Yeager v. Tesla, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-04912-CRB
District Judge Charles R. Breyer, presiding

Tags
Last Updated November 27, 2018 at 4:27 PM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Yeager, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Jasnoch +1 619 233 4565 +1 619 233 0508 jjasnoch@scott-scott.com
Space Joseph Allan Pettigrew +1 619 233 4565 +1 619 233 0508
v.
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elon Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Office San Francisco
Filed 8/13/2018
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Counsel
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Counsel
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Counsel
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Counsel
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. Video Camera hearing set for 11/8/2018 09:30 AM. Objections to Video Recording due 9/21/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2018. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/13/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Case Reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Judge Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are further related: 18-cv-4876-JST, 18-cv-4865-EMC, 18-cv-4939-EMC, 18-cv-4948-HSG, 18-cv-5258-LHK, 18-cv-5463-VC, and 18-cv-5470-YGR. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/12/2018. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/12/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                          Certificate of Interested Entities by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Dean S. Kristy Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Kristy, Dean) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 waiver of service executed
                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by John Yeager. Service waived by Tesla, Inc. waiver sent on 8/17/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 waiver of service executed
                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by John Yeager. Service waived by Elon Musk waiver sent on 8/17/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                  ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Thomas L. Laughlin, IV by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 Pro Hac Vice
                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12609192.) filed by John Yeager. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Laughlin, Thomas) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 Summons issued
                                      Summons Issued as to Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order SEC Class Action
                                        INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras SEC Class Action Notice due by 9/4/2018. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2018 08:30 AM. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 4 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                          Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 Civil Cover Sheet
                                            Civil Cover Sheet by John Yeager . (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Proposed Summons
                                              Proposed Summons. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT against Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12591280.). Filed byJohn Yeager. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 147 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?