USA v. Cohen
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cr-00602-WHP

Tags
Last Updated July 18, 2019 at 11:04 AM DT (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea Michelle Griswold +1 212 637 1205 +1 212 637 2443 andrea.griswold@usdoj.gov
Space Nicolas Tyler Landsman-Roos +1 212 637 2421 nicolas.roos@usdoj.gov
Space Rachel Maimin +1 212 637 2460 +1 212 637 2527 rachel.maimin@usdoj.gov
Space Thomas McKay +1 212 637 2268 thomas.mckay@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Cohen, Michael Dean, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Cohen"

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Michael Cohen (1)
Office Foley Square
Filed 8/21/2018
County NewYork
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-5
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7201.F
Offense Level 4
267201.F EVASION OF ASSESSMENT OF INCOME TAX LIABILITY
Count 6
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014.F FALSE STATEMENTS TO A BANK
Count 7
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
5230118.F CAUSING AN UNLAWFUL CORPORATE CONTRIBUTION
Count 8
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
5230116.F EXCESSIVE CAMPAIGN CONTRIBUTION
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flag ECF
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: 7/18/2019 LetterCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Michael Cohen addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Thomas McKay dated July 18, 2019 re: Search Warrants Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9)(McKay, Thomas)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 47 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: 7/17/2019 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM & ORDER as to Michael Cohen. Accordingly, the Government is directed to file the July 15, 2019 status report and the Materials on the public docket on July 18, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. The July 15, 2019 status report shall be unredacted in its entirety, except that limited references in the footnote to an uncharged third-party may remain redacted. See United States v. Smith, 985 F. Supp. 2d 506, 526 (S.D.N.Y. 2013). The Materials shall be unredacted in their entirety, except that the names of law enforcement investigators, references to individuals who purportedly engaged in business transactions or contemplated business transactions with Cohen relating to taxi medallions, see Cohen, 366 F. Supp. 3d at 625, and personal information referenced in this Courts March 18, 2019 Order may remain redacted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 7/17/19) (jbo)
    LREF
    Sealed Legal Document 46 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: 5/21/2019 Sealed document
    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe)
      LREF
      Legal Document 45 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: 5/21/2019 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER as to Michael Cohen: This Court has reviewed the Government's status report submitted ex parte and under seal on May 15, 2019 pursuant to this Court's February 7, 2019 Opinion & Order. In view of the ongoing aspects of the Government's investigation articulated in the Government's status report, this Court determines that continued redaction of the Materials is justified at this juncture. The Government is directed to submit a further status report, ex parte and under seal, by July 15, 2019 identifying the individuals or entities subject to any ongoing investigations and explaining any need for continued redaction. If any intervening event obviates the need for continued redactions, the Government shall advise this Court forthwith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/21/2019) (lnl)
        LREF
        Legal Document 44 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: 5/21/2019 LetterCourt Filing
        LETTER by USA as to Michael Cohen addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Thomas McKay dated May 21, 2019 re: Sealing Document filed by USA. (McKay, Thomas)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: 3/19/2019 LetterCourt Filing
          LETTER by USA as to Michael Cohen addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Thomas McKay dated March 19, 2019 re: Redacted Search Warrants Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8)(McKay, Thomas)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 42 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: 3/18/2019 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER as to Michael Cohen: This Court has reviewed the Government's proposed redactions of the search materials submitted ex parte pursuant to this Court's February 7, 2019 Opinion & Order. This Court approves the proposed redactions, including those of the email addresses of Michael Cohen and others, as well as Cohen's phone numbers, apartment number, and safety deposit box number. The Government is directed to file redacted copies of the search warrant materials on the public docket on March 19, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/18/2019) (lnl)
            LREF
            Legal Document 41 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: 2/28/2019 LetterCourt Filing
            LETTER by USA as to Michael Cohen addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Thomas McKay dated February 28, 2019 re: Proposed Redactions Document filed by USA. (McKay, Thomas)
              LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 40 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: 2/26/2019 Sealed document
              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe)
                LREF
