District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit United States Supreme Court

In re Tesla Inc. Securities Litigation
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-04865-EMC
District Judge Edward M. Chen, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 7, 2021 at 11:50 AM DT (2.2 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FNY Investment Advisers, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Entwistle and Cappucci LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Robert N. Cappucci +1 212 894 7200 +1 212 894 7272 rcappucci@entwistle-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Andrew J Entwistle +1 212 894 7200 +1 212 894 7272 aentwistle@entwistle-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur V. Nealon +1 212 894 7200 +1 212 894 7272 anealon@entwistle-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reed R. Kathrein +1 415 896 6300 +1 415 896 6301 reed@hbsslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Walter Stocker +1 212 907 0882 +1 212 883 7082 mikes@hbsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Marc M. Seltzer +1 310 789 3100 +1 310 789 3150 mseltzer@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo Kalman Isaacs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Browne George Ross LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated Eric M George +1 310 274 7100 +1 310 275 5697 egeorge@bgrfirm.com
Space Eric M George +1 310 274 7100 +1 310 275 5697 egeorge@bgrfirm.com
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated Carl Alan Roth +1 310 274 7100 +1 310 275 5697 croth@bgrfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Lenkner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated Ashley Conrad Keller +1 312 741 5222 ack@kellerlenkner.com
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated Uri Seth Ottensoser +1 212 653 9715 so@kellerlenkner.com
v.
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elon Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Corinne Bretan +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 jbretan@fenwick.com
Space Dean S. Kristy +1 415 875 2324 +1 415 281 1350 dkristy@fenwick.com
Space Mara Rachelle Ludmer +1 415 875 2000 +1 415 281 1350 mludmer@fenwick.com
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Corinne Bretan +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 jbretan@fenwick.com
Space Dean S. Kristy +1 415 875 2324 +1 415 281 1350 dkristy@fenwick.com
Space Mara Rachelle Ludmer +1 415 875 2000 +1 415 281 1350 mludmer@fenwick.com
No Logo Alvin Abrams, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer Pafiti +1 310 600 9775 +1 917 463 1044 jpafiti@pomlaw.com
No Logo Andrew E. Left, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kerr & Wagstaffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James Matthew Wagstaffe +1 415 371 8500 +1 415 371 0500 wagstaffe@kerrwagstaffe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Christopher Joseph Keller +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477 ckeller@labaton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Francis Paul McConville +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 fmcconville@labaton.com
No Logo Bridgestone Investment Corporation Limited, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kahn Swick & Foti LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramzi Abadou +1 415 231 4313 +1 504 455 1498 ramzi.abadou@ksfcounsel.com
No Logo Carlos Maia, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mario Man-Lung Choi +1 415 772 4700 +1 415 772 4707 mchoi@kaplanfox.com
No Logo Christopher Lyman, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer Pafiti +1 310 600 9775 +1 917 463 1044 jpafiti@pomlaw.com
No Logo Dany David, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Elizabeth Joan Cabraser +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 ecabraser@lchb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard Martin Heimann +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 rheimann@lchb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Katherine Collinge Lubin +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 klubin@lchb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randi Dawn Bandman +1 310 859 3100 +1 310 278 2148 randib@csgrr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Lynn Jensen +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 rachelj@rgrdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tricia Lynn McCormick +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 triciam@rgrdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Myers +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 dmyers@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Deepak Mehta, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hedin Hall LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Hall +1 415 766 3534 +1 415 402 0058 dhall@hedinhall.com
No Logo Donald Freeland, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer Pafiti +1 310 600 9775 +1 917 463 1044 jpafiti@pomlaw.com
No Logo Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kerr & Wagstaffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James Matthew Wagstaffe +1 415 371 8500 +1 415 371 0500 wagstaffe@kerrwagstaffe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Christopher Joseph Keller +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477 ckeller@labaton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Francis Paul McConville +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 fmcconville@labaton.com
No Logo Esmaeil Riahi, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hedin Hall LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Hall +1 415 766 3534 +1 415 402 0058 dhall@hedinhall.com
No Logo Glen Littleton, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam M Apton +1 202 524 4290 +1 202 333 2121 AApton@zlk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam C McCall +1 213 985 7290 +1 202 333 2121 amccall@zlk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Nicholas Ian Porritt +1 202 524 4290 +1 202 333 2121 nporritt@akingump.com
No Logo James Johnson, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Entwistle and Cappucci LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Robert N. Cappucci +1 212 894 7200 +1 212 894 7272 rcappucci@entwistle-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Andrew J Entwistle +1 212 894 7200 +1 212 894 7272 aentwistle@entwistle-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur V. Nealon +1 212 894 7200 +1 212 894 7272 anealon@entwistle-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reed R. Kathrein +1 415 896 6300 +1 415 896 6301 reed@hbsslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Walter Stocker +1 212 907 0882 +1 212 883 7082 mikes@hbsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Marc M. Seltzer +1 310 789 3100 +1 310 789 3150 mseltzer@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo Jason Han, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hedin Hall LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Hall +1 415 766 3534 +1 415 402 0058 dhall@hedinhall.com
No Logo Jiri Kulik, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hedin Hall LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Hall +1 415 766 3534 +1 415 402 0058 dhall@hedinhall.com
No Logo Opportunity Unique Fund Inc., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mario Man-Lung Choi +1 415 772 4700 +1 415 772 4707 mchoi@kaplanfox.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Frederic S. Fox +1 212 687 1980 +1 212 687 7714 ffox@kaplanfox.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Laurence David King +1 415 772 4700 +1 415 772 4707 lking@kaplanfox.com
No Logo PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kerr & Wagstaffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James Matthew Wagstaffe +1 415 371 8500 +1 415 371 0500 wagstaffe@kerrwagstaffe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Christopher Joseph Keller +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477 ckeller@labaton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Francis Paul McConville +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 fmcconville@labaton.com
No Logo Raghunath Nama, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hedin Hall LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Hall +1 415 766 3534 +1 415 402 0058 dhall@hedinhall.com
No Logo Rajinder Gaur, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer Pafiti +1 310 600 9775 +1 917 463 1044 jpafiti@pomlaw.com
No Logo Tempus International Fund SPC, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mario Man-Lung Choi +1 415 772 4700 +1 415 772 4707 mchoi@kaplanfox.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Frederic S. Fox +1 212 687 1980 +1 212 687 7714 ffox@kaplanfox.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Laurence David King +1 415 772 4700 +1 415 772 4707 lking@kaplanfox.com
No Logo Thierry Boutin, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kerr & Wagstaffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James Matthew Wagstaffe +1 415 371 8500 +1 415 371 0500 wagstaffe@kerrwagstaffe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Christopher Joseph Keller +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477 ckeller@labaton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Francis Paul McConville +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 fmcconville@labaton.com
No Logo Vilas Capital Management LLC, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kerr & Wagstaffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James Matthew Wagstaffe +1 415 371 8500 +1 415 371 0500 wagstaffe@kerrwagstaffe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Christopher Joseph Keller +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477 ckeller@labaton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Francis Paul McConville +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 fmcconville@labaton.com
Office San Francisco
Filed 8/10/2018
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 77 Securities Fraud
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (419) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 334 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: None Order on Discovery Letter Brief
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 8/3/2021, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 8/2/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 7/30/2021, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 328 Filed: 7/30/2021, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: 7/9/2021 Notice - other
              NOTICE by Carlos Maia, Opportunity Unique Fund Inc., Tempus International Fund SPC of Withdrawal of Appearance of Counsel (Choi, Mario) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: 5/24/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [324] Stipulation Re Class Notice. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/23/2021 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Status Conference held on 5/21/2021. See pdf image for further details.Total Time in Court: 8 Minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. Plaintiff Attorneys: Nicholas Porritt, Adam Apton. Defendant Attorney: Patrick Gibbs. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/21/2021)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/21/2021, Terminated: 5/24/2021 stipulation
                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [323] Order,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, Util - Teleconference Zoom,,,,, re Class Notice filed by Glen Littleton. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Amended Notice Plan with Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit Redline Version of Amended Notice Plan with Exhibits)(Apton, Adam) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: None Letter
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: 5/7/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE RE CLASS NOTICE STIPULATION re [322]. Status Conference specially set for 5/21/2021 09:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 5/21/2021 09:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/7/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021, Terminated: 5/7/2021 stipulation
                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Class Notice filed by Glen Littleton. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Notice Plan, # (2) Exhibit Administrator Resume, # (3) Exhibit Postcard Notice, # (4) Exhibit Longform Notice, # (5) Exhibit Summary Notice)(Apton, Adam) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                              STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re [320]: Close of Fact Discovery due by 9/28/2021. Designation of Experts due by 10/12/2021; Rebuttal due 11/16/2021; Close of Expert Discovery due by 12/3/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 12/9/2021; Oppositions due 1/10/2022; Replies due 1/31/2022; disposition motion hearing to be set for 2/17/2022 at 1:30PM. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/5/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021, Terminated: 5/7/2021 stipulation
                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time and [Proposed] Order filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/25/2021 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                  ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [318] Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: 4/21/2021, Terminated: 4/23/2021 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15867396.) filed by Glen Littleton. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Tripodi, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: 4/19/2021 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Status Conference held on 4/15/2021. Joint Status Report due by 11/12/2021. Status Conference set for 11/18/2021 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. See pdf image for further details.Total Time in Court: 10 Minutes. Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce. Plaintiff Attorneys: Nicholas Porritt, Adam McCall. Defendant Attorneys: Patrick Gibbs, Sarah Lightdale, Brian French. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/15/2021)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 316 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021 Case Management Statement
                                        CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: 3/4/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                          LETTERS ROGATORY. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/4/21. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: 3/4/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                            Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting [313] Amended Stipulation for Issuance of Letters Rogatory.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                              Electronic filing error. Submit proposed order to Judge Westmore in accordance with L.R. 5-1(g). Re:[313] STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Letters Rogatory Amended to Include Exhibit for Clerk's Seal filed by Glen Littleton (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2021)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 313 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: 2/26/2021, Terminated: 3/4/2021 stipulation
