Wacker Drive Executive Suites, LLC v. Jones Lang LaSalle Americas (Illinois), LP
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-05492

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 5, 2020 at 3:06 PM ST (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wacker Drive Executive Suites, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Foster, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard W. Foster +1 312 726 1600 +1 866 470 5738 hfoster@fosterpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew A. Galin +1 312 726 1600 +1 866 470 5738 mgalin@fosterpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephan Zouras, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan F Stephan +1 312 233 1550 +1 312 233 1560 rstephan@stephanzouras.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James B. Zouras +1 312 233 1550 +1 312 233 1560 jzouras@stephanzouras.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Walner Law Firm Ltd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Ross Walner +1 312 201 1616 +1 312 201 1538 awalner@walnerlawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Jones Lang LaSalle Americas (Illinois), LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Francis Gaffney +1 847 322 2178 +1 312 324 1001 kgaffney@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather Jean Nelson +1 313 324 1000 heather.nelson@morganlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Thomas Schutte +1 312 324 1773 +1 312 324 1001 scott.schutte@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephanie Lynn Sweitzer +1 312 324 1741 +1 312 324 1001 ssweitzer@morganlewis.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1964
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: None File Excess Pages
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Certify Class
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None order on motion to seal document
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Seal Document
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Seal Document
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE by James B. Zouras of Change of Address (Zouras, James) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas (Illinois), LP by Heather Jean Nelson (Nelson, Heather) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer 18 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead by 10/15/2018. The motion presentment date of 9/19/2018 is stricken; parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie L. Sweitzer for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 18 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/19/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Sweitzer, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                            MOTION by Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas (Illinois), LP for extension of time to file answer UNOPPOSED (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas (Illinois), LP by Scott T. Schutte (Schutte, Scott) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas (Illinois), LP by Kevin Francis Gaffney (Gaffney, Kevin) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas (Illinois), LP by Stephanie L. Sweitzer (Scott Schutte) (Sweitzer, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas (Illinois), LP by Stephanie L. Sweitzer (Stephanie Sweitzer) (Sweitzer, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas (Illinois), LP by Stephanie L. Sweitzer (Kevin Gaffney) (Sweitzer, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas (Illinois), LP by Stephanie L. Sweitzer (Heather Nelson) (Sweitzer, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE by Ryan F Stephan of Change of Address (Stephan, Ryan) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wacker Drive Executive Suites, LLC as to Jones Lang LaSalle Americas (Illinois), LP on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. (Zouras, James) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None set deadlines/hearingsCourt Filing
                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 10/16/2018 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None attorney appearance
                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wacker Drive Executive Suites, LLC by Matthew A Galin (Galin, Matthew) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None attorney appearance
                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wacker Drive Executive Suites, LLC by Aaron Ross Walner (Walner, Aaron) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None attorney appearance
                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wacker Drive Executive Suites, LLC by Howard William Foster (Foster, Howard) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot(MIDP)
                                                                                      NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, ) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None attorney appearance
                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wacker Drive Executive Suites, LLC by Ryan F Stephan (Stephan, Ryan) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None attorney appearance
                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wacker Drive Executive Suites, LLC by James B. Zouras (Zouras, James) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                            CIVIL Cover Sheet (Zouras, James) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Complaint
                                                                                              COMPLAINT filed by Wacker Drive Executive Suites, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14814650.(Zouras, James)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None case assigned
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. (jjr, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas (Illinois), LP (dal, )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?