                Legal Document 39 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: 2/20/2019 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                ENDORSED LETTER as to Michael Cohen addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Michael D. Monico, dated 2/20/2019, re: Counsel for the Defendant writes to request an extension of defendant's reporting date for sixty (60) days, from March 6, 2019, to May 6, 2019. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The defendant's voluntary surrender to a facility designated by the Bureau of Prisons is adjourned from March 6, 2019 to May 6, 2019. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/20/2019) (lnl)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: 2/20/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                  ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [34] Motion for Michael D. Monico to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Cohen (1). (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/20/2019) (lnl)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: 2/20/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                    ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [35] Motion for Barry A. Spevack to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Cohen (1). (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/20/2019) (lnl)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 36 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: 2/19/2019 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                      ENDORSED LETTER as to Michael Cohen addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Guy Petrillo dated 2/19/19 re: Requests to be relieved as counsel to Michael Cohen, who by email on January 28, 2019, terminated our engagement....ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/19/19)(jw)
                        LREF
                        Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                        Attorney update in case as to Michael Cohen. Attorney Guy Petrillo terminated (jw)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: 2/15/2019, Terminated: 2/20/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                          MOTION for Barry A. Spevack to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16359819. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Spevack, Barry)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: 2/15/2019, Terminated: 2/20/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                            MOTION for Michael D. Monico to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-16359646. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Monico, Michael)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                              >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [35] MOTION for Barry A. Spevack to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16359819. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
                                LREF
                                Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [34] MOTION for Michael D. Monico to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-16359646. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 33 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: 2/7/2019 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                  OPINION & ORDER as to Michael Cohen: For the foregoing reasons, the Media Organizations applications are granted in part and denied in part. The Government is directed to submit a sealed, ex parte copy of the Materials by February 28, 2019 with proposed redactions in highlights consistent with this Opinion & Order. After reviewing the proposed redactions, this Court will direct the Government to file the redacted Materials on the public docket in this action. The Government is further directed to submit a status report, ex parte and under seal, by May 15, 2019 identifying the individuals or entities subject to any ongoing investigations and explaining any need for continued redaction of the Materials. Cf. United States v. E. Side Ophthalmology, 1996 WL 384891, at *2 (S.D.N.Y. July 9, 1996) ("The caselaw in this circuit indicates that search warrants and supporting documentation may not be sealed indefinitely."). If any intervening event obviates the need for continued redactions, the Government shall advise this Court forthwith. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions pending at ECF Nos. 11 and 19. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/7/2019) (lnl)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Michael Cohen. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 12/12/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Michael Cohen re: Sentence held on 12/12/18 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2019. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                        LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: 12/19/2018 Sealed document
                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 judgmentCourt Filing
                                          JUDGMENT IN A CRIMINAL CASE as to Michael Cohen (1). The defendant pleaded guilty to counts 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7 & 8. IMPRISONMENT: 36 months incarceration to be served concurrently to the sentence imposed on docket 18-Cr-850 (WHP). The court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: The Court recommends the defendant be designated to Otisville. The defendant shall surrender for service of sentence at the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons before 2 p.m. on 3/6/2019. SUPERVISED RELEASE: 3 years on each count to be served concurrently to each other and to the term of supervision imposed on docket 18-Cr-850 (WHP). SPECIAL CONDITIONS OF SUPERVISION: The defendant shall provide the probation officer with access to any requested financial information. ASSESSMENT: $800.00 due immediately. FINE: $50,000.00. RESTITUTION: $1,393,858.00. The restitution and fine must be paid in monthly installments equal to 10% of the gross monthly income over a period of supervision to commence 30 days after the release from custody. The defendant shall forfeit the defendant's interest in the following property to the United States: As per Forfeiture Order. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/12/2018) (lnl)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                            PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE/MONEY JUDGMENT as to Michael Cohen. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/12/2018) (See ORDER as set forth) (Three (3) certified copies of this ORDER have been forwarded to AUSA Alexander J. Wilson via interoffice mail) (lnl)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  sentencing
