KENNEDY v. JONES

Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:18-cv-03442-EGS
District Judge EDWARD G. SMITH, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge EDWARD G. SMITH
Last Updated April 30, 2022 at 2:32 PM EDT (3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Kennedy, Edward Thomas, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY"
v.
No Logo BRIAN S JONES, Defendant
No Logo BRUCE K. MENEELY, Defendant
No Logo Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Defendant
No Logo DAVID JOHN KAUTTER, Defendant
No Logo HARRY J. NEGRO, Defendant
No Logo INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, Defendant
No Logo JOVITA CARRANZA, Defendant
No Logo MEGAN BRENNAN, Defendant
No Logo Michael Wright, Defendant
No Logo NANCY B. ROMANO, Defendant
No Logo OFFICE OF TREASURER OF THE UNITED STATES, Defendant
No Logo R.B. SIMMONS, Defendant
No Logo STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN, Defendant
No Logo THOMAS MARSHALL, Defendant
United States Department of the Treasury United States Department of the Treasury, Defendant
United States Postal Service United States Postal Service, Defendant
No Logo WILLIAM M. PAUL, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit Tax Suits: Taxes
Office Allentown
Filed 8/13/2018
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Lack of Jurisdiction
County Lehigh
Terminated 11/14/2018
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,A/R,SPECIAL
Timeline
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: 1/2/2019 Order on Motion for order
ORDER THAT THE "MOTION TO COMPEL ASSIGNED JUDGE TO RECUSE FOR CAUSE" (DOC. NO. 14) IS DENIED. THE "OBJECTION" (DOC. NO. 15), WHICH THE COURT HAS CONSTRUED AS A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 1/2/19.1/2/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PROSE PLAINTIFF. (er, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Objections
Objections filed by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY regarding [13] Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion). Certificate of Service. (mas, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Motion for order
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL ASSIGNED JUDGE TO RECUSE FOR CAUSE FILED BY EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT. (mas, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion)
ORDER THAT THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 10) IS DISMISSED AS FOLLOWS: (A) ANY CLAIMS SEEKING REVIEW OF TAX COURT PROCEEDINGS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION; (B) THE PLAINTIFF'S FEDERAL CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; (C) THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM THAT THE DEFENDANTS HAVE FAILED TO PROVIDE A REPUBLICAN FORM OF GOVERNMENT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; AND (D) THE PLAINTIFF'S STATE-LAW TORT CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION. THE PLAINTIFF MAY NOT FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THIS MATTER. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS MATTER AS CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 11/14/18. 11/14/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. (er, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Memorandum and/or Opinion
MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 11/14/18. 11/14/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(er, ) Modified on 11/14/2018 (er, ).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/2/2018 Notice - Other
JUDICIAL NOTICE by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY, FINDING OF FACTS (er, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous relief
ORDER THE TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE TAKE JUDICIAL COGNIZANCE (DOC. NO. 6), TO THE EXTENT THAT THE PLAINTIFF SEEKS ANY RELIEF, IS DENIED. THE MOTION FOR US MARSHAL SERVICE TO PROVIDE SERVICE OF PROCESS AND OBJECTIONS (DOC. NO. 7) IS DENIED AND ANY OBJECTIONS CONTAINED THEREIN ARE OVERRULED. AND THE MOTION FOR AUTHORIZATION TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY (DOC. NO. 8) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 9/27/18.9/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(er, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, BRIAN S JONES, BRUCE K. MENEELY, HARRY J. NEGRO, WILLIAM M. PAUL, NANCY B. ROMANO, R.B. SIMMONS, MICHAEL WRIGHT, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF TREASURER OF THE UNITED STATES, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, DAVID JOHN KAUTTER, STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN, JOVITA CARRANZA, MEGAN BRENNAN, THOMAS MARSHALL, filed by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(er, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/26/2018, Terminated: 9/27/2018 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION FOR AUTHORIZATION TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY filed by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (er, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/26/2018, Terminated: 9/27/2018 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION FOR US MARSHAL SERVICE TO PROVIDE SERVICE OF PROCESS AND OBJECTIONS filed by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(er, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/26/2018 Notice - Other
TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE - TAKE COGNIZANCE by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (er, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion)
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (DOC. NO. 1) IS GRANTED AND THE PLAINTIFF HAS LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 2) IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION. THE PLAINTIFF HAS LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO PROVIDE THE PLAINTIFF WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURTS STANDARD FORM TO BE USED BY A PRO SE LITIGANT FILING A CIVIL ACTION BEARING THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. THE PLAINTIFF MAY USE THIS FORM TO FILE HIS AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 9/21/18. 9/21/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF WITH CURRENT STANDARD FORMS.(er, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Memorandum and/or Opinion
MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 9/21/18. 9/21/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(er, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018 Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018 Complaint
COMPLAINT against MARK W. EVERSON, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, BRIAN S JONES, DAVID J. KAUTTER, JOHN KOSKINEN, BRUCE K. MENEELY, HARRY J. NEGRO, WILLIAM M. PAUL, NANCY B. ROMANO, CHARLES O. ROSSOTTI, DOUGLAS H. SHULMAN, R.B. SIMMONS, MICHAEL WRIGHT, filed by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY. (Attachments: # (1) Envelope)(jwl, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY..(jwl, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Jury Demand
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY. (jwl, ) Modified on 8/15/2018 (md).
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 6 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?