Smith v. Lifevantage Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Utah District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00621

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 30, 2021 at 5:28 PM DT (2.4 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brian Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven A. Christensen +1 801 255 8727 stevenchristen@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marino Law PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Amy Lynn Marino +1 248 746 4054 +1 313 281 2206 amy@marinopllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reid Collins & Tsai LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY J. Benjamin King +1 214 420 8900 +1 214 420 8909
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Randall Adam Swick +1 512 457 2052 +1 512 457 2100 aswick@rctlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sommers, Schwartz, Silver & Schwartz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Kochanowski +1 248 355 0300 akochanowski@sommerspc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Lance C. Young +1 248 355 0300 lyoung@sommerspc.com
No Logo Michael Ilardo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven A. Christensen +1 801 255 8727 stevenchristen@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marino Law PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Amy Lynn Marino +1 248 746 4054 +1 313 281 2206 amy@marinopllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reid Collins & Tsai LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY J. Benjamin King +1 214 420 8900 +1 214 420 8909
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Randall Adam Swick +1 512 457 2052 +1 512 457 2100 aswick@rctlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sommers, Schwartz, Silver & Schwartz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Kochanowski +1 248 355 0300 akochanowski@sommerspc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Lance C. Young +1 248 355 0300 lyoung@sommerspc.com
v.
No Logo Darren Jensen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Parr Waddoups Brown Gee & Loveless, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert O Clark +1 801 257 7910 +1 801 532 7750 rclark@parrbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey J. Hunt +1 801 532 7840 jhunt@parrbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan S. Johansen +1 801 532 7840 bjohansen@parrbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY David C. Reymann +1 801 532 7840 dreymann@parrbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Rex A. Mann, PHV +1 214 453 6500 rmann@winston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY John C. C. Sanders, Jr. +1 214 453 6460 +1 214 453 6400 jsanders@winston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas M. Melsheimer +1 214 453 6500 +1 214 453 6400 tmelsheimer@winston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Bradley D. Ryynanen +1 214 453 6500 bryynanen@winston.com
No Logo Justin Rose, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Parr Waddoups Brown Gee & Loveless, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert O Clark +1 801 257 7910 +1 801 532 7750 rclark@parrbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey J. Hunt +1 801 532 7840 jhunt@parrbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan S. Johansen +1 801 532 7840 bjohansen@parrbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY David C. Reymann +1 801 532 7840 dreymann@parrbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Rex A. Mann, PHV +1 214 453 6500 rmann@winston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY John C. C. Sanders, Jr. +1 214 453 6460 +1 214 453 6400 jsanders@winston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas M. Melsheimer +1 214 453 6500 +1 214 453 6400 tmelsheimer@winston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Bradley D. Ryynanen +1 214 453 6500 bryynanen@winston.com
No Logo Lifevantage Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Parr Waddoups Brown Gee & Loveless, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert O Clark +1 801 257 7910 +1 801 532 7750 rclark@parrbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey J. Hunt +1 801 532 7840 jhunt@parrbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan S. Johansen +1 801 532 7840 bjohansen@parrbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY David C. Reymann +1 801 532 7840 dreymann@parrbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Rex A. Mann, PHV +1 214 453 6500 rmann@winston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY John C. C. Sanders, Jr. +1 214 453 6460 +1 214 453 6400 jsanders@winston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas M. Melsheimer +1 214 453 6500 +1 214 453 6400 tmelsheimer@winston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Bradley D. Ryynanen +1 214 453 6500 bryynanen@winston.com
No Logo Ryan Goodwin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Parr Waddoups Brown Gee & Loveless, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert O Clark +1 801 257 7910 +1 801 532 7750 rclark@parrbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey J. Hunt +1 801 532 7840 jhunt@parrbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan S. Johansen +1 801 532 7840 bjohansen@parrbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY David C. Reymann +1 801 532 7840 dreymann@parrbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Rex A. Mann, PHV +1 214 453 6500 rmann@winston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY John C. C. Sanders, Jr. +1 214 453 6460 +1 214 453 6400 jsanders@winston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas M. Melsheimer +1 214 453 6500 +1 214 453 6400 tmelsheimer@winston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Bradley D. Ryynanen +1 214 453 6500 bryynanen@winston.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (139) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Amend/Correct
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None Memorandum Decision
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Initial Scheduling Conference
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None Memorandum Decision
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Bifurcate
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Initial Scheduling Conference
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Memorandum Decision
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/17/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 Dismiss
                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendants Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation. (Sanders, John)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 Order to Propose ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/19/18 (alt)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 91 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amy L. Marino for Michael Ilardo, Brian Smith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 10/16/18 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amy L. Marino, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3119032, filed by Plaintiffs Michael Ilardo, Brian Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Application, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B Registration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit C Text of Proposed Order)(Christensen, Steven)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 10/12/18 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re 86 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amy L. Marino. The documents attached are styled for a different case and attorney. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to file correct documents for this case in the manner outlined on the Court's website. In order to bypass the pay.gov screens, filer should enter the receipt number they received for the 86 entry in at the prompt for a Receipt Number. The corrected documents will receive a new document number on the docket. (alt) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (las) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation. (las) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                                                  ERROR: WRONG DOCUMENTS ATTACHED - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amy L. Marino, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3119032, filed by Plaintiffs Michael Ilardo, Brian Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Christensen, Steven) Modified on 10/11/2018: added error text (alt)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Michael Ilardo, Brian Smith. (las) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 78 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Kochanowski for Michael Ilardo,Andrew Kochanowski for Brian Smith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/21/2018. (las)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 79 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Benjamin King for Michael Ilardo,J. Benjamin King for Brian Smith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/21/2018. (las)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 76 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lance C. Young for Michael Ilardo,Lance C. Young for Brian Smith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/21/2018. (las)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 77 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of R. Adam Swick for Michael Ilardo,R. Adam Swick for Brian Smith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/21/2018. (las)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Michael Ilardo, Brian Smith, Defendants Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation. Form due by 10/9/2018. (las) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018 Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Benjamin King, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3107981, filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Christensen, Steven)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018 Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Kochanowski, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3107974, filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Christensen, Steven)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018 Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of R. Adam Swick, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3107963, filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Christensen, Steven)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018 Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lance C. Young, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3107948, filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Christensen, Steven)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation with Jury Demand. New Plaintiffs: Michael Ilardo. filed by Brian Smith. (Christensen, Steven) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 70 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas M. Melsheimer for Ryan Goodwin,Thomas M. Melsheimer for Darren Jensen,Thomas M. Melsheimer for Lifevantage Corporation,Thomas M. Melsheimer for Justin Rose. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/22/2018. No attached document. (las) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 69 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rex A. Mann for Ryan Goodwin,Rex A. Mann for Darren Jensen,Rex A. Mann for Lifevantage Corporation,Rex A. Mann for Justin Rose. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/22/2018. No attached document. (las) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 68 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brad D. Ryynanen for Ryan Goodwin,Brad D. Ryynanen for Darren Jensen,Brad D. Ryynanen for Lifevantage Corporation,Brad D. Ryynanen for Justin Rose. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/22/2018. No attached document. (las) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 67 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John C.C. Sanders, Jr for Ryan Goodwin,John C.C. Sanders, Jr for Darren Jensen,John C.C. Sanders, Jr for Lifevantage Corporation,John C.C. Sanders, Jr for Justin Rose. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/22/2018. No attached document. (las) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas M. Melsheimer, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3085746, filed by Defendants Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit ECF Registration Form, # 3 Exhibit Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice (Thomas M. Melsheimer))(Johansen, Bryan)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rex A. Mann, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3085706, filed by Defendants Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit ECF Filing Registration Form, # 3 Exhibit Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice (Rex Mann))(Johansen, Bryan)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brad Ryynanen, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3085681, filed by Defendants Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit ECF Registration Form, # 3 Exhibit Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice (Brad Ryynanen))(Johansen, Bryan)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Sanders, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3085645, filed by Defendants Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit ECF Registration Form, # 3 Exhibit Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Johansen, Bryan)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan S. Johansen on behalf of Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose (Johansen, Bryan) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Reymann on behalf of Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose (Reymann, David) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Hunt on behalf of Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose (Hunt, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Clark on behalf of Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose (Clark, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney John Matthew Doroghazi, John C.C. Sanders, Lane M. Webster, Rex Mann, Thomas Melsheimer, for Defendants Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose (jwt) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney J. Benjamin King, Randall Adam Swick, for Plaintiff Brian Smith (jwt) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Andrew Kochanowski, for Plaintiff Brian Smith (jwt) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney James K. Robertson, Jr.; Brian T. Henebry, for Plaintiff Brian Smith (jwt) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Case transferred in from USDC of Connecticut; Case Number 3:18-cv-00135. Case assigned USDC of Utah number 2:18cv621-DBP. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER approving 56 Stipulation; denying as moot 38 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 40 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 39 Motion to Transfer to Another District. The Clerk is directed to transfer the case to the United States District Court for the District of Utah, Central Division, and close the case. The Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint within 45 days of the case being opened in the District of Utah, and the Defendants shall file any responsive pleading within 45 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/24/18. (Kaas, E.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Re: Motions to Dismiss, Strike & Transfer by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 07/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 54 Motion for Extension of Time until July 23, 2018 to file Stipulation re 38, 39, and 40 . Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/16/18. (Kaas, E.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 07/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 23, 2018 To File Stipulation 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction), 38 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint, Paragraph 112,, 39 MOTION to Transfer to Another District /Venue by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 07/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John Cordani terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/9/18. (Kaas, E.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 51 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 38 MOTION to Strike, 39 MOTION to Transfer to Another District, 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 06/28/2018. Responses due by July 16, 2018. (Jamieson, K) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction), 38 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint, Paragraph 112,, 39 MOTION to Transfer to Another District /Venue until July 16, 2018 by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 06/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 38 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint, Paragraph 112, 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction), 39 MOTION to Transfer to Another District /Venue. Responses due by 7/2/2018. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/15/2018. (Schneider, K) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 06/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for John L. Cordani, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney by Brian Smith. (Cordani, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction), 38 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint, Paragraph 112,, 39 MOTION to Transfer to Another District /Venue until July 2, 2018 by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 06/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 38 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint, 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, & 39 MOTION to Transfer to Another District. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 06/01/2018. Responses due by June 18, 2018. (Jamieson, K) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction), 38 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint, Paragraph 112,, 39 MOTION to Transfer to Another District /Venue until June 18, 2018 by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 05/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by J. Benjamin King on behalf of Brian Smith (King, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 05/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Adam Swick on behalf of Brian Smith (Swick, Randall) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 05/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 38 MOTION to Strike, 39 MOTION to Transfer, 40 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 04/24/2018.Responses due by June 4, 2018. (Jamieson, K)[Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction), 38 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint, Paragraph 112,, 39 MOTION to Transfer to Another District /Venue until June 4, 2018 by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 04/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 31 MOTION to Stay Rule 26(f) Meeting Deadline. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 04/17/2018. (Jamieson, K) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) by Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose.Responses due by 5/7/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Jensen Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Rose Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Goodwin Affidavit)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Transfer to Another District /Venue by Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Memo ISO Motion, # 3 Exhibit 1-A to Memo ISO Motion, # 4 Exhibit 1-B to Memo ISO Motion, # 5 Exhibit 1-C to Memo ISO Motion, # 6 Exhibit 1-D to Memo ISO Motion, # 7 Exhibit 1-E to Memo ISO Motion, # 8 Exhibit 1-F to Memo ISO Motion, # 9 Exhibit 2 to Memo ISO Motion)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint, Paragraph 112, by Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose.Responses due by 5/7/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) J. Benjamin King to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4740843) by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) R. Adam Swick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4740818) by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Lane M. Webster on behalf of Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose (Webster, Lane) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Rex Mann on behalf of Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose (Mann, Rex) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by John C.C. Sanders on behalf of Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose (Sanders, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Melsheimer on behalf of Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose (Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Stay Rule 26(f) Deadlines Pending a Decision on Defendants' Motion to Transfer by Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose.Responses due by 4/6/2018 (Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 26 Motion for Attorney Lane M. Webster to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2018. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 25 Motion for Attorney Rex A. Mann to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2018. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 24 Motion for Attorney Thomas M. Melsheimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2018. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 23 Motion for Attorney John C.C. Sanders, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2018. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney(s) Lane M. Webster to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4754279) by Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lane M. Webster, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Attorney(s) Rex A. Mann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4754268) by Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rex A. Mann, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas M. Melsheimer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4754258) by Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas M. Melsheimer, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Attorney(s) John C.C. Sanders, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4754234) by Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John C.C. Sanders, Jr., # 2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 20 Motion for Attorney J. Benjamin King to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/4/2018. Signed by Clerk on 3/5/2018. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 19 Motion for Attorney R. Adam Swick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/4/2018. Signed by Clerk on 3/5/2018. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney(s) J. Benjamin King to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4740843) by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney(s) R. Adam Swick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4740818) by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 17 MOTION for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 02/22/2018. (Jamieson, K) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until April 16, 2018 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to 1 Complaint, by Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose. (Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lifevantage Corporation. (Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John Matthew Doroghazi on behalf of Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose (Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RICO Case Statement by Brian Smith. (Kochanowski, Andrew) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 02/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Smith. Lifevantage Corporation served on 2/2/2018, answer due 2/23/2018. (Kochanowski, Andrew) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 02/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew Kochanowski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4701462) by Brian Smith. (Kochanowski, Andrew) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Kochanowski on behalf of Brian Smith (Kochanowski, Andrew) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 02/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 9 Motion for Attorney Andrew Kochanowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/2/2018. Signed by Clerk on 2/1/2018. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 02/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew Kochanowski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4701462) by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by John Louis Cordani, Jr on behalf of Brian Smith (Cordani, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Henebry on behalf of Brian Smith (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James K. Robertson, Jr.* *Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, LLP - NH* *195 Church St. 18th floor, PO Box 1950* *New Haven, CT 06509-1950*. (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-representing parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 4 Standing Protective Order, 3 Electronic Filing Order, 1 Complaint, filed by Brian Smith Signed by Clerk on 1/24/2018.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/24/2018.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/24/2018.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 4/24/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 3/25/2018. Discovery due by 7/26/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 8/25/2018. Signed by Clerk on 1/24/2018.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4691690.), filed by Brian Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Robertson, James) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.] (Entered: 01/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Jaiman, R.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer deadline updated for All Defendants to April 16, 2018. (Jamieson, K) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Brian Smith. (Robertson, James) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Robertson, James) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?