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Pauley, III: Sentencing held on 12/12/2018 for Michael Cohen (1) Count 1-5,6,7,8. Defendant present with attorneys Guy Petrillo, Esq. and Amy Lester, Esq. AUSAs Andrea Griswold, Rachel Maimin, Thomas McKay, and Nicolas Roos present. Special Counsels Office Andrew Goldstein, Jeannie Rhee and Rush Atkinson present. Court Reporter present. Defendant sentenced to 36 months and 3 years post-release supervision with standard and special conditions, restitution and a fine on docket 18-cr-602. Defendant sentenced to 2 months incarceration and 3 years post-release supervision to be served concurrently and a fine with docket 18-cr-602. (lnl)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Sentencing Submission
                                                SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Michael Cohen. (McKay, Thomas)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                  LETTER by Michael Cohen addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Guy Petrillo, Esq. dated December 7, 2018 re: Sentencing Memorandum (Lester, Amy)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: 12/6/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER as to Michael Cohen. The United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York and the Special Counsel's Office at the U.S. Department of Justice are directed to hand deliver copies of their sentencing submissions to Chambers no later than 5:00 p.m. on Friday, December 7, 2018. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/56/2018) [*** NOTE: Also docketed in 18-Cr-850(WHP). ***] (bw)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: 12/5/2018 Sentencing Submission
                                                      SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Michael Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit 37)(Lester, Amy)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Sentencing Submission
                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE [24] Sentencing Submission) - SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Michael Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit 37)(Lester, Amy) Modified on 12/6/2018 (db).
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018, Terminated: 12/12/2018 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Guy Petrillo, Esq. dated November 29, 2018 re: Request to Transfer for Sentencing Purposes . Document filed by Michael Cohen. (Lester, Amy)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018, Terminated: 11/29/2018 Motion to transfer case
                                                          FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Transfer Case for Purposes of Sentencing. Document filed by Michael Cohen. (Lester, Amy) Modified on 11/29/2018 (ka).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                            NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Michael Cohen: Notice to Attorney Lester, Amy to RE-FILE Document [20] MOTION to Transfer Case for Purposes of Sentencing. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018, Terminated: 12/12/2018 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Rachel Strom and Jeremy Chase dated November 21, 2018 re: [12] Memo Endorsement,, [17] Letter, [9] Letter, [15] Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, re: The applications requesting that the Court unseal certain search warrant materials related to Michael Cohen. . Document filed by CBS Broadcasting Inc. as to Michael Cohen. (Strom, Rachel)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                LETTER by NYP Holdings, Inc., Newsday LLC, Dow Jones & Co., Inc., Daily News, L.P., Cable News Network, Inc., The Associated Press, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. as to Michael Cohen addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Rachel Strom dated 11/2/2018 re: Request to Unseal Materials Document filed by NYP Holdings, Inc., Newsday LLC, Dow Jones & Co., Inc., Daily News, L.P., Cable News Network, Inc., The Associated Press, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.. (Strom, Rachel)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of MotionCourt Filing
                                                                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by NYP Holdings, Inc., Newsday LLC, Dow Jones & Co., Inc., Daily News, L.P., Cable News Network, Inc., The Associated Press, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. as to Michael Cohen re: [11] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Rachel Strom and Jeremy Chase dated October 15, 2018 re: [9] Letter re: Request to Unseal Materials . . (Strom, Rachel) Modified on 11/2/2018 (ka).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of MotionCourt Filing
                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by The New York Times Company as to Michael Cohen re: [11] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Rachel Strom and Jeremy Chase dated October 15, 2018 re: [9] Letter re: Request to Unseal Materials . . (McCraw, David)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                      NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Michael Cohen: Notice to Attorney Strom, Rachel to RE-FILE Document [16] Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Michael Cohen re [11] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Rachel Strom and Jeremy Chase dated October 15, 2018 re: [9] Letter re: Request to Unseal Materials .. (McKay, Thomas)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Michael Cohen. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The Times shall file any reply to the Government's response (see ECF No 10) by November 2, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Replies due by 11/2/2018.