinstein, Amber Capital, and IAdvanceU, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - listing of advances, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - MOE SCRA, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Chaviva SCRA)(FRISCH, AVRAM) Modified per Chambers on 9/21/2018 (mmh). (Entered: 09/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Request for Default by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER against Moshe Feinstein; Chaviva Feinstein, Amber Capital, and IAdvanceU, LLC. (FRISCH, AVRAM) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on IAdvanceU LLC on August 23, 2018, filed by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. (FRISCH, AVRAM) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Amber Capital on August 23, 2018, filed by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. (FRISCH, AVRAM) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Chaviva Feinstein on August 23, 2018, filed by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. (FRISCH, AVRAM) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Moshe Feinstein a/k/a/ Moe Feinstein on August 23, 2018, filed by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. (FRISCH, AVRAM) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to 726 41ST LLC, AM DISPLAY DIST. INC, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, KASTNER'S MARKET, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF.. (DORIA, NICHOLAS)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA on behalf of 726 41ST LLC, AM DISPLAY DIST. INC, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, KASTNER'S MARKET, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF (DORIA, NICHOLAS)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: Motion Hearing held via telephone on 8/15/2018 re: 3 Ex Parte MOTIONS for Temporary Restraining Order, for Preliminary Injunction, and for Writ of attachment filed by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. Ordered motion denied.Order filed. (Court Reporter: MCKAY-SOULE.) (eh, ) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 3 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 8/15/2018. (km)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER granting 9 Letter request. Counsel for Plaintiff may appear by phone for hearing on 8/15/2018 at 11:00am. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 8/14/2018. (eh, ) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Avram E. Frisch re 8 Order,. (FRISCH, AVRAM)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          CORRECTED TEXT ORDER scheduling a hearing for 8/15/18 at 11:00am before Judge Brian R. Martiontti in Trenton - Courtroom 1 re: 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, for Preliminary Injunction, and for Writ of attachment by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 8/14/2018. (eh, ) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 Amended Document (NOT Motion/Complaint)
                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED DOCUMENT by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. Amendment to 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Ex Parte MOTION for Writ of attachment Corrected OTSC. (FRISCH, AVRAM)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER scheduling a hearing re: 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, for Preliminary Injunction, and for Writ of attachment by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. Plaintiff is directed to submit a new proposed order to show cause with a corrected caption. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 8/14/2018. (eh, ) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti for all further proceedings. Judge Freda L. Wolfson no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 8/14/18. (mem, ) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Freda L. Wolfson for all further proceedings. Judge Anne E. Thompson no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 8/14/2018. (jjc) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, Ex Parte MOTION for Writ of attachment by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Brief)(FRISCH, AVRAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: 8/2/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS ISSUED as to 726 41ST LLC, AM DISPLAY DIST. INC, AMBER CAPITAL, AYN OD MILVADO LLC, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, LIAM DOE, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, CHAVIVA FEINSTEIN, MOSHE FEINSTEIN, SHLOMO YEHUDA FEINSTEIN, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, IADVANCEU LLC, KASTNER'S MARKET, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, NISSIM OHAYON, SAPPHIRE FUNDING LLC, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jem)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: 8/2/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against 726 41ST LLC, AM DISPLAY DIST. INC, AMBER CAPITAL, AYN OD MILVADO LLC, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, LIAM DOE, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, CHAVIVA FEINSTEIN, MOSHE FEINSTEIN, SHLOMO YEHUDA FEINSTEIN, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, IADVANCEU LLC, JOHN DOES 1-30, KASTNER'S MARKET, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, NISSIM OHAYON, SAPPHIRE FUNDING LLC, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8927708) with JURY DEMAND, filed by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(FRISCH, AVRAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/18/2018. (ce3)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearings: The Initial Conference set for 12/18/2018 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert HAS BEEN CONVERTED TO A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE. Mr. Frisch is responsible for setting up and initiating the call. (ce3)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Reset Deadlines as to 50 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion reset for 1/7/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines as to 50 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 12/17/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Reset Deadlines as to 46 MOTION to Dismiss and for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 11. Motion reset for 1/7/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. **Please note that this Motion was incorrectly set by the Clerk for 12/3/2018 and it should have been set for 12/17/2018, therefore the Rule 7.1 request is granted to the next Motion day beyond 12/17/2018. (mmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines as to 46 MOTION to Dismiss and for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 11. Motion set for 12/3/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Default submitted by Avram Frisch on 11/12/2018 cannot be granted by the Clerk as requested because an appearance has been made and a responsive pleading has been filed on the behalf of these Defendants. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You may apply to the Court for relief. (mmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The 40 Motion to Dismiss filed by R. Thompson on 11/5/2018 was submitted incorrectly as a Notice (Other). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Motion to Dismiss USING Motion to Dismiss found under Civil - Motions and Related Filings - Motions. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The 38 Proposed Consent Order submitted by Allen Sragow on 11/2/2018 was submitted incorrectly as an Application for a Clerk's Extension and must be executed by a Judicial Officer before filing. Please forward to the appropriate Judicial Officer in accordance with his/her preferred practice as found on our website. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The 39 Proposed Consent Order submitted by Allen Sragow on 11/2/2018 was submitted incorrectly as an Application/Petition and must be executed by a Judicial Officer before filing. As previously advised, please forward to the appropriate Judicial Officer in accordance with his/her preferred practice as found on our website: http://www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/douglas-e-arpert. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reset Deadlines as to 34 MOTION to Set Aside Default. Motion reset for 12/3/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines as to 34 MOTION to Set Aside Default. Motion set for 11/19/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that although an individual is entitled to proceed pro se, a corporation must be represented by counsel. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (mmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Clerk`s Text Order - The document 30 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SAPPHIRE FUNDING LLC, SHLOMO YEHUDA FEINSTEIN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/8/2018. (mmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines as to 20 MOTION for Default Judgment. Motion set for 10/15/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines as to 23 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Nicholas R. Doria. Motion set for 10/15/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The 24 Supplemental Certification filed by Nicholas Doria on 9/19/2018 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Supplemental Certification USING Certification in Support of Motion found under Civil - Motions and Related Filings - Responses and Replies. The deadlines created by this filing have been terminated. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          VACATED Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Moshe Feinstein, Chaviva Feinstein, Amber Capital, and IAdvanceU, LLC for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (mmh) Modified on 12/13/2018 (eaj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Moshe Feinstein, Chaviva Feinstein, Amber Capital, and IAdvanceU, LLC for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (mmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Clerk`s Text Order - The document 14 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by 726 41ST LLC, KASTNER'S MARKET, AM DISPLAY DIST. INC, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, UHCS, INC, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, ARON WASSERLAUF has been DENIED as being out of time pursuant to FRCP 4 which allows a party 21 days to file an answer and time expired on 9/11/2018. This application will be forwarded to Chambers for review. (mmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jem)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 168 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?