JWJ Hotel Holdings, Inc. v. W&H Realty, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kansas District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-02409

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 14, 2018 at 3:15 PM EDT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo JWJ Hotel Holdings, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Marie Masoner +1 816 374 3208 +1 816 374 3300 michelle.masoner@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by One Kansas City Place

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurence M. Frazen +1 816 374 3200 lmfrazen@bryancave.com
v.
No Logo Greggory D. Groves, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stinson Leonard Street LLP - Walnut

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas J. Zluticky +1 816 691 3278 +1 816 412 9388 nicholas.zluticky@stinson.com
No Logo Jacqueline O. Dowdy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stinson Morrison Hecker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas J. Zluticky +1 816 691 3278 +1 816 412 9388 nicholas.zluticky@stinson.com
No Logo W&H Realty, LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1446
Nature of Suit Real Property: Other
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by JWJ Hotel Holdings, Inc. (Masoner, Michelle)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Letter
    Letter to counsel on Transfer In of case regarding pro hac vice requirements. (hw)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 case transferred in - district transfer
      CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-00454. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER granting 2 Motion to Transfer Venue, denying without prejudice 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Appoint Receiver, and terminating this case in this court. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8/9/18. (sct) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 08/09/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE by Plaintiff JWJ Hotel Holdings, Inc. of filing copies of the Adversary Proceeding No. 18-06055: Complaint and Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant in Kansas Bankruptcy Court and Order of the Bankruptcy Court denying said motion (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint filed in Kansas Bankruptcy Court, # 2 Exhibit Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed in Kansas Bankruptcy Court, # 3 Exhibit Order of Kansas Bankruptcy Court Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (Ashdown, Philomena) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 08/07/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Transcript of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on July 30, 2018, before Judge Timothy S. Black. Court Reporter/Transcriber Luke Lavin (Official), Telephone number (513) 564-7500. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 8/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/6/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2018. (Lavin, Luke) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 08/06/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE by Plaintiff JWJ Hotel Holdings, Inc. of Filing Exhibits Under Seal (Ashdown, Philomena) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE by Plaintiff JWJ Hotel Holdings, Inc. re 17 Reply to Response to Motion, of Filing of Executed Supplemental Affidavit of Michael Kammerer (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Affidavit of Michael Kammerer) (Ashdown, Philomena) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas J. Zluticky. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/26/18. (jlm) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION to Appoint Receiver MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction and Appoint Receiver filed by Plaintiff JWJ Hotel Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exh A; Supplemental Affidavit of Michael Kammerer, # 2 Exhibit Exh B; TRO Motion filed by Defendants July 25 2018 in Kansas Bankr Court) (Ashdown, Philomena) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 07/26/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 2 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendants Jacqueline O. Dowdy, Greggory D. Groves. (Owen, Andrew) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 07/26/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Plaintiff JWJ Hotel Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Joseph J. Braun) (Braun, Joseph) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 07/23/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Appoint Receiver MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction and Appoint Receiver filed by Defendants Jacqueline O. Dowdy, Greggory D. Groves. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA) (Owen, Andrew) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 07/20/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6523514) of Nicholas J. Zluticky by Defendants Jacqueline O. Dowdy, Greggory D. Groves. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Owen, Andrew)[Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 07/18/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE by Plaintiff JWJ Hotel Holdings, Inc. re 1 Notice of Removal,, Regarding Federal Bankruptcy Rule 9027(e)(3) (Ashdown, Philomena) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction and Appoint Receiver by Plaintiff JWJ Hotel Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Michael Kammerer, # 2 Exhibit Resume of Proposed Receiver, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Appointing Receiver) (Ashdown, Philomena). Added MOTION to Appoint Receiver, MOTION for Permanent Injunction on 7/16/2018 (sct). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 2 MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Kansas filed by Plaintiff JWJ Hotel Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - First Amended and Restated Operating Agreement, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Attachment to Corrected Order Confirming Plan, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing of Plans Supplement, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Transcript of Bankruptcy Court 5-14-18) (Ashdown, Philomena) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff JWJ Hotel Holdings, Inc. re 3 Notice of Appearance, 4 Notice of Appearance (Ashdown, Philomena) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by Defendant Jacqueline O. Dowdy. (Filed in Hamilton County Common Pleas Court). (jlm) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by Plaintiff JWJ Hotel Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh 1 Plan Confirmation Order Sections 10 and 37, # 2 Exhibit Exh 2 Plan Attachment- Treatment of JWJ/AJJ objections, # 3 Exhibit Exh 3 WHR Lexington Promissory Note to Fifth Third, # 4 Exhibit Exh 4 Consent ot Western & Southern to Receiver Appointment) (Ashdown, Philomena) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Plaintiff JWJ Hotel Holdings, Inc. Originally filed in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas on 6/21/18. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Michael Kammerer) (sct) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JWJ Hotel Holdings, Inc. Originally filed in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas on 6/21/18. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-J) (sct) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J Braun for Plaintiff JWJ Hotel Holdings, Inc. (Braun, Joseph) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Philomena S Ashdown for Plaintiff JWJ Hotel Holdings, Inc. (Ashdown, Philomena) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION to Change Venue by Defendants Jacqueline O. Dowdy, Jacqueline O. Dowdy, Greggory D. Groves. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I) (Owen, Andrew) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Common Pleas Court, case number A1803093 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6509205), filed by Greggory D. Groves, Jacqueline O. Dowdy(In Her Capacity as Co-Trustee), Jacqueline O. Dowdy(In Her Capacity as Co-Manager of W&H Realty, LLC). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Complaint, # 4 Motion for TRO and Receiver, # 5 Summons, # 6 Notice of Hearing, # 7 Certified Mail - return service, # 8 Memorandum in Opposition, # 9 Exhibit B, # 10 Exhibit C, # 11 Exhibit D, # 12 Exhibit E, # 13 Exhibit F, # 14 Exhibit G, # 15 Exhibit H, # 16 Exhibit I, # 17 Exhibit J) (Owen, Andrew) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?