Plattenburg v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 9:18-cv-00144

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 2, 2018 at 11:31 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Real Property: Other
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
          ORDER ADOPTING 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's "Rule 12(b)(3) Notice of Improper Venue" construed as Plaintiff's "Motion to Remand" 9 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 10/26/18. (ljw, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None scheduling conference
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Status report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Status report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Order of recusal
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None notice of removal
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?