Chamberlain v. Tesla, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-04876-EMC
District Judge Edward M. Chen, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 6, 2019 at 9:45 PM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo William Chamberlain, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reed R. Kathrein +1 415 896 6300 +1 415 896 6301 reed@hbsslaw.com
on behalf of himself and all other similarly situated Danielle Smith +1 510 725 3038 +1 510 725 3001 danielles@hbsslaw.com
on behalf of himself and all other similarly situated Michael Walter Stocker +1 212 907 0882 +1 212 883 7082 mikes@hbsslaw.com
v.
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elon Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Corinne Bretan +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 jbretan@fenwick.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Dean S. Kristy +1 415 875 2324 +1 415 281 1350 dkristy@fenwick.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara Rachelle Ludmer +1 415 875 2000 +1 415 281 1350 mludmer@fenwick.com
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Corinne Bretan +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 jbretan@fenwick.com
Space Dean S. Kristy +1 415 875 2324 +1 415 281 1350 dkristy@fenwick.com
Space Mara Rachelle Ludmer +1 415 875 2000 +1 415 281 1350 mludmer@fenwick.com
Office San Francisco
Filed 8/10/2018
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 77 Securities Fraud
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Santa Clara
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead CounselCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying [22] Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  Create Case Association
    Create association: case consolidated, all future filings shall be made in 3:18-cv-04865-EMC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: 11/16/2018 Motion HearingCourt Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 11/15/2018 re: MOTIONS to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel: 3:18-cv-05258-EMC [24], 3:18-cv-04912-EMC [22], 3:18-cv-05463-EMC [32], 3:18-cv-04876-EMC [22], 3:18-cv-05899-EMC [19], 3:18-cv-04939-EMC [22], 3:18-cv-04865-EMC [46], 3:18-cv-04865-EMC [71], 3:18-cv-04865-EMC [40], 3:18-cv-04865-EMC [64], 3:18-cv-04865-EMC [80], 3:18-cv-04865-EMC [47], 3:18-cv-04865-EMC [41], 3:18-cv-04948-EMC [21], 3:18-cv-04865-EMC [45], 3:18-cv-05470-EMC [24]. Motions taken under submission. Status Report due by 1/10/2019. Status Conference set for 1/17/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen.Total Time in Court: 1 Hour; 17 Minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. Plaintiff Attorneys: Elizabeth Cabraser, Katherine Lubin, Danielle Myers, Rachel Jensen, Ramsey Abadou, Mario Choi, Laurence King, Frederick Fox, Robert Cappucci, Mark Seltzer, Reed Kathrein. Defendant Attorneys: Dean Kristy, Jennifer Bretan, Ashley Keller, Christopher Keller, Frank Busch. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/15/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
        Certificate of Interested Entities by FNY Investment Advisers, LLC (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Certificate of counsel
          CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [22] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel for attorney Arthur V. Nealon by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of FNY Investment Advisers, LLC (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Certificate of counsel
            CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [22] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel for attorney Andrew J. Entwistle by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of FNY Investment Advisers, LLC (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Certificate of counsel
              CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [22] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel for attorney Robert N. Cappucci by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of FNY Investment Advisers, LLC (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Certificate of counsel
                CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [22] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of FNY Investment Advisers, LLC (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018, Terminated: 11/27/2018 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead CounselCourt Filing
                  MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by FNY Investment Advisers, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/23/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Marc Seltzer In Support of Motion for Appointment, # (2) Proposed Order)(Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                    Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting (31) Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaints and Comtinuing Case Management Conference and Associated Deadlines in case 3:18-cv-04865-EMC.Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-04865-EMC, 3:18-cv-04876-EMC, 3:18-cv-04912-EMC, 3:18-cv-04939-EMC, 3:18-cv-04948-EMC, 3:18-cv-05258-EMC, 3:18-cv-05463-EMC, 3:18-cv-05470-EMC(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/26/2018, Terminated: 10/31/2018 stipulation
                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [1] Complaint, [19] Clerk's Notice, [10] Waiver of Service Executed, [15] Case Management Scheduling Order, Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Extending Time For Defendants To Respond To Complaints And Continuing Case Management Conference And Associated Deadlines filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 19 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Clerks Notice
                        CLERK'S NOTICE: Due to the Court's unavailability, the Initial Case Management Conference is advanced from 11/8/2018 to 11/5/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint CMC Statement due date remains unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Decision
                          AMENDED Clerk's Notice DECLINING Video Recording re: (16 in 3:18-cv-04912-EMC, 15 in 3:18-cv-04948-EMC, 15 in 3:18-cv-05470-EMC, 18 in 3:18-cv-05463-EMC, 16 in 3:18-cv-04939-EMC, 18 in 3:18-cv-05258-EMC, 16 in 3:18-cv-04876-EMC, 24 in 3:18-cv-04865-EMC) re Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Decision
                            Clerk's Notice CONSENTING TO Video Recording re: (16 in 3:18-cv-04912-EMC, 15 in 3:18-cv-04948-EMC, 15 in 3:18-cv-05470-EMC, 18 in 3:18-cv-05463-EMC, 16 in 3:18-cv-04939-EMC, 18 in 3:18-cv-05258-EMC, 16 in 3:18-cv-04876-EMC, 24 in 3:18-cv-04865-EMC) Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request
                              Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. Video Camera hearing set for 11/8/2018 09:30 AM. Objections to Video Recording due 9/21/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 Case Management Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2018. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/13/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                  Case Reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Judge Jon S. Tigar no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                    RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are further related: 18-cv-4865-EMC, 18-cv-4912-CRB, 18-cv-4939-EMC, 18-cv-4948-HSG, 18-cv-5258-LHK, 18-cv-5463-VC, and 18-cv-5470-YGR. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/12/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                      Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Notice of appearance
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Dean S. Kristy - Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Kristy, Dean) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 waiver of service executed
                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by William Chamberlain. Service waived by Elon Musk waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018; Tesla, Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 Summons issued
                                            Summons Issued as to Defendants Elon Musk & Tesla, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                              CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order, # (2) Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Proposed Summons
                                                Proposed Summons. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/13/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Order of recusalCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/13/18. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                      Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 Affidavit
                                                        Certification of William Chamberlain Pursuant to Federal Securities Law re [1] Complaint filed by William Chamberlain. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 Proposed Summons
                                                          Proposed Summons. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 Complaint
                                                            CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Tesla, Inc. & Elon Musk, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12587489). Filed by William Chamberlain. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018 (tnS, COURT STAFF).
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 255 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?