Dua v. Tesla Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-04948-HSG
District Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr, presiding

Tags
Last Updated November 27, 2018 at 4:27 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kewal Dua, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Jasnoch +1 619 233 4565 +1 619 233 0508 jjasnoch@scott-scott.com
v.
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elon Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Office Oakland
Filed 8/15/2018
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County San Francisco
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Counsel
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Counsel
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Counsel
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Counsel
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Case Management Scheduling Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Case Assigned/Reassigned
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Order Relating Case
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                        Case assigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018 Proposed Summons
                                          Proposed Summons. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12596741.). Filed byKewal Dua. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 270 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?