Pendergraft v. Board of Regents of Oklahoma Colleges
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oklahoma Western District Court, Case No. 5:18-cv-00793

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 10, 2021 at 4:48 PM DT (1.8 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Civil Rights: Jobs
  Entries (113) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: None Leave
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: None extension of time
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Quash
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/3/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/3/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/30/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: None Extend Deadlines or Hearings
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Quash
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Extend Deadlines or Hearings
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Strike
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Quash
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: None Objections
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Quash
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Subpoena Returned Executed as to Non-party
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Objections
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Exhibit List / Witness List
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Exhibit List
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: None Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None Docket
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Leave
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: None Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying as moot 10 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/1/2018. (mb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None order on motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?