Viray v. Bedolla
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-04900

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 25, 2019 at 10:58 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Receipt
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None USCA Scheduling Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Request
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Request
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Request
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                AMENDED ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART 5 THE UNITED STATES MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/9/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERLast Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 6/6/2019 09:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2019 01:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 10/25/2019, 10/28/2019 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 10/28/2019, 10/29/2019, 1 0/30/2019, 10/31/2019, 11/1/2019, 11/4/2019, 11/5/2019, 11/6/2019, 11/7/2019, 11/8/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman.Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/10/2018. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART 5 THE UNITED STATES MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/4/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Order Relating Case
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None notice of removal
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?