DVORAK v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01941

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 3, 2019 at 6:34 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALBIN SABOTIC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 203

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James O. Hacking, III +1 314 961 8200 +1 314 961 8201 jim@hackinglawpractice.com
No Logo ALBINA I. DVORAK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 203

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James O. Hacking, III +1 314 961 8200 +1 314 961 8201 jim@hackinglawpractice.com
No Logo EDIN SABOTIC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 203

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James O. Hacking, III +1 314 961 8200 +1 314 961 8201 jim@hackinglawpractice.com
v.
Nielsen, Kirstjen Nielsen, Kirstjen, Defendant
Officially listed as "KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN"
No Logo KYLE SCOTT, Defendant
No Logo L. FRANCIS CISSNA, Defendant
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL POMPEO"
No Logo U.S. CONSULATE, BELGRADE, SERBIA, Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant
Citation Section 08 U.S.C. § 1329
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Stay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                SUMMONS (9) Issued Electronically as to L. FRANCIS CISSNA, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, MICHAEL POMPEO, KYLE SCOTT, U.S. CONSULATE, BELGRADE, SERBIA, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE and U.S. Attorney (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) Modified on 8/21/2018 (sth).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/18/2018, Entered: 8/18/2018 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5646794) filed by EDIN SABOTIC, ALBIN SABOTIC, ALBINA I. DVORAK. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hacking, James) (Attachment 10 replaced on 8/20/2018) (zsth).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 7 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?