Reko