                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Letters Rogatory Amended to Include Exhibit for Clerk's Seal filed by Glen Littleton. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Letters Rogatory with Exhibit for Clerk's Seal)(Apton, Adam) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 312 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: 1/29/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                LETTERS ROGATORY. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/29/21. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: 1/29/2021 Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters RogatoryCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting [310] Stipulation for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; terminating as moot [303] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                    Electronic filing error. Proposed order has not been submitted to Judge Westmore pursuant to L.R. 5-1(g). Re:[310] STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [308] Order, Set Deadlines Letters Rogatory filed by Glen Littleton (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: 1/28/2021, Terminated: 1/29/2021 stipulation
                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [308] Order, Set Deadlines Letters Rogatory filed by Glen Littleton. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Letters Rogatory)(Apton, Adam) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                        Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting [304] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER re [303] MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Response or Stipulation due by 1/28/2021. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/21/2021. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: 1/19/2021 Notice - other
                                                            NOTICE by Kalman Isaacs Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 305 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: 1/15/2021 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/15/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery
                                                                CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/15/2021 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Status Conference held on 1/14/2021. See pdf image for further details. Joint Status Report due by 4/8/2021. Status Conference set for 4/15/2021 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Report due by 4/8/2021. Status Conference set for 4/15/2021 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen.Total Time in Court: 6 Minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: Nicholas Porritt, Adam McCall. Defendant Attorney: Patrick Gibbs, Brian French. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/14/2021)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021, Terminated: 1/21/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Glen Littleton. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Proposed Order)(Apton, Adam) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 303 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021, Terminated: 1/29/2021 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory
                                                                      MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory filed by Glen Littleton. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit)(Apton, Adam) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 302 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: 1/7/2021 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                      JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [258] Notice (Other) filed by FNY Investment Advisers, LLC, Attorney Andrew John Entwistle terminated.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/15/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: 12/7/2020 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Status Conference held on 12/3/2020. See pdf image for further details. Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2021. Status Conference set for 1/14/2021 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2021. Further Status Conference set for 1/14/2021 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen.Total Time in Court: 6 Minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Nicholas Porritt, Adam Apton, Gabrielle Diamse. Defendant Attorneys: Brian French, Sarah Lightdale, Samantha Kirby. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/3/2020)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 299 Filed: 11/28/2020, Entered: 11/28/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE FROM 12/4/2020 TO 12/3/2020 AT SPECIALLY-SET TIME: Due to unavailability of the Court, Status Conference reset for 12/4/2020 is vacated and rescheduled for 12/3/2020 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 12/3/2020 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2020)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: 11/25/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                              Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [296] Stipulation for Class Certification.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: 11/25/2020 Case Management Statement
                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: 11/23/2020, Terminated: 11/25/2020 stipulation
                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [289] MOTION to Certify Class Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Class Certification filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 295 Filed: 11/22/2020, Entered: 11/22/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE FROM 12/3/2020 TO 12/4/2020: Due to unavailability of the Court, Status Conference set for 12/3/2020 is vacated and rescheduled for 12/4/2020 10:30 AM by Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. Deadline for status report remains unchanged. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 12/4/2020 10:30 AM by Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2020)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: 10/13/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING [293] STIPULATION FOR DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/13/2020.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: 10/13/2020, Terminated: 10/13/2020 stipulation
                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re ESI Protocol filed by Glen Littleton. (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                          Declaration of Glen Littleton in Support of [289] MOTION to Certify Class filed byGlen Littleton. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Related document(s)[289]) (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                            Declaration of Michael L. Hartzmark, Ph.D. in Support of [289] MOTION to Certify Class filed byGlen Littleton. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Expert Report)(Related document(s)[289]) (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                              Declaration of Nicholas I. Porritt in Support of [289] MOTION to Certify Class filed byGlen Littleton. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Firm Resume)(Related document(s)[289]) (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 289 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020, Terminated: 11/28/2020 motion to certify classCourt Filing
                                                                                                MOTION to Certify Class filed by Glen Littleton. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/23/2020. Replies due by 1/6/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Apton, Adam) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: 9/21/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                Order as Modified by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [287] Stipulation Re Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. The page limitations applicable to the briefing shall be extended, allowing Plaintiff to file an opening brief not to exceed 30 pages and a reply brief not to exceed 18 pages, and Defendants to file an opposition brief not to exceed 35 pages.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 287 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: 9/18/2020, Terminated: 9/21/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by Glen Littleton. (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: 9/4/2020 Refund Status
                                                                                                    Refund Status re [284] Application for Refund, Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 286 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: 9/8/2020 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Status Conference held on 9/3/2020. Status Conference set for 12/3/2020 10:30 AM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. Joint Status Report due by 11/25/2020. See pdf image for further details and instruction.Total Time in Court: 8 Minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorneys: Nicholas Porritt, Adam McCall, Adam Apton. Defendant Attorneys: Sarah Lightdale, Patrick Gibbs, Samantha Kirby. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/3/2020)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 9/1/2020, Entered: 9/1/2020 Application for Refund
                                                                                                        Application for Refund re [282] Refund Status, Receipt Number 0971-14874729 for Docket Nos. 275, 276, 277 (which links are no longer on docket) by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 283 Filed: 9/1/2020, Entered: 9/1/2020 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING STATUS CONFERENCE TO ZOOM HEARING. Status Conference set for 9/3/2020 10:30 AM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 9/3/2020 10:30 AM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: 8/31/2020 Refund Status
                                                                                                            Refund Status re [278] Application for Refund,, Declined. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: 8/30/2020 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [277] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: 8/30/2020 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [276] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: 8/30/2020 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [275] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: 8/28/2020 Application for Refund
                                                                                                                    Application for Refund re [276] MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Brian M. French ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14874736.), [277] MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Bingxin Wu ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14874810.), [275] MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Sarah Lightdale ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14874683.), Receipt Number 0971-14874729 by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: 8/28/2020, Terminated: 8/28/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Bingxin Wu ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14874810.) filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: 8/28/2020, Terminated: 8/28/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Brian M. French ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14874736.) filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: 8/28/2020, Terminated: 8/28/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Sarah Lightdale ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14874683.) filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: 8/28/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Sol Schelly Walden (Walden, Joshua) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: 8/28/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Anne Kirby (Kirby, Samantha) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 272 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: 8/27/2020 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: 8/21/2020 Order on Motion To Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [270] Motion to Substitute Attorney..(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 270 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020, Terminated: 8/21/2020 Motion to Substitute Attorney PSP
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Patrick Edward Gibbs Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel for Defendants; [Proposed] Order (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 8/18/2020) Modified on 8/21/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: 8/11/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Remote Proceedings held on 5/29/2020, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Ana M. Dub, CSR 7445, RDR, CRR, telephone number 415-290-1651; ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [268] Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020. (Related documents(s) [268]) (amdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 29, 2020 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc., for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Cassidy Neal (Neal, Stephen) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Edward Gibbs (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 265 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: 7/8/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Marie Caroline Bafus (Bafus, Marie) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 264 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: 6/22/2020 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendants' Answer To The Consolidated Complaint For Violations Of The Federal Securities Laws byBrad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 263 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: 6/10/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [262] Stipulation. Answer due 6/22/2020.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: 6/10/2020, Terminated: 6/10/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Stipulation Amending Schedule For Filing Answer To Consolidated Complaint filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/10/2020) Modified on 6/10/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 5/31/2020, Entered: 5/31/2020 Case Management Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL: Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2021. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Class Certification Motion due 9/22/2020; opposition due 11/23/2020; reply due 1/6/2021; Class Certification Hearing set 2/18/2021 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Close of Fact Discovery due by 6/15/2021. Close of Expert Discovery due by 9/15/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2022 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 5/31/2022 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Further Jury Trial set for 6/1/2022, 6/3/2022, 6/6/2022, 6/7/2022, 6/8/2022, 6/10/2022, 6/13/2022, 6/14/2022, 6/15/2022 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/29/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2020)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF
                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 11/23/2020. Replies due by 1/6/2021. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2020)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF
                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 11/23/2020. Replies due by 1/6/2021. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2020)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF
                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 11/23/2021. Replies due by 12/23/2021. Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2020)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF
                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 11/23/2020. Replies due by 1/6/2021. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: 5/30/2020 Case Management Conference - FurtherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/29/2020. Joint Status Report due by 8/27/2020. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 5/31/2022 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Status Conference set for 9/3/2020 10:30 AM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. Scheduling Order to issue. See PDF image for further details.Total Time in Court: 17 Minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub.Plaintiff Attorneys: Nicholas Porritt, Adam McCall, Adam Apton. Defendant Attorneys: Dean Kristy, Jennifer Bretan. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/29/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 259 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING 5/29/2020 STATUS CONFERENCE AT 10:00 AM TO ZOOM WEBINAR HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to EMCCRD@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than May 28, 2020 at 5:00 PM PST.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/83778875836?pwd=MzNtcFdoeU1NS2JONHNET3gvVVNVQT09Meeting ID: 837 7887 5836Password: 228949Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020) Modified on 5/28/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: 5/26/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by FNY Investment Advisers, LLC Withdrawal of Counsel (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Entwistle, Andrew) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 257 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: 5/22/2020 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Further Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco. Document [256] will serve as joint statement. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 256 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: 5/22/2020 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Proposed Scheduling Order. (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: 5/20/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [254] Stipulation For Protective Order.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: 5/19/2020, Terminated: 5/20/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Protective Order filed by Glen Littleton. (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [252] Stipulation Setting Schedule For Filing Answer to Consolidated Complaint. Answer due 6/15/2020.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: 4/22/2020, Terminated: 4/23/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION Stipulation Setting Schedule For Filing Answer To Consolidated Complaint filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/22/2020) Modified on 4/23/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 251 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: 4/15/2020 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying [233] Plaintiff's Motion to Convert or, Alternatively, to Strike; Granting Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, and Denying [227] Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: 4/1/2020 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/6/2020 before Judge Edward M. Chen for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/06/2020 before Judge Edward M. Chen for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 247 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: 3/12/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/6/20, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Katherine Powell Sullivan, Official Reporter, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [245] Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2020. (Related documents(s) [245]) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/06/2020 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Glen Littleton, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 249 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: 3/20/2020 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 3/6/2020; taking under submission [233] Motion to Strike. Total Time in Court: 1 Hour; 4 Minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorneys: Nicholas Porritt, Adam McCall. Defendant Attorneys: Dean Kristy, Jennifer Bretan, Alison Jordan. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/6/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: 3/6/2020 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/06/2020 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: 2/20/2020 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [243] Request to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Reed R. Kathrein and Danielle Smith terminated.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 243 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: 2/20/2020, Terminated: 2/20/2020 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney PSP
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by William Chamberlain, James Johnson Notice of Request for Withdrawal of Counsel (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Proposed Order))(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 2/20/2020) Modified on 2/20/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY (re [233] MOTION to Strike [227] MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint or Convert to Summary Judgment ) filed by Glen Littleton. (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 2/7/2020) Modified on 2/10/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 241 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: 2/3/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE: Due to unavailability of the Court, motion hearing re: [227] MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint, [233] MOTION to Strike [227] MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint or Convert to Summary Judgment set for 3/5/2020 is vacated and rescheduled for oral argument on 3/6/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Briefing remains unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: 1/31/2020 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Laurence D. King for the law firm Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP (King, Laurence) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 239 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendants' Response and Request for Judicial Notice To Plaintiff's Objection To Documents Incorporated By Reference And Request For Judicial Notice re [232] Objection, [229] Request for Judicial Notice,, filed byBrad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Related document(s)[232], [229]) (Muck, Kevin) (Filed on 1/27/2020) Modified on 1/27/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 238 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Jennifer C. Bretan In Further Support Of [227] Motion To Dismiss Consolidated Complaint filed byBrad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/27/2020) Modified on 1/27/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 237 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY (re [227] MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint ) Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Consolidated Complaint filed byBrad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Kristy, Dean) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 236 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: 1/24/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [233] MOTION to Strike [227] MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint or Convert to Summary Judgment ) Defendants' Opposition To Motion To Convert MotionTo Dismiss To Motion For Summary Judgment And To Motion To Strike filed byBrad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 235 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: 1/2/2020 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERKS NOTICE. The briefing schedule on [233] Plaintiffs motion to convert is modified. The opposition brief shall be filed by 1/24/2020 and the reply brief by 2/7/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines as to [233] MOTION to Strike [227] MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint or Convert to Summary Judgment. Responses due by 1/24/2020. Replies due by 2/7/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 234 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: 12/27/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Adam M. Apton in Support of [233] MOTION to Strike [227] MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint or Convert to Summary Judgment filed byGlen Littleton. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Related document(s)[233]) (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 233 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: 12/27/2019, Terminated: 4/15/2020 Motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike [227] MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint or Convert to Summary Judgment filed by Glen Littleton. Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 1/27/2020. Replies due by 2/20/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Apton, Adam) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 232 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: 12/27/2019 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTIONS to re [229] Request for Judicial Notice,, by Glen Littleton. (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 231 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: 12/27/2019 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [227] MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint ) filed byGlen Littleton. (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 230 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Re [226] Joint Discovery Letter. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/26/2019. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 229 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request for Judicial Notice re [227] MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint, [228] Declaration in Support, Notice Of Documents Incorporated By Reference And Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Consolidated Complaint filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Related document(s)[227], [228]) (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/22/2019) Modified on 11/25/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 228 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Jennifer C. Bretan in Support of [227] MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Related document(s)[227]) (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/22/2019) Modified on 11/25/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 227 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019, Terminated: 4/15/2020 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 12/27/2019. Replies due by 1/27/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Consolidated Complaint)(Kristy, Dean) (Filed on 11/22/2019) Modified on 11/25/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 226 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Nicholas Porritt and Dean Kristy re discovery dispute over SEC production. (Porritt, Nicholas) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 225 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Schedule For Responding To Consolidated Complaint And Related Filings by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/11/2019) Modified on 11/14/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 224 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Lodging Addendum to the Consolidated Class Action Complaint re [221] Clerk's Notice by Glen Littleton. (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 11/11/2019) Modified on 11/14/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Adam Christopher McCall and Adam M. Apton (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 11/11/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 222 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [220] Stipulation Resuming And Resetting Schedule For Responding To Consolidated Complaint And Vacating Status Conference. Any Motion to Dismiss to be filed 11/22/2019; opposition due 12/27/2019; reply due 1/27/2020; set for hearing on 3/5/2020 at 1:30 p.m. Status Conference set for 1/2/2020 is vacated.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 221 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE. After the consolidated class action complaint was filed, see Docket No. [184], the Court amended its civil standing order. One amendment included the addition of paragraph 10. The Court orders the parties to meet and confer to see if they can reach agreement on (1) Plaintiffs supplementing the consolidated class action complaint to comply with the standing order and (2) keeping the motion to dismiss (assuming one is filed) on schedule as stipulated to by the parties. See Docket No. [220]. The parties shall report back within a week of the date of this notice. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 220 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019, Terminated: 11/4/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Resuming And Resetting Schedule For Responding To Consolidated Complaint And Vacating Status Conference filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 219 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 1/23/2020 is VACATED and ADVANCED to 1/2/2020 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Joint Status Report due by 12/26/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 218 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 USCA order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                USCA MEMORANDUM re [196]: Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 217 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: 10/1/2019 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to stay, Status Conference set for 10/8/2019 is vacated and rescheduled as control date for 1/23/2020 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Joint Status Report due by 1/16/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 216 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: 10/1/2019 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report And Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Vacating Status Conference by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 215 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: 9/13/2019 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE: Due to unavailability of the Court, Status Conference set for 10/10/2019 is vacated and ADVANCED to 10/8/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Joint Status Report due by 10/1/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 214 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: 6/26/2019 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE: Due to unavailability of the Court, Status Conference set for 9/26/2019 is vacated and rescheduled for 10/10/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Joint Status Report due by 10/3/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 213 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to stay of case, Status Conference set for 6/20/2019 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED 9/26/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2019.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 212 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: 5/22/2019 USCA order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER of USCA as to [196] USCA Case Number (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 211 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting [201] Bridgestone's Motion to Stay Proceedings. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Case Stayed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case Stayed (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 210 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: 4/2/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  District Court's Response Re Petition for Writ of Mandamus [204]. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/2/2019. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certified copy of [210] Order mailed to USCA. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 209 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: 3/29/2019 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in Support (re [201] MOTION to Stay Proceedings) filed by Bridgestone Investment Corporation Limited. (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [201] MOTION to Stay Proceedings ) filed byGlen Littleton. (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [201] MOTION to Stay Proceedings) filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/28/2019) Modified on 4/4/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Clare Jordan (Jordan, Alison) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Peter Muck (Muck, Kevin) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 204 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: 3/27/2019 USCA order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER of USCA as to [196] USCA Case Number that the petition for a writ of mandamus raises issues that warrant an answer. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 203 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: 3/22/2019 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [199] Administrative Motion for Relief From Case Schedule Pending Lead Plaintiff Proceedings in the Ninth Circuit. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: 3/22/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Ramzi Abadou in Support of [201] MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed byBridgestone Investment Corporation Limited. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. A, # (2) Exhibit Ex. B)(Related document(s)[201]) (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 201 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: 3/22/2019, Terminated: 4/15/2019 Motion To StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Bridgestone Investment Corporation Limited. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 4/5/2019. Replies due by 4/12/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: 3/22/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Jennifer C. Bretan in Support of [199] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Relief From Case Schedule Pending Lead Plaintiff Proceedings In The Ninth Circuit Including Deferral Of Defendants' March 28, 2019 Deadline To Respond To Consolidated Complaint re [194] Order on Stipulation, and Exhibit 1 filed byBrad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Related document(s)[199]) (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: 3/22/2019, Terminated: 3/22/2019 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Relief From Case Schedule Pending Lead Plaintiff Proceedings In The Ninth Circuit Including Deferral Of Defendants' March 28, 2019 Deadline To Respond To Consolidated Complaint re [194] Order on Stipulation, filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. Responses due by 3/26/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: 3/22/2019 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc. Amended (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: 3/22/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Corinne Bretan Notice Of Appearance Of Counsel (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 196 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: 3/13/2019 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              USCA Case Number 19-70031 USCA re petition for writ of mandamus and/or prohibition (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 195 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: 2/12/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [186] Notice of Request for Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Joshua Horwitz. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/12/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 194 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: 2/11/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [191] Stipulation Adjusting Schedule for Responding to Consolidated Complaint, as Modified. Any motion to dismiss or otherwise response to complaint shall be filed on or before 3/28/2019; opposition due 4/25/2019; reply due 5/16/2019; hearing set 6/13/2019 at 1:30 p.m.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: 2/11/2019 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [190] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: 2/11/2019 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [189] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 4/25/2019. Replies due by 5/16/2019. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 191 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019, Terminated: 2/11/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [184] Amended Complaint, [178] Order on Stipulation, Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Adjusting Schedule For Responding To Consolidated Complaint filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019, Terminated: 2/11/2019 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13078371.) filed by Glen Littleton. (Korsinsky, Eduard) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019, Terminated: 2/11/2019 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13078222.) Filing fee previously paid on 2/8/2019 filed by Glen Littleton. (Levi, Joseph) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 188 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: 1/31/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Linda Johnson Rice. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 187 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: 1/29/2019 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Summons. (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Joshua Horwitz Notice of Request for Withdrawal of Counsel (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Johnson, Frank) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joshua Horwitz (Johnson, Frank) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 184 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: 1/16/2019 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc., Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice. Filed by Glen Littleton. (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 1/16/2019) Modified on 1/17/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: 1/16/2019 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [182] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: 1/16/2019, Terminated: 1/16/2019 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13006884.) filed by Glen Littleton. (Krot, Alexander) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: 1/15/2019 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting [167] Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Nonparty Document Preservation Subpoenas. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY BRIEF in Support (re [167] MOTION Leave to Serve Non-Party Document Preservation Subpoenas) filed by Glen Littleton. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit)(Apton, Adam) (Filed on 1/11/2019) Modified on 1/14/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 179 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE: Status Conference set as a control date for 6/20/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Joint Status Report due by 6/13/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 178 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [175] Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule for Responding to Consolidated Amended Complaint and Continuing Case Management Conference and Associated Deadlines. Answer due 3/7/2019; opposition due 4/26/2019; reply due 5/31/2019. Status Conference set for 1/17/2019 is vacated and a control date will be further set by the Court.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 177 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: 1/3/2019 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Dean S. Kristy in Opposition to [167] MOTION Leave to Serve Non-Party Document Preservation Subpoenas , [176] Opposition/Response to Motion, Declaration Of Dean S. Kristy In Opposition To Lead Plaintiff's Motion To Lift The Discovery Stay To Issue Non-Party Subpoenas filed byElon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Related document(s)[167], [176]) (Kristy, Dean) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 176 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: 1/3/2019 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [167] MOTION Leave to Serve Non-Party Document Preservation Subpoenas ) Defendants' Opposition To Lead Plaintiff's Motion To Lift The Discovery Stay To Issue Non-Party Subpoenas filed byElon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Kristy, Dean) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: 1/3/2019, Terminated: 1/4/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [145] Motion Hearing Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Setting Schedule For Responding To Consolidated Amended Complaint And Continuing Case Management Conference And Associated Deadlines filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order as Modified by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [173] Stipulation Extending Briefing Schedule on Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Non-Party Document Preservation Subpoenas; and Continuing Hearing to January 24, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. Opposition due 1/3/2019; Reply due 1/11/2019; hearing reset for 1/24/2019 at 1:30 p.m.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018, Terminated: 12/21/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [167] MOTION Leave to Serve Non-Party Document Preservation Subpoenas Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Extending Briefing Schedule On Lead Plaintiff's Motion For Leave To Serve Non-Party Document Preservation Subpoenas; And Continuing Hearing To January 24, 2019 At 1:30 P.M. filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines as to [167] MOTION Leave to Serve Non-Party Document Preservation Subpoenas . Responses due by 1/3/2019. Replies due by 1/11/2019. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Denying [156] [158] Motions to Reconsider. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/17/2018. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 171 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE: In light of the pending motions to reconsider filed by Mr. David and Bridgestone, the Court hereby STAYS its prior order requiring Mr. Littleton to file a consolidated amended complaint in January 2019. See Docket No. [152] (Order at 9). The Court shall set a new date for the filing of a consolidated amended complaint after it resolves the motions to reconsider. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Ramzi Abadou in Support of [169] MOTION for Reconsideration re [164] Response to Order to Show Cause Reply in Support Thereof filed byBridgestone Investment Corporation Limited. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J)(Related document(s)[169]) (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018, Terminated: 12/13/2018 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY in Support re [164] Response to Order to Show Cause Reply in Support Thereof filed by Bridgestone Investment Corporation Limited. (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 12/12/2018) Modified on 12/13/2018 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Adam M. Apton in Support of [167] MOTION Leave to Serve Non-Party Document Preservation Subpoenas filed byGlen Littleton. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Business Insider article, # (2) Exhibit Gizmodo article, # (3) Exhibit NY Times article, # (4) Exhibit Draft subpoena)(Related document(s)[167]) (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018, Terminated: 1/15/2019 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION Leave to Serve Non-Party Document Preservation Subpoenas filed by Glen Littleton. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 12/26/2018. Replies due by 1/2/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Apton, Adam) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 166 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018, Terminated: 12/12/2018 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in Further Support to [161] Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Dany David. (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 12/11/2018) Modified on 12/12/2018 (afmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/13/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Adam M. Apton in Opposition to [160] Clerk's Notice,, filed byGlen Littleton. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit SEC Complaint (Musk), # (2) Exhibit Transcript)(Related document(s)[160]) (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Response to order to show cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [158] MOTION for Reconsideration) by Glen Littleton. (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 12/10/2018) Modified on 12/12/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-15-2018, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Ana M. Dub, telephone number 415-290-1651; ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [146] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2019. (Related documents(s) [146]) (amdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Adam M. Apton in Support of Response to Dany David's [156] Motion for Reconsideration filed by Glen Littleton. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Transcript)(Related document(s)[161]) (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 12/7/2018) Modified on 12/11/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Response to order to show cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response to Order to Show Cause [157] Clerk's Notice,, Response to Dany David's Motion for Reconsideration byGlen Littleton. (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 160 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: 12/3/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE: The Court has received Bridgestone's [158] motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration. The Court grants the motion and deems Bridgestone's filing its motion to reconsider. Mr. Littleton shall file a response to the motion to reconsider by December 10, 2018. Bridgestone shall file a reply by December 12, 2018. The Court shall decide whether a hearing is necessary after briefing is completed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: 12/3/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Ramzi Abadou in Support of [158] MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of November 27, 2018 Order Denying Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed byBridgestone Investment Corporation Limited. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Order, # (2) Exhibit B - Forbes 400, # (3) Exhibit C - Relevant Pages from Levi Loss Chart)(Related document(s)[158]) (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: 12/3/2018, Terminated: 12/4/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of November 27, 2018 Order Denying Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by Bridgestone Investment Corporation Limited. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 157 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: 12/3/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE: The Court has received Mr. David's [156] motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration. The Court grants the motion and deems Mr. David's filing his motion to reconsider. Mr. Littleton shall file a response to the motion to reconsider by December 7, 2018. Mr. David shall file a reply by December 11, 2018. The Court shall decide whether a hearing is necessary after briefing is completed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018, Terminated: 12/3/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order Appointing Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Dany David. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/15/2018 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Glen Littleton, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Marc Apton for Lead Plaintiff Glen Littleton (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d))(Apton, Adam) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/15/2018 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Dany David, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 152 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen (1) Granting Plaintiffs' Motions to Consolidate; and (2) Granting Plaintiff Littleton's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approving Plaintiff Littleton's Selection of Lead Counsel. Motions [40] [41] [45] [46] [47] [64] [71] [74] [80] Terminated. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 15, 2018 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Thierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (McConville, Francis) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Create Case Association
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Create association: case consolidated, all future filings shall be made in 3:18-cv-04865-EMC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: 11/16/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/15/2018 before Judge Edward M. Chen by FNY Investment Advisers, LLC, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Entwistle, Andrew) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: 11/16/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 15, 2018 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Opportunity Unique Fund Inc., Tempus International Fund SPC, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Choi, Mario) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: 11/16/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [144] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: 11/16/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/15/2018 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc., for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: 11/16/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/15/2018 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Bridgestone Investment Corporation Limited, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 145 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: 11/16/2018 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 11/15/2018 re: MOTIONS to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel: 3:18-cv-05258-EMC [24], 3:18-cv-04912-EMC [22], 3:18-cv-05463-EMC [32], 3:18-cv-04876-EMC [22], 3:18-cv-05899-EMC [19], 3:18-cv-04939-EMC [22], 3:18-cv-04865-EMC [46], 3:18-cv-04865-EMC [71], 3:18-cv-04865-EMC [40], 3:18-cv-04865-EMC [64], 3:18-cv-04865-EMC [80], 3:18-cv-04865-EMC [47], 3:18-cv-04865-EMC [41], 3:18-cv-04948-EMC [21], 3:18-cv-04865-EMC [45], 3:18-cv-05470-EMC [24]. Motions taken under submission. Status Report due by 1/10/2019. Status Conference set for 1/17/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen.Total Time in Court: 1 Hour; 17 Minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. Plaintiff Attorneys: Elizabeth Cabraser, Katherine Lubin, Danielle Myers, Rachel Jensen, Ramsey Abadou, Mario Choi, Laurence King, Frederick Fox, Robert Cappucci, Mark Seltzer, Reed Kathrein. Defendant Attorneys: Dean Kristy, Jennifer Bretan, Ashley Keller, Christopher Keller, Frank Busch. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018, Terminated: 11/16/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Christopher J. Keller ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12848334.) filed by Thierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC. (Keller, Christopher) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Randi D. Bandman in Support of [141] Notice (Other) filed byDany David. (Related document(s)[141]) (Bandman, Randi) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Danielle S. Myers in Support of [141] Notice (Other) filed byDany David. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[141]) (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Dany David Notice of Recent Development Pertaining to Lead Plaintiff Motions (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Danielle Suzanne Myers on behalf of Dany David (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Suzanne Myers (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Marc M. Seltzer (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Collinge Lubin (Attachments: # (1) Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d))(Lubin, Katherine) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Martin Heimann (Attachments: # (1) Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d))(Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Joan Cabraser (Attachments: # (1) Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d))(Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Brief re [40] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [64] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byFNY Investment Advisers, LLC, James Johnson. (Related document(s)[40], [64]) (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: 11/12/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Ramzi Abadou (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 11/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [130] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended REPLY in Support (re [40] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed by FNY Investment Advisers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Entwistle, Andrew) (Filed on 11/2/2018) Modified on 11/5/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018, Terminated: 11/8/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12813886.) filed by Glen Littleton. (Porritt, Nicholas) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Shawn I. Fischman in Support of [128] Reply to Opposition/Response filed byFNY Investment Advisers, LLC. (Related document(s)[128]) (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Shawn I. Fischman in Support of 128 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byFNY Investment Advisers, LLC. (Related document(s) 128 ) (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/30/2018) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in Further Support (re [40] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed by FNY Investment Advisers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/30/2018) Modified on 10/31/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY in Further Support (re 40 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed by FNY Investment Advisers, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/30/2018) Modified on 10/31/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein In Support of Reply Memorandum of Law In Further Support of Motion of James Johnson for Consolidation of Related Cases, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of His Selection of Lead Counsel filed byJames Johnson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein In Support of Reply Memorandum of Law In Further Support of Motion of James Johnson for Consolidation of Related Cases, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of His Selection of Lead Counsel filed byJames Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 10/30/2018) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in Support (re [46] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [71] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [40] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [80] MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [41] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [45] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byJames Johnson. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY in Support (re 46 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 71 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 40 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 80 MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 41 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 45 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byJames Johnson. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 10/30/2018) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Laurence D. King in Support of [124] Reply to Opposition/Response filed byOpportunity Unique Fund Inc., Tempus International Fund SPC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J)(Related document(s)[124]) (King, Laurence) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Laurence D. King in Support of 124 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byOpportunity Unique Fund Inc., Tempus International Fund SPC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 124 ) (King, Laurence) (Filed on 10/30/2018) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in Further Support (re [71] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases) filed by Opportunity Unique Fund Inc., Tempus International Fund SPC. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 10/30/2018) Modified on 10/31/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY in Further Support (re 71 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases) filed by Opportunity Unique Fund Inc., Tempus International Fund SPC. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 10/30/2018) Modified on 10/31/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY in Further Support (re [46] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases) filed by Bridgestone Investment Corporation Limited. (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 10/30/2018) Modified on 10/31/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in Further Support (re 46 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases) filed by Bridgestone Investment Corporation Limited. (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 10/30/2018) Modified on 10/31/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Tricia L. McCormick in Support of [121] Reply to Opposition/Response filed byDany David. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[121]) (McCormick, Tricia) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Tricia L. McCormick in Support of 121 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byDany David. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 121 ) (McCormick, Tricia) (Filed on 10/30/2018) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in Further Support (re [80] MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed by Dany David. (McCormick, Tricia) (Filed on 10/30/2018) Modified on 10/31/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Further Support (re 80 MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed by Dany David. (McCormick, Tricia) (Filed on 10/30/2018) Modified on 10/31/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe in Support of [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, Declaration in Further Support filed byThierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Supplemental Joint Declaration, # (2) Exhibit B - Second Expert Declaration)(Related document(s)[47]) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe in Support of 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, Declaration in Further Support filed byThierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Joint Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B - Second Expert Declaration)(Related document(s) 47 ) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/30/2018) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY (re [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, ) Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support re [47] and in Opposition to Competing Motions filed byThierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY (re 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, ) Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support re 47 and in Opposition to Competing Motions filed byThierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/30/2018) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY (re [46] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [71] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [40] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [64] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [80] MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof,, [45] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byGlen Littleton. (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY (re 46 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 71 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 40 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 80 MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof,, 45 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byGlen Littleton. (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 10/30/2018) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [46] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [71] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [40] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [64] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [80] MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof,, [41] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byFNY Investment Advisers, LLC. (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 46 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 71 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 40 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 80 MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof,, 41 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byFNY Investment Advisers, LLC. (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/23/2018) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Laurence D. King in Support of [115] Opposition/Response to Motion,,, filed byOpportunity Unique Fund Inc., Tempus International Fund SPC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Related document(s)[115]) (King, Laurence) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Laurence D. King in Support of 115 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, filed byOpportunity Unique Fund Inc., Tempus International Fund SPC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 115 ) (King, Laurence) (Filed on 10/23/2018) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [46] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [40] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [64] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [80] MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof,, [41] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [45] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byOpportunity Unique Fund Inc., Tempus International Fund SPC. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 46 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 40 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 80 MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof,, 41 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 45 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byOpportunity Unique Fund Inc., Tempus International Fund SPC. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 10/23/2018) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein in Support of [113] Opposition/Response to Motion,,, Competing Motions for Lead Plaintiff filed byJames Johnson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[113]) (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein in Support of 113 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, Competing Motions for Lead Plaintiff filed byJames Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 113 ) (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 10/23/2018) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [46] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [71] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [40] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [64] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [80] MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof,, [41] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [45] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byJames Johnson. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 46 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 71 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 40 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 80 MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof,, 41 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 45 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byJames Johnson. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 10/23/2018) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Tricia L. McCormick in Opposition to [40] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof,, [41] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [46] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [71] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [64] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [45] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byDany David. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10)(Related document(s)[40], [47], [41], [46], [71], [64], [45]) (McCormick, Tricia) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Tricia L. McCormick in Opposition to 40 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof,, 41 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 46 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 71 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 45 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byDany David. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 40, 47, 41, 46, 71, 64, 45 ) (McCormick, Tricia) (Filed on 10/23/2018) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [46] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [71] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [40] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [64] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof,, [41] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [45] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byDany David. (McCormick, Tricia) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 46 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 71 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 40 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof,, 41 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 45 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byDany David. (McCormick, Tricia) (Filed on 10/23/2018) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe in Support of [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof,, [108] Opposition/Response to Motion,,, filed byThierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Amended Loss Analysis and Certification, # (2) Exhibit B - Declaration of Hui Chang, Esq., # (3) Exhibit C - Case Report by Susan Perkins, # (4) Exhibit D - Copy of Opportunity Unique Fund Registry, # (5) Exhibit E - Declaration of Robert M. Daines, # (6) Exhibit F - Intraday Trading Tesla Common Stock, # (7) Exhibit G - Supplemental Movants' Declarations, # (8) Exhibit H - Copy of Letter to Tempus and OUF's Counsel, # (9) Exhibit I - Chart Reflecting FNY Inv. Loss Analysis)(Related document(s)[47], [108]) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe in Support of 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof,, 108 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, filed byThierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Loss Analysis and Certification, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Hui Chang, Esq., # 3 Exhibit C - Case Report by Susan Perkins, # 4 Exhibit D - Copy of Opportunity Unique Fund Registry, # 5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Robert M. Daines, # 6 Exhibit F - Intraday Trading Tesla Common Stock, # 7 Exhibit G - Supplemental Movants' Declarations, # 8 Exhibit H - Copy of Letter to Tempus and OUF's Counsel, # 9 Exhibit I - Chart Reflecting FNY Inv. Loss Analysis)(Related document(s) 47, 108 ) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/23/2018) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Ramzi Abadou in Support of [107] Opposition/Response to Motion,,, filed byBridgestone Investment Corporation Limited. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 01 - Tempus International Fund Profile Page, # (2) Exhibit 02 - Bloomberg Profile of Opportunity Unique Fund, # (3) Exhibit 03 - One Minute Tick History at 12:47 PM, # (4) Exhibit 04 - O Globo Article with Certified Translation, # (5) Exhibit 05 - Price and Volume Tick History as of Aug. 07, 2018, # (6) Exhibit 06 - SEC.gov Page on Short Sales, # (7) Exhibit 07 - Infomoney Article July 21, 2016, # (8) Exhibit 08 - CNBC Article of March 2, 2016, # (9) Exhibit 09 - MarketWatch Article of March 1, 2016, # (10) Exhibit 10 - NFA Case Summary, # (11) Exhibit 11 - New York Times Article of June 8, 2017, # (12) Exhibit 12 - South China Morning Post Article of August 26, 2016, # (13) Exhibit 13 - South China Morning Post Article of January 13, 2017, # (14) Exhibit 14 - Reuters Article of October 23, 2018, # (15) Exhibit 15 - Yahoo! Finance High and Low Ranges, # (16) Exhibit 16 - SEC.gov Article Day Trading - Your Dollars At Risk, # (17) Exhibit 17 - SEC.gov Reported Testimony of Arthur Levitt, # (18) Exhibit 18 - SEC.gov Article re Day Trading)(Related document(s)[107]) (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Ramzi Abadou in Support of 107 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, filed byBridgestone Investment Corporation Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 01 - Tempus International Fund Profile Page, # 2 Exhibit 02 - Bloomberg Profile of Opportunity Unique Fund, # 3 Exhibit 03 - One Minute Tick History at 12:47 PM, # 4 Exhibit 04 - O Globo Article with Certified Translation, # 5 Exhibit 05 - Price and Volume Tick History as of Aug. 07, 2018, # 6 Exhibit 06 - SEC.gov Page on Short Sales, # 7 Exhibit 07 - Infomoney Article July 21, 2016, # 8 Exhibit 08 - CNBC Article of March 2, 2016, # 9 Exhibit 09 - MarketWatch Article of March 1, 2016, # 10 Exhibit 10 - NFA Case Summary, # 11 Exhibit 11 - New York Times Article of June 8, 2017, # 12 Exhibit 12 - South China Morning Post Article of August 26, 2016, # 13 Exhibit 13 - South China Morning Post Article of January 13, 2017, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Reuters Article of October 23, 2018, # 15 Exhibit 15 - Yahoo! Finance High and Low Ranges, # 16 Exhibit 16 - SEC.gov Article Day Trading - Your Dollars At Risk, # 17 Exhibit 17 - SEC.gov Reported Testimony of Arthur Levitt, # 18 Exhibit 18 - SEC.gov Article re Day Trading)(Related document(s) 107 ) (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 10/23/2018) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [46] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [71] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [40] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [64] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [80] MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [41] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [45] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) And in Further Support re [47] filed byThierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 46 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 71 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 40 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 80 MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 41 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 45 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) And in Further Support re 47 filed byThierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/23/2018) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [71] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [40] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [64] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [80] MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof,, [41] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [45] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byBridgestone Investment Corporation Limited. (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 71 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 40 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 80 MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof,, 41 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 45 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byBridgestone Investment Corporation Limited. (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 10/23/2018) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [46] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [71] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [40] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [64] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [80] MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof,, [45] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byGlen Littleton. (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 46 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 71 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 40 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 80 MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof,, 45 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byGlen Littleton. (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 10/23/2018) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [46] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [71] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [40] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [64] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [80] MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof,, [41] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [45] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) Defendants' Response To Lead Plaintiff And Consolidation Motions filed byElon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Jason Han, Jiri Kulik, Deepak Mehta, Raghunath Nama, Esmaeil Riahi Notice of Non-Opposition (Hall, David) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Jason Han, Jiri Kulik, Deepak Mehta, Raghunath Nama, Esmaeil Riahi Notice of Non-Opposition (Hall, David) (Filed on 10/22/2018) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Reed R. Kathrein (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Notice of withdrawal of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Withdrawal of Motion NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION OF TESLA INVESTOR GROUP FOR CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [97] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [96] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [95] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [94] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018, Terminated: 10/18/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Robert N. Cappucci ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12767365.) filed by FNY Investment Advisers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Cappucci, Robert) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018, Terminated: 10/18/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12767334.) filed by Opportunity Unique Fund Inc., Tempus International Fund SPC. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Fox, Frederic) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018, Terminated: 10/18/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Arthur V. Nealon ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12767316.) filed by FNY Investment Advisers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Nealon, Arthur) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018, Terminated: 10/18/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Andrew J. Entwistle ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12767234.) filed by FNY Investment Advisers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Entwistle, Andrew) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [92] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018, Terminated: 10/15/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12758592.) filed by Thierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(McConville, Francis) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Interested Entities by FNY Investment Advisers, LLC (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [40] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel for attorney Arthur V. Nealon by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of FNY Investment Advisers, LLC (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [40] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel for attorney Andrew J. Entwistle by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of FNY Investment Advisers, LLC (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [40] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases for attorney Robert N. Cappucci by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of FNY Investment Advisers, LLC (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [40] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of FNY Investment Advisers, LLC (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re [80] MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions, MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; AMENDED by Dany David. (McCormick, Tricia) (Filed on 10/10/2018) Modified on 10/11/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Randi D. Bandman on behalf of Dany David (Bandman, Randi) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Randi D. Bandman on behalf of Dany David (Bandman, Randi) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Rachel Lynn Jensen on behalf of Dany David (Jensen, Rachel) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Rachel Lynn Jensen on behalf of Dany David (Jensen, Rachel) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Tricia Lynn McCormick on behalf of Dany David (McCormick, Tricia) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Tricia Lynn McCormick on behalf of Dany David (McCormick, Tricia) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by Dany David (McCormick, Tricia) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Interested Entities by Dany David (McCormick, Tricia) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Tricia L. McCormick in Support of [80] MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions, MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Dany David. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Related document(s)[80]) (McCormick, Tricia) (Filed on 10/9/2018) Modified on 10/11/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Tricia L. McCormick in Support of 80 MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions, MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Dany David. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 80 ) (McCormick, Tricia) (Filed on 10/9/2018) Modified on 10/11/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018, Terminated: 11/27/2018 Motion to consolidate casesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions, MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Dany David. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/23/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(McCormick, Tricia) (Filed on 10/9/2018) Modified on 10/11/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions, MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Dany David. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/23/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McCormick, Tricia) (Filed on 10/9/2018) Modified on 10/11/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Tricia Lynn McCormick (McCormick, Tricia) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Tricia Lynn McCormick (McCormick, Tricia) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by Alvin Abrams, Donald Freeland, Rajinder Gaur, Christopher Lyman re [74] MOTIONfor Consolidation of Related Actions, MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/9/2018) Modified on 10/11/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Interested Entities by Alvin Abrams, Donald Freeland, Rajinder Gaur, Christopher Lyman re 74 MOTIONfor Consolidation of Related Actions, MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/9/2018) Modified on 10/11/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [74] MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Jennifer Pafiti on behalf of Alvin Abrams, Donald Freeland, Rajinder Gaur, Christopher Lyman (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 74 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Jennifer Pafiti on behalf of Alvin Abrams, Donald Freeland, Rajinder Gaur, Christopher Lyman (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Interested Entities by Opportunity Unique Fund Inc., Tempus International Fund SPC re [71] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases (King, Laurence) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by Opportunity Unique Fund Inc., Tempus International Fund SPC re 71 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases (King, Laurence) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Jennifer Pafiti in Support of [74]for Consolidation of Related Actions, MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Alvin Abrams, Donald Freeland, Rajinder Gaur, Christopher Lyman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Press Release, # (2) Exhibit B - Certifications, # (3) Exhibit C - Loss Chart, # (4) Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Related document(s)[74]) (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/9/2018) Modified on 10/11/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Jennifer Pafiti in Support of 74 for Consolidation of Related Actions, MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Alvin Abrams, Donald Freeland, Rajinder Gaur, Christopher Lyman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Press Release, # 2 Exhibit B - Certifications, # 3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, # 4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Related document(s) 74 ) (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/9/2018) Modified on 10/11/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018, Terminated: 10/22/2018 Motion to consolidate casesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (WITHDRAWN - SEE [102] NOTICE) MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions, MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Donald Freeland, Alvin Abrams, Christopher Lyman, Rajinder Gaur. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/23/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/9/2018) Modified on 10/11/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/16/2018 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions, MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Donald Freeland, Alvin Abrams, Christopher Lyman, Rajinder Gaur. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/23/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/9/2018) Modified on 10/11/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [71] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases [Certificate of Attorney Mario M. Choi] by Laurence D. King on behalf of Opportunity Unique Fund Inc., Tempus International Fund SPC (King, Laurence) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 71 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases [Certificate of Attorney Mario M. Choi] by Laurence D. King on behalf of Opportunity Unique Fund Inc., Tempus International Fund SPC (King, Laurence) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [71] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Laurence D. King on behalf of Opportunity Unique Fund Inc., Tempus International Fund SPC (King, Laurence) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 71 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Laurence D. King on behalf of Opportunity Unique Fund Inc., Tempus International Fund SPC (King, Laurence) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018, Terminated: 11/27/2018 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Tempus International Fund SPC, Opportunity Unique Fund Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/23/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Laurence D. King in Support, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Proposed Order)(King, Laurence) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Tempus International Fund SPC, Opportunity Unique Fund Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/23/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Laurence D. King in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Proposed Order)(King, Laurence) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by James Johnson re [64] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Stocker, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Interested Entities by James Johnson re 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Stocker, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [64] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of Danielle Smith by Michael Walter Stocker on behalf of James Johnson (Stocker, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of Danielle Smith by Michael Walter Stocker on behalf of James Johnson (Stocker, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [64] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of Kristen McCulloch by Michael Walter Stocker on behalf of James Johnson (Stocker, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of Kristen McCulloch by Michael Walter Stocker on behalf of James Johnson (Stocker, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [64] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of Reed R. Kathrein by Michael Walter Stocker on behalf of James Johnson (Stocker, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of Reed R. Kathrein by Michael Walter Stocker on behalf of James Johnson (Stocker, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [64] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Michael Walter Stocker on behalf of James Johnson (Stocker, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Michael Walter Stocker on behalf of James Johnson (Stocker, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Michael W. Stocker in Support of [64] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byJames Johnson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, # (2) Exhibit B - PSLRA Certification, # (3) Exhibit C - Loss Chart, # (4) Exhibit D - HBSS Firm Resume)(Related document(s)[64]) (Stocker, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Michael W. Stocker in Support of 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byJames Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, # 2 Exhibit B - PSLRA Certification, # 3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, # 4 Exhibit D - HBSS Firm Resume)(Related document(s) 64 ) (Stocker, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018, Terminated: 11/27/2018 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by James Johnson. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/23/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Stocker, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by James Johnson. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/23/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Stocker, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, of David J. Schwartz by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Thierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, of David J. Schwartz by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Thierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, of Francis P. McConville by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Thierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, of Francis P. McConville by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Thierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Interested Entities by Bridgestone Investment Corporation Limited re [46] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [52] Declaration in Support,, (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Interested Entities by Bridgestone Investment Corporation Limited re 46 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 52 Declaration in Support,, (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, of U. Seth Ottensoser by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Thierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, of U. Seth Ottensoser by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Thierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, of Eric J. Belfi by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Thierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, of Eric J. Belfi by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Thierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, of Ashley C. Keller by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Thierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, of Ashley C. Keller by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Thierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, of Frank Busch by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Thierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, of Frank Busch by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Thierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, of Christopher J. Keller by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Thierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, of Christopher J. Keller by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Thierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [46] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , [52] Declaration in Support,, Pursuant to LR 3-7(d) by Ramzi Abadou on behalf of Bridgestone Investment Corporation Limited (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 46 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 52 Declaration in Support,, Pursuant to LR 3-7(d) by Ramzi Abadou on behalf of Bridgestone Investment Corporation Limited (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, Certification of James M. Wagstaffe by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Thierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, Certification of James M. Wagstaffe by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Thierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Interested Entities by Thierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC re [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Interested Entities by Thierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC re 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Ramzi Abadou in Support of [46] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byBridgestone Investment Corporation Limited. