SMITH v. GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01906

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 18, 2018 at 5:31 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ERIC O. SMITH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by AIDS Healthcare Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Blend +1 202 543 1081 jeffrey.blend@aidshealth.org
v.
Gilead Sciences, Inc. Gilead Sciences, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Stipulation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Rule 26a1 Statement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 Electronic Summons Issued
              SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018 Notice - other
                NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND by Eric O. Smith re 1 Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Corrected Version of Complaint)(Blend, Jeffrey)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT against GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5638885) filed by Eric O. Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Blend, Jeffrey)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 3 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?