HOLDER v. BANK OF AMERICA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-13095

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 3, 2018 at 8:07 AM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CHARLA HOLDER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOSHUA THOMAS +1 215 806 1733 joshualthomas@gmail.com
No Logo DAVID HOLDER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOSHUA THOMAS +1 215 806 1733 joshualthomas@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Bank of America NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "BANK OF AMERICA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION"
No Logo Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ditech Financial LLC, Defendant
No Logo The Bank of New York Mellon, Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER, the Complaint is dismissed without prejudice; Plaintiff is granted leave to reinstitute these claims in the appropriate state court within 30 days of the entry of this Order; this action is closed. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 09/17/2018. (sms) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 09/17/2018. (sms) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
      RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by CHARLA HOLDER, DAVID HOLDER. (THOMAS, JOSHUA)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
        ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, why plaintiffs complaint should not be dismissed without prejudice to seek relief in the New Jersey State Courts, plaintiffs must file an electronic response with the Court by September 14, 2018; If the plaintiffs fail to file an electronic response with the Court by September 14, 2018, the plaintiffs will be deemed to be in support of the dismissal of the complaint; this Order to Show Cause will be decided without oral argument pursuant to Local Civil Rule 78.1(b); etc. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 08/28/2018. (sms, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018 Summons issued
          SUMMONS ISSUED as to BANK OF AMERICA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC., DITECH FINANCIAL, LLC, THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018 Complaint
            COMPLAINT against BANK OF AMERICA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP F/K/A COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC. D/B/A AMERICAS WHOLESALE LENDER, DITECH FINANCIAL, LLC F/K/A GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC, THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY AND AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATE HOLDERS OF CWMBS, INC., CHL MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH TRUST 2005-30, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 20 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8973391) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CHARLA HOLDER, DAVID HOLDER.(THOMAS, JOSHUA)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 5 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?