Tunica-Biloxi Tribe of Louisiana v. Purdue Pharma L P
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Western District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01008

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 8, 2018 at 2:58 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tunica-Biloxi Tribe of Louisiana, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derrick Glenn Earles +1 318 777 7777 +1 318 253 7757 digger@onmyside.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C Laborde +1 337 261 2617 +1 337 261 1934 david@onmyside.com

Toggle Switch Represented by onmyside.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Madeleine Renee Brumley +1 337 210 1955 +1 337 261 1934 madeleine@onmyside.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simmons Hanly Conroy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L Fitzpatrick +1 212 784 6400 +1 212 213 5949 lsingletary@simmonsfirm.com
v.
No Logo Actavis L L C, Defendant
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Allergan Finance L L C, Defendant
No Logo Allergan P L C, Defendant
No Logo AmerisourceBergen Corp, Defendant
No Logo C V S Health Corp, Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo H D Smith Holding Co, Defendant
No Logo H D Smith Holdings L L C, Defendant
No Logo H D Smith L L C, Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Kroger Co, Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "McKesson Corp"
No Logo MIAMI-LUKEN, INC., Defendant
No Logo Noramco, Inc., Defendant
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Purdue Frederick Co Inc, Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
No Logo RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
Wal-mart, Inc. Wal-mart, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Order for Multi-District Litigation (MDL) Transfer
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Notice from MDL Transmitting Transfer/Remand Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Case Management Order - Judges Drell, Doughty, James
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Case Management Order - Judges Drell, Doughty, JamesCourt Filing
          CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 10/5/2018.)(crt,Roaix, G) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
            NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: 1 Complaint sent to Madeleine Renee Brumley on behalf of Tunica-Biloxi Tribe of Louisiana. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/21/2018. (crt,Putch, A)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018 Summons Issued - All (Form Included)
              SUMMONS ISSUED as to Actavis L L C, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan Finance L L C, Allergan P L C, AmerisourceBergen Corp, C V S Health Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, H D Smith Holding Co, H D Smith Holdings L L C, H D Smith L L C, Insys Therapeutics Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Kroger Co, Mallinckrodt L L C, Mallinckrodt P L C, McKesson Corp, Miami-Luken Inc, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Co Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L P, Rite Aid of Maryland Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc, Wal-Mart Inc, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (crt,Putch, A)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018 Complaint
                COMPLAINT against Purdue Pharma L P, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Frederick Co Inc, Allergan P L C, Allergan Finance L L C, Watson Laboratories Inc, Actavis L L C, Actavis Pharma Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc, Cephalon Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Noramco Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Insys Therapeutics Inc, Mallinckrodt P L C, Mallinckrodt L L C, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp, AmerisourceBergen Corp, C V S Health Corp, Kroger Co, Rite Aid of Maryland Inc, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Wal-Mart Inc, H D Smith L L C, H D Smith Holdings L L C, H D Smith Holding Co, Miami-Luken Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3719935) filed by Tunica-Biloxi Tribe of Louisiana. (Attachments: # 1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Madeleine Renee Brumley added to party Tunica-Biloxi Tribe of Louisiana)(aty,Brumley, Madeleine) Modified on 8/7/2018 to edit text (Putch, A).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 22 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?