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/17/2018)(ft)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Michael Cohen on re: [11] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Rachel Strom and Jeremy Chase dated October 15, 2018 re: [9] Letter re: Request to Unseal Materials filed by Newsday LLC, NYP Holdings, Inc., Dow Jones & Co., Inc., The Associated Press, Daily News, L.P., American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Cable News Network, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The News Organizations shall file any reply to theGovernment's response (see ECF No. 10) by November 2, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/17/2018)(ft)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Michael Cohen: Replies due by 11/2/2018. (ft)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018, Terminated: 12/12/2018 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Rachel Strom and Jeremy Chase dated October 15, 2018 re: [9] Letter re: Request to Unseal Materials . Document filed by NYP Holdings, Inc., Newsday LLC, Dow Jones & Co., Inc., Daily News, L.P., Cable News Network, Inc., The Associated Press, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. as to Michael Cohen. (Strom, Rachel)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER as to Michael Cohen addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III, from Andrea Griswold, Rachel Maimin, Thomas McKay and Nicolas Roos dated 10/12/2018 re: The Government writes to request time to file opposition and to submit response ex parte and under seal. ENDORSEMENT: The Government's application is granted in part and denied in part. The Government is to file its response by October 26, 2018. The Government's request to file a portion of its response ex parte and under seal is granted. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/12/2018)(ap)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                    LETTER by Michael Cohen addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III, from David E. McCraw dated 10/11/2018 re: The New York Times Company writes to seek an order unsealing materials. (ap)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Michael Cohen. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Plea proceeding held on 8/21/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Michael Cohen re: Plea held on 8/21/18 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/13/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amy Ruth Lester appearing for Michael Cohen. Appearance Type: Retained. (Lester, Amy)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Guy Petrillo appearing for Michael Cohen. Appearance Type: Retained. (Petrillo, Guy)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 bond
                                                                                              APPEARANCE BOND Entered as to Michael Cohen: $500,000 Personal Recognizance Bond; Co-signed by wife and 1 additional financially responsible person; Travel restricted to Southern District of New York, Eastern District of New York. Southern District of Florida, Northern District of Illinois, and Washington D.C.; Passport to be surrendered to counsel - (No new applications); Surrender to law enforcement within 24 hours all firearms and ammunition. Standard pretrial supervision. Defendant to be released today upon his own signature, with one week to provide the remaining signatures. (Advice of Penalties and Sanctions attached.) (jbo)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 Waiver of Indictment
                                                                                                WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Michael Cohen. (jm)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 information - felony
                                                                                                  INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Michael Cohen (1) count(s) 1-5, 6, 7, 8. (jm)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Oral Order
                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER as to Michael Cohen. Sentencing set for 12/12/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III. (bw)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Pauley, III: Plea entered by Michael Cohen (1) Guilty as to Count 1-5,6,7,8. (bw)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  Change of Not Guilty Plea
                                                                                                        Change of Not Guilty Plea to Guilty Plea as to Michael Cohen (1) Count 1-5,6,7,8. (bw)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  arraignment
                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Pauley, III: Arraignment as to Michael Cohen (1) Count 1-5,6,7,8 held on 8/21/2018. Plea entered by Michael Cohen (1) Count 1-5,6,7,8 -- Not Guilty. (bw)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  initial appearance
                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Pauley, III: Initial Appearance as to Michael Cohen held on 8/21/2018. Defendant present with attorneys Guy Petrillo, Esq. and Amy Lester, Esq. AUSAs Andrea Griswold, Rachel Maimin, Thomas McKay, and Nicolas Roos present. Court Reporter present. Defendant arraigned on information and pled not guilty. Defendant waived prosecution by indictment and consented to prosecution by information. Defendant then withdrew previously entered plea of not guilty and pled guilty to counts 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, and 8 of the information. Bail conditions set at $500,000 personal recognizance bond by Defendant, his wife, and another financially responsible person; Defendant released upon his own signature with other signatures by August 28, 2018; travel restricted to Southern and Eastern Districts of New York, Northern District of Illinois, Southern District of Florida, and Washington D.C.; surrender firearms and ammunition within 24 hours; surrender passport to counsel and no new applications for travel documents. Sentencing scheduled for December 12, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. (bw)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                              Case Designated ECF as to Michael Cohen. (jm)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 Notice of Intent to File Information
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE an Information by U.S.A. as to Michael Cohen. (jm)
                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 1,540 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?