GARCIA v. POMPEO
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01822

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 5, 2021 at 9:45 PM DT (1.8 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GUSTAVO GARCIA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Security Counselors

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly Brian McClanahan +1 301 728 5908 +1 240 681 2189 kel@nationalsecuritylaw.org
v.
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF STATE"
Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III, Defendant
Officially listed as "JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III"
United States Department of Justice Attorney General, United States Department of Justice, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
United States of America Attorney General, United States of America, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL POMPEO"
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e
Nature of Suit 330 - Personal Injury: Federal Employer's Liability
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Continue
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/17/2021, Entered: None Amend/Correct
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Redacted Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None Modify
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Meet and Confer Statement
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Surreply
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/24/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/23/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE, MICHAEL POMPEO, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III with Jury Demand filed by GUSTAVO GARCIA. (Attachments: # 1 Redlined FAC)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/10/18. (lctnm1)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA
                                                                                                              SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, MICHAEL POMPEO, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE, MICHAEL POMPEO, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5619172) filed by Gustavo Garcia. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(McClanahan, Kelly)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?