Star Systems International Limited v. Neology, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-00574

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 22, 2019 at 10:36 AM ST (1.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (71) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/14/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Amended Answer to Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Transcript/Digital Audio Recording Request
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Transcript/Digital Audio Recording Request
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is ORDERED that Star Systems International Limited's Motion to Remand is hereby DENIED (Dkt. # 13 ). As a result, Star Systems International Limited's request for costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees incurred pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ยง 1447(c) is also DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/5/2018. (rpc, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None protective order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None protective order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Remand*
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None notice of removal
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?