Powell v. Stericycle, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-05117

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 10, 2019 at 1:19 AM DT (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Civil Rights: Jobs
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Settlement Conference
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Order Setting Settlement Conference
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Statement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Case Management Scheduling Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 19 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 13 Administrative Motion to Make a Telephonic Appearance at Initial Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Notice
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None notice of removal
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?