Lasch v. Atrium Medical Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Hampshire District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00683

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 21, 2020 at 6:27 PM ST (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Judy Lasch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy R Fleishman +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 wfleishman@lchb.com
No Logo Roger Lasch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy R Fleishman +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 wfleishman@lchb.com
v.
No Logo Atrium Medical Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman Senterfitt LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Enjolique D. Aytch +1 954 463 2700 enjolique.aytch@akerman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Hugh J. Turner, Jr. +1 954 463 2700 +1 954 463 2224 hugh.turner@akerman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wadleigh Starr & Peters PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Pierre A,. Chabot +1 603 206 7204 pchabot@wadleighlaw.com
No Logo Getinge AB, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman Senterfitt LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Enjolique D. Aytch +1 954 463 2700 enjolique.aytch@akerman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Hugh J. Turner, Jr. +1 954 463 2700 +1 954 463 2224 hugh.turner@akerman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wadleigh Starr & Peters PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Pierre A,. Chabot +1 603 206 7204 pchabot@wadleighlaw.com
No Logo Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman Senterfitt LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Enjolique D. Aytch +1 954 463 2700 enjolique.aytch@akerman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Hugh J. Turner, Jr. +1 954 463 2700 +1 954 463 2224 hugh.turner@akerman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wadleigh Starr & Peters PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Pierre A,. Chabot +1 603 206 7204 pchabot@wadleighlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None Attorney Withdrawal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Attorney Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Attorney Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Motion to Extend Jurisdictional Briefing Deadlines filed by Atrium Medical Corporation, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al.(Turner, Hugh) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Extend Time
            Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY DEADLINE filed by Atrium Medical Corporation, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al.(Turner, Hugh) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None MDL Transfer Order (in)
              ORDER MDL Transfer In No. CTO-10. Conditional transfer of case: New Jersey, 2:18-cv-11832. (de) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 3G (Enabling Order for PPF, PFS, DPF, DFS and Joint Records Collection). So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None transcript
                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Telephone Conference held on 8/16/2018. Court Reporter: Sandra Bailey, Telephone # 603 225-1454. Transcript is available for public inspection, but may not be copied or otherwise reproduced, at the Clerk's Office for a period of 90 days. Additionally, only attorneys of record and pro se parties with an ECF login and password who purchase a transcript from the court reporter will have access to the transcript through PACER during this 90-day period. If you would like to order a copy, please contact the court reporter at the above listed phone number.NOTICE: Any party who requests an original transcript has 21 days from service of this notice to determine whether it is necessary to redact any personal identifiers and, if so, to electronically file a Redaction Request. Redaction Request Follow Up 9/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Follow Up 9/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2018.(de) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: 8/17/2018 waiver of service executed
                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. (Aytch, Enjolique)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                      NOTICE of PLAINTIFFS' AND DEFENDANTS' JOINT AGENDA FOR THE STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 16, 2018 by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Revised Plaintiffs' Fact Sheet)(Turner, Hugh) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Extend Time
                        Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to JOINT MOTION TO AMEND PROCEDURAL ORDER AND TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING filed by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al.(Turner, Hugh) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                          NOTICE of Notice of Initial Discovery Pool Selections by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC.(Turner, Hugh) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 Complaint - New Case
                            NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1693789 filed by Roger Lasch, Judy Lasch. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fleishman, Wendy)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 7 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?