United States v. Collins
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cr-00567-VSB

Tags
Last Updated February 11, 2019 at 4:48 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Wood Allen +1 212 637 2216 robert.allen@usdoj.gov
Space Scott Andrew Hartman +1 212 637 2357 +1 212 637 2527 scott.hartman@usdoj.gov
Space Max Clement Nicholas +1 212 637 1565 max.nicholas@usdoj.gov
Space A. Damian Williams +1 212 637 2290 damian.williams@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Christopher Collins, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan R. Barr +1 202 861 1534 +1 202 861 1783 jbarr@bakerlaw.com
Space Jonathan Adam Forman +1 212 847 2855 jforman@bakerlaw.com
Space Kendall Eugene Wangsgard +1 202 861 1751 kwangsgard@bakerlaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Christopher Collins (1)
Office Foley Square
Filed 8/7/2018
County NewYork
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT SECURITIES FRAUD
Count 10
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343.F WIRE FRAUD
Count 11
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1001.F
Offense Level 4
181001.F FALSE STATEMENTS
Count 2-8
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78J.F
Offense Level 4
1578J.F SECURITIES FRAUD
Count 9
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT WIRE FRAUD
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 54 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Christopher Collins. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 12/14/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Christopher Collins re: Conference held on 12/14/18 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/17/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2019. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER 49 LETTER MOTION Defendant Stephen Zarsky's Waiver of Appearance for December 18, 2018 Status Conference. Pursuant to Rule 43 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, Defendant StephenZarsky waives his right to be present in open court for the December 18, 2018 Status Conference. Mr. Zarsky requests that the Court proceed on December 18, 2018 in his absence; agreesthat his interests will be deemed represented by the presence of his attorneys, the same as if he were personally present; and further agrees to be present in Court ready for trial any date that the Court sets in his absence. Mr. Zarsky further acknowledges that he has been informed of his rights under Title 18 U.S.C. §§ 3161-3174 (Speedy Trial Act), and authorizes his attorneys to set times and delays under the Act without being personally present. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/14/2018) (jw) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER 47 LETTER MOTION Defendant Christopher Collins Waiver of Appearance for December 18, 2018 Status Conference as to Christopher Collins. Pursuant to Rule 43 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, Defendant Christopher Collins waives his right to be present in open court for the December 18, 2018 StatusConference.Rep. Collins requests that the Court proceed on December 18, 2018 in his absence; agrees that his interests will be deemed represented by the presence of his attorneys, the same as if he were personally present; and further agrees to be present in Court ready for trial any date that the Court sets in his absence. Rep. Collins further acknowledges that he has been informed of his rights under Title 18 U.S.C. §§ 3161-3174 (Speedy Trial Act), and authorizes his attorneys to set times and delays under the Act without being personally present. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/11/2018) (jw) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER 48 LETTER MOTION Defendant Cameron Collins's Waiver of Apperance for December 18, 2018, Status Conference as to Christopher Collins (1), Cameron Collins (2). Pursuant to Rule 43 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, Defendant Cameron Collins waives his right to be present in open court for the December 18, 2018, Status Conference. Mr. Collins requests that the Court proceed on December 18, 2018, in his absence; agrees that his interests will be deemed represented by the presence of his attorneys, the same as if he were personally present; and further agrees to be present in Court ready for trial on February 3, 2020, the date set by the Court at the last pretrial conference. Mr. Collins further acknowledges that he has been informed of his rights under Title 18 U.S.C. §§ 3161-3174 (Speedy Trial Act) and authorizes his attorneys to set times and delays under the Act without being personally present. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/11/18) (jw) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Mauro M. Wolfe dated December 14, 2018 re: Defendant Steven Zarsky's Request to be Excused from Appearing at the December 18, 2018 Status Conference . Document filed by Stephen Zarsky as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky. (Attachments: # 1 Defendant Stephen Zarsky's Waiver of Appearance fo Decemmber 18, 2018 Status Conference)(Wolfe, Mauro) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 45 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Notice of Filing Transcript
              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Christopher Collins. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/11/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                AMENDED LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Jonathan B. New dated December 12, 2018 re: Defendants' Request to be Excused from Appearing at the Status Conference . Document filed by Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins. (Attachments: # 1 Chris Collins - Waiver of Appearance, # 2 Cameron Collins - Waiver of Appearance, # 3 Text of Proposed Order re: Electronic Devices)(New, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Christopher Collins re: Conference held on 10/11/18 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Anita Trombetta, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2019. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    JOINT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Jonathan B. New dated December 12, 2018 re: Defendants' Request to be Excused from Appearing at the Status Conference . Document filed by Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins. (Attachments: # 1 Chris Collins - Waiver of Appearance, # 2 Cameron Collins - Waiver of Appearance)(New, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 43 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky. For the reasons stated on the record at the October 11, 2018 status conference, it is hereby: ORDERED that jury selection in this matter is scheduled to begin on February 3, 2020 at 10:00 a.m., with jury trial to begin thereafter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a final pretrial conference in this matter will be held on January 23, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pretrial motions are due on or before May 10, 2019, with the governments response due on or before July 19, 2019, and defendants' replies, if any, due on or before August 23, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any in limine motions be filed on or before January 6, 2020, with responses due on or before January 13, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any proposed voir dire questions, jury instructions, verdict forms or trial memoranda shall be filed on or before January 23, 2020. Two courtesy copies should be delivered to Chambers that same day. In addition, each party shall email those documents as Word documents to BroderickNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a conference regarding the status of discovery will be held on December 18, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. One week prior to the conference, the parties shall file a joint letter outlining any outstanding discovery disputes between the parties. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/17/2018)(bw)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 46 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        JOINT LETTER by Christopher Collins as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Jonathan B. New dated December 12, 2018 re: Parties' Positions on Outstanding Discovery Disputes in Advance of the December 18, 2018 Conference. Document filed by Christopher Collins. (New, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
                          LREF
                          Blank 42 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [28] Motion for Patrick Scribner Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Cameron Collins (2). (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/11/2018) (Broderick, Vernon)
                            LREF
                            Blank 41 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [26] Motion for Jonathan R. Barr to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher Collins (1). (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/11/2018) (Broderick, Vernon)
                              LREF
                              Blank  Status Conference
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vernon S. Broderick: Status Conference as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky held on 10/11/2018. AUSA Scott Hartman, Max Nicholas, and Damian Williams present for the government. Defendants appearance waived by cousel. Attorney Jonathan Barr, Jonathan New, and Kendall Wangsgard present for Christopher Collins. Attorney Thomas Hanusik, Rebecca Ricigliano, and Patrick Brown present for Cameron Collins. Attorney Amanda Bassen, and Mauro Wolfe present for Stephen Zarsky. Court Reporter present. Next Status conference scheduled for 12/18/2018 at 2:30 p.m. Jury trial scheduled for February 3, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Speedy trial time is excluded in the interest of justice between October 11, 2018 and December 18, 2018. (Jury Trial set for 2/3/2020 at 10:00 AM, Status Conference set for 12/18/2018 at 02:30 PM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick.) (jbo)
                                LREF
                                Blank  Order
                                ORDER as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky.. The status conference in this matter will be held in Courtroom 110, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/11/2018)(msa)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                  DEFENDANT STEPHEN ZARSKY'S WAIVER OF APPEARANCE FOR OCTOBER 11, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE as to Stephen Zarsky. Pursuant to Rule 43 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, Defendant Stephen Zarsky waives his right to be present in open court for the October 11, 2018 Status Conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/5/18)(jbo)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                    DEFENDANT CAMERON COLLINSS WAIVER OF APPEARANCE FOROCTOBER 11, 2018, STATUS CONFERENCE as to Cameron Collins. Pursuant to Rule 43 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, Defendant CameronCollins waives his right to be present in open court for the October 11, 2018, status conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/5/18)(jbo)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                      DEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER COLLINS' WAIVER OF APPEARANCE FOR OCTOBER 11, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE as to Christopher Collins. Pursuant to Rule 43 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, Defendant Christopher Collins waives his right to be present in open court for the October 11, 2018 Status Conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/5/18) (jbo)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                        Memo Endorsement granting [36] LETTER MOTION as to Christopher Collins (1), Cameron Collins (2), Stephen Zarsky (3)...ENDORSEMENT: Counsel is directed to email a completed electronic order form to my chambers inbox for approval to bring in their electronics for the October 11 status conference. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/5/18) (jbo)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: 10/4/2018, Terminated: 10/5/2018 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                          JOINT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Jonathan R. Barr dated October 4, 2018 re: Defendants' Request to be Excused from Appearing at the Status Conference . Document filed by Christopher Collins as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky. (Attachments: # (1) Chris Collins - Waiver of Appearance, # (2) Cameron Collins - Waiver of Appearance, # (3) Stephen Zarsky - Waiver of Appearance)(Barr, Jonathan)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                            Memo endorsement granting [27] Motion for Extension of Time as to Christopher Collins (1), Cameron Collins (2), Stephen Zarsky (3)...Endorsement: Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/1/18) (jbo)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 31 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Christopher Collins. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/8/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Christopher Collins re: Conference held on 8/8/18 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/11/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/23/2018) (ap)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018, Terminated: 10/11/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                    MOTION for Patrick Scribner Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15486067. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cameron Collins. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Affidavit of Patrick S. Brown, # (2) Exhibit Maryland Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Exhibit District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, # (4) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Brown, Patrick)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                      >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [28] MOTION for Patrick Scribner Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15486067. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018, Terminated: 10/1/2018 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                        CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Seek Bill of Particulars. Document filed by Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky. (New, Jonathan)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018, Terminated: 10/11/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                          MOTION for Jonathan R. Barr to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15459326. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Christopher Collins. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Jonathan R. Barr, # (2) Exhibit 1-Virginia Good Standing Certificate, # (3) Exhibit 2-District of Columbia Good Standing Certificate, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                            >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [26] MOTION for Jonathan R. Barr to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15459326. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathan Brian New appearing for Christopher Collins. Appearance Type: Retained. (New, Jonathan)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky on re: [18] LETTER by USA as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from AUSAs Scott Hartman, Max Nicholas, Damian Williams dated 8/10/2018 re: response to the Court's August 8 order. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/13/2018) (lnl)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 letterCourt Filing
                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from AUSAs Scott Hartman, Max Nicholas, Damian Williams dated 8/10/2018 re: response to the Court's August 8 order Document filed by USA. (Hartman, Scott)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mauro Michael Wolfe appearing for Stephen Zarsky. Appearance Type: Retained. (Wolfe, Mauro)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vernon S. Broderick: Initial Appearance as to Cameron Collins held on 8/8/2018. Defendant Cameron Collins present with Attorney Rebecca Ricigliano; Thomas Hanusik, AUSA Max Nicholas present for the Government. Defendant enters a plea of not guilty. $500,000.00 PRB; co-signed by 2 FRP's; travel limits include the Continental U.S.; travel documents are to be surrendered to Pretrial Services; surrender of any firearms to local enforcement for safekeeping; Defendant is to be released upon own signature; Defendant has 14 days to meet the conditions specified subject to extension upon application to the court. [Advice of Penalties and Sanctions dated 8/8/2018 attached. Defendant Released.] Modified on 8/23/2018 (ft).
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 bond
                                                                        Appearance Bond Entered as to (18-Cr-567-02) Cameron Collins in amount of $500,000.00. $500,000.00 PRB; co-signed by 2 FRP's; travel limits include the Continental U.S.; travel documents are to be surrendered to Pretrial Services; surrender of any firearms to local enforcement for safekeeping; Defendant is to be released upon own signature; Defendant has 14 days to meet the conditions specified subject to extension upon application to the court. [Advice of Penalties and Sanctions dated 8/8/2018 attached. Defendant Released.] (bw)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 bond
                                                                          Appearance Bond Entered as to (18-Cr-567-01) Christopher Collins in amount of $500,000.00. $500,000.00 PRB; co-signed by 2 FRP's; travel limits include the Continental U.S.; travel documents are to be surrendered to Pretrial Services, except as set forth below; Defendant is to surrender his Diplomatic Passport to defense counsel for safekeeping until further notice; surrender of any firearms to local law enforcement for safekeeping; Defendant is to be released upon own signature; Defendant has 14 days to meet the conditions specified subject to extension upon application to the court. [Advice of Penalties and Sanctions dated 8/8/2018 attached. Defendant Released.] (bw)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vernon S. Broderick: Arraignment as to Christopher Collins (1) Count 1, 2-8, 9, 10, 11. Defendant Christopher Collins present with Attorney Jonathan Barr, AUSA Max Nicholas present for the Government. Defendant enters a plea of not guilty. $500,000.00 PRB; CO-SIGNED BY 2 FRPS; TRAVEL LIMITS INCLUDE THE CONTINENTAL U.S.; TRAVEL DOCUMENTS ARE TO BE SURRENDERED TO PRETRIAL SERVICES; EXCEPT AS SET FORTH BELOW; DEFENDANT IS TO SURRENDER HIS DIPLOMATIC PASSPORT TO DEFENSE COUNSEL FOR SAFEKEEPING UNTIL FURTHER NOTICE; SURRENDER OF ANY FIREARMS TO LOCAL LAW ENFORCEMENT FOR SAFEKEEPING; DEFENDANT IS TO BE RELEASED UPON OWN SIGNATURE; DEFENDANT HAS 14 DAYS TO MEET THE CONDITIONS SPECIFIED SUBJECT TO EXTENSION UPON APPLICATION TO THE COURT. (ft)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 bond