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: Certification and Transaction Schedule, # (2) Exhibit B: Loss Chart As A Result of Class Period Purchases, # (3) Exhibit C: Press Release, # (4) Exhibit D: Firm Resume of Kahn Swick & Foti, LLC, # (5) Exhibit E: Loss Chart As A Result of Class Period Transactions)(Related document(s)[46]) (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Ramzi Abadou in Support of 46 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byBridgestone Investment Corporation Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Certification and Transaction Schedule, # 2 Exhibit B: Loss Chart As A Result of Class Period Purchases, # 3 Exhibit C: Press Release, # 4 Exhibit D: Firm Resume of Kahn Swick & Foti, LLC, # 5 Exhibit E: Loss Chart As A Result of Class Period Transactions)(Related document(s) 46 ) (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe in Support of [47] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, filed byThierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Certification, # (2) Exhibit B - Loss Analysis, # (3) Exhibit C - Notice, # (4) Exhibit D - Joint Declaration, # (5) Exhibit E - Keller Lenkner Firm Resume, # (6) Exhibit F - Labaton Sucharow Firm Resume, # (7) Exhibit G - James Wagstaffe Biography, # (8) Exhibit H - Draft of Proposed Motion, # (9) Exhibit I - Curriculum Vitae of Harvey L. Pitt)(Related document(s)[47]) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe in Support of 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, filed byThierry Boutin, Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certification, # 2 Exhibit B - Loss Analysis, # 3 Exhibit C - Notice, # 4 Exhibit D - Joint Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E - Keller Lenkner Firm Resume, # 6 Exhibit F - Labaton Sucharow Firm Resume, # 7 Exhibit G - James Wagstaffe Biography, # 8 Exhibit H - Draft of Proposed Motion, # 9 Exhibit I - Curriculum Vitae of Harvey L. Pitt)(Related document(s) 47 ) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by Jason Han, Jiri Kulik, Deepak Mehta, Raghunath Nama, Esmaeil Riahi re [45] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Hall, David) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Interested Entities by Jason Han, Jiri Kulik, Deepak Mehta, Raghunath Nama, Esmaeil Riahi re 45 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Hall, David) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [45] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases by David William Hall on behalf of Jason Han, Jiri Kulik, Deepak Mehta, Raghunath Nama, Esmaeil Riahi (Hall, David) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 45 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases by David William Hall on behalf of Jason Han, Jiri Kulik, Deepak Mehta, Raghunath Nama, Esmaeil Riahi (Hall, David) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Laurence Hasson in Support of [45] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byJason Han, Jiri Kulik, Deepak Mehta, Raghunath Nama, Esmaeil Riahi. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Notice, # (2) Exhibit B - Sworn Certifications, # (3) Exhibit C - Loss Chart, # (4) Exhibit D - Firm Resume of Bernstein Liebhard LLP, # (5) Exhibit E - Firm Resume of Hedin Hall LLP)(Related document(s)[45]) (Hall, David) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Laurence Hasson in Support of 45 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byJason Han, Jiri Kulik, Deepak Mehta, Raghunath Nama, Esmaeil Riahi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Notice, # 2 Exhibit B - Sworn Certifications, # 3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, # 4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume of Bernstein Liebhard LLP, # 5 Exhibit E - Firm Resume of Hedin Hall LLP)(Related document(s) 45 ) (Hall, David) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018, Terminated: 11/27/2018 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, filed by Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Thierry Boutin, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/23/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, filed by Andrew E. Left, PROtecto Informatikai Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Thierry Boutin, Dr. Abrar Shirazi, Vilas Capital Management LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/23/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018, Terminated: 11/27/2018 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Bridgestone Investment Corporation Limited. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/23/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Bridgestone Investment Corporation Limited. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/23/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018, Terminated: 11/27/2018 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Jiri Kulik, Jason Han, Esmaeil Riahi, Deepak Mehta, Raghunath Nama. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/23/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Hall, David) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Jiri Kulik, Jason Han, Esmaeil Riahi, Deepak Mehta, Raghunath Nama. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/23/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hall, David) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Interested Entities by Glen Littleton (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by Glen Littleton (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Adam Christopher McCall on behalf of Glen Littleton (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Adam Christopher McCall on behalf of Glen Littleton (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Adam C. McCall in Support of [41] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byGlen Littleton. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Related document(s)[41]) (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 42 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Adam C. McCall in Support of 41 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byGlen Littleton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 41 ) (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018, Terminated: 11/27/2018 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Glen Littleton. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/23/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(McCall, Adam) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Glen Littleton. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/23/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McCall, Adam) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018, Terminated: 11/27/2018 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by FNY Investment Advisers, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/23/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Marc Seltzer In Support of Motion for Appointment, # (2) Proposed Order)(Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: 10/2/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [36] Stipulation.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: 10/2/2018 Order on Motion to Relate CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Related Case Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [35] Motion to Relate Case. Related case: 18-cv-5899-RS. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. re [35] MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related, [36] STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [35] MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018, Terminated: 10/2/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [35] MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018, Terminated: 10/2/2018 MOTION to Relate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting (31) Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaints and Comtinuing Case Management Conference and Associated Deadlines in case 3:18-cv-04865-EMC.Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-04865-EMC, 3:18-cv-04876-EMC, 3:18-cv-04912-EMC, 3:18-cv-04939-EMC, 3:18-cv-04948-EMC, 3:18-cv-05258-EMC, 3:18-cv-05463-EMC, 3:18-cv-05470-EMC(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Application for Refund
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application for Refund re [27] Refund Status, [32] Refund Status, [30] Application for Refund, [25] Application for Refund, Receipt Number 12586757 SECOND AMENDED by Kalman Isaacs. (George, Eric) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Refund Status
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Refund Status re [30] Application for Refund DECLINED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/26/2018, Terminated: 9/28/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [1] Complaint, [29] Clerk's Notice, [4] INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC Class Action,, [13] Waiver of Service Executed Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Extending Time For Defendants To Respond To Complaints And Continuing Case Management Conference And Associated Deadlines filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: 9/25/2018 Application for Refund
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application for Refund re [27] Refund Status, [25] Application for Refund, Receipt Number 12586757 AMENDED APPLICATION by Kalman Isaacs. (George, Eric) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE: Due to the Court's unavailability, the Initial Case Management Conference is advanced from 11/8/2018 to 11/5/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint CMC Statement due date remains unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Decision
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED Clerk's Notice DECLINING Video Recording re: (16 in 3:18-cv-04912-EMC, 15 in 3:18-cv-04948-EMC, 15 in 3:18-cv-05470-EMC, 18 in 3:18-cv-05463-EMC, 16 in 3:18-cv-04939-EMC, 18 in 3:18-cv-05258-EMC, 16 in 3:18-cv-04876-EMC, 24 in 3:18-cv-04865-EMC) re Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Refund Status
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Refund Status re [25] Application for Refund DECLINED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Decision
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Clerk's Notice CONSENTING TO Video Recording re: (16 in 3:18-cv-04912-EMC, 15 in 3:18-cv-04948-EMC, 15 in 3:18-cv-05470-EMC, 18 in 3:18-cv-05463-EMC, 16 in 3:18-cv-04939-EMC, 18 in 3:18-cv-05258-EMC, 16 in 3:18-cv-04876-EMC, 24 in 3:18-cv-04865-EMC) Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Application for Refund
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-12586830 by Kalman Isaacs. (George, Eric) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. Video Camera hearing set for 11/8/2018 09:30 AM. Objections to Video Recording due 9/21/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RELATED CASE ORDER relating the following cases: 18-cv-4876-JST, 18-cv-4912-CRB, 18-cv-4939-EMC, 18-cv-4948-HSG, 18-cv-5258-LHK, 18-cv-5463-VC, and 18-cv-5470-YGR. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/12/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [19] Stipulation Re Administrative Motion to Relate Cases. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of CasesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 18-cv-05463-VC. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/12/2018. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. re [19] STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [18] MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion To Relate Cases; Response To Sua Sponte Judicial Referral , [18] MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion To Relate Cases; Response To Sua Sponte Judicial Referral Proof of Service (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018, Terminated: 9/12/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [18] MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion To Relate Cases; Response To Sua Sponte Judicial Referral filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018, Terminated: 9/12/2018 MOTION to Relate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion To Relate Cases; Response To Sua Sponte Judicial Referral filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/5/2018. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Interested Entities by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Dean S. Kristy Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Kristy, Dean) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Kalman Isaacs of Filing and Service of Notice Required by the PSLRA (Local Rule 23-1(a)) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice)(Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kalman Isaacs. Service waived by Elon Musk waiver sent on 8/16/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; Tesla, Inc. waiver sent on 8/16/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Roth, Carl) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [8] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [7] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/28/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RELATING CASE: [6] MOTION to Relate Case filed by Carlos Maia. Case related: 18-cv-4939-LHK. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/28/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018, Terminated: 8/28/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12600458.) filed by Kalman Isaacs. (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 8/16/2018) Modified on 8/17/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018, Terminated: 8/28/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12600412.) filed by Kalman Isaacs. (Ottensoser, Uri) (Filed on 8/16/2018) Modified on 8/17/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018, Terminated: 8/28/2018 MOTION to Relate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Relate Case filed by Carlos Maia. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Choi, Mario) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order SEC Class Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION: SEC Class Action Notice due by 8/31/2018. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case assigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Summons. (George, Eric) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12586830). Filed by Kalman Isaacs. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(George, Eric) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/14/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 3,614 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?