Maia v. Musk et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-04939

Tags
Last Updated November 27, 2018 at 4:27 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carlos Maia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laurence David King +1 415 772 4700 +1 415 772 4707 lking@kaplanfox.com
v.
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elon R. Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Office San Francisco
Filed 8/14/2018
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Santa Clara
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Counsel
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Counsel
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Counsel
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Counsel
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Order Relating Case
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Case Management Scheduling Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Order Relating Case
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Order Relating Case
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Relate Case
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 Proposed Summons
                                          Proposed Summons. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12595192.). Filed byCarlos Maia. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Laurence) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 147 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?