                                                                              Appearance Bond Entered as to (18-Cr-567-03) Stephen Zarsky in amount of $500,000.00. $500,000.00 PRB; co-signed by 2 FRP's; travel limits include the Continental U.S.; travel documents are to be surrendered to Pretrial Services; surrender of any firearms to local law enforcement for safekeeping; Defendant is to be released upon own signature; Defendant has 14 days to meet the conditions specified subject to extension upon application to the court. [Advice of Penalties and Sanctions dated 8/8/2018 attached. Defendant Released.] (bw)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vernon S. Broderick: Initial Appearance as to Stephen Zarsky held on 8/8/2018. Defendant Stephen Zarsky present with Retained Attorney Amanda Bassen. AUSA Max Nicholas present for the Government. Defendant enters a plea of not guilty. Defendant pled not guilty to all counts on the indictment. Agreed conditions of release; defendant released on own recognizance; $500,000 PRB; 2 FRP; travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/Continental US; Surrender travel documents (& no new applications); defendant not to possess firearm/destructive device/other weapon - surrender to local law enforcement; defendant to be released on own signature; remaining conditions to be met by 8/22/18. Next Status Conference scheduled for October 11, 2018 at 2:30 pm. For the reasons stated on the records, speedy trial time is excluded in the interest of justice between August 8, 2018 and October 11, 2018. (ft); Modified on 8/9/2018 (bw). Modified on 8/10/2018 (msa).
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky: On August 8, 2018 I held an initial conference in this matter during which I set certain bail conditions. The bail conditions did not include any pretrial supervision terms. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before August 15, 2018, the parties shall file a joint letter outlining the respective positions of the parties concerning whether any terms pertaining to pretrial supervision should be included in the Defendants' bail dispositions. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/8/2018) (lnl)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 Notice of change of address
                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address as to Stephen Zarsky. New Address: Duane Morris LLP, 1540 Broadway, New York, NY, USA 10036-4086, 212-692-1000. (Bassen, Amanda)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amanda Bassen appearing for Stephen Zarsky. (bw)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jovalin Dedaj appearing for Stephen Zarsky. (bw)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Rebecca Monck Ricigliano appearing for Cameron Collins. (bw)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas Andrew Hanusik appearing for Cameron Collins. (bw)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kendall Eugene Wangsgard appearing for Christopher Collins. (bw)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathan R. Barr appearing for Christopher Collins. [*** Oral motion for Pro Hac Vice appearance to be made at initial appearance. ***] (bw)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathan Adam Forman appearing for Christopher Collins. (bw)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 Order to Unseal IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Order to Unseal Indictment as to Sealed Defendant 1, Sealed Defendant 2, Sealed Defendant 3. Upon the application of the United States, by the United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, Geoffrey S. Berman, by Assistant United States Attorney Max Nicholas; It is found that the Indictment in the above-captioned case is currently sealed and that the United States Attorney's Office has applied to have the Indictment unsealed, and it is therefore: ORDERED that the Indictment in the above-captioned case be unsealed and remain unsealed pending further order of the Court. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 8/8/2018)(bw)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank  arraignment
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vernon S. Broderick:Arraignment as to Cameron Collins (2) Count 1, 2-8, 9, 10, 12. Defendant Cameron Collins present with Attorney Rebecca Ricigliano; Thomas Hanusik, AUSA Max Nicholas present for the Government. Defendant enters a plea of not guilty. (ft)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                        Set/Reset Hearings as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky: Status Conference set for 10/11/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 518, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. (msa)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearings as to Christopher Collins: The Arraignment in this matter has been scheduled for 8/8/2018 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 318, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. (msa)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                            Case Designated ECF as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky. (bw)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                              Case as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky ASSIGNED to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (bw)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 Indictment (Sealed)
                                                                                                                SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1, 2-8, 9, 10, 11, Sealed Defendant 2 (2) count(s) 1, 2-8, 9, 10, 12, Sealed Defendant 3 (3) count(s) 1, 3, 5-7, 9, 10, 13. (bw)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky.. The status conference in this matter will be held in Courtroom 110, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/11/2018)(msa)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?