VanCamp v. Janssen Research & Development LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-07825

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 1, 2020 at 12:25 PM DT (7.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ruth VanCamp, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy R Fleishman +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 wfleishman@lchb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ADAM HERBERT WEINTRAUB +1 212 355 9500 aweintraub@lchb.com
v.
No Logo Bayer AG, Defendant
Bayer Corporation Bayer Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Bayer HealthCare AG, Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC Bayer Healthcare LLC, Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bayer Pharma AG, Defendant
No Logo Janssen Ortho, LLC, Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON Company JOHNSON & JOHNSON Company, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 OrderCourt Filing
    PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018 Summons issued
      Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG. (tk)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 Complaint
          COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare AG, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7064488) filed by Ruth VanCamp. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceutical Inc., # 3 Summons Bayer Pharma AG)Attorney Wendy R. Fleishman added to party Ruth VanCamp(pty:pla).(Fleishman, Wendy) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/22/2018) (tk). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/22/2018) (tk). (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/22/2018) (tk).
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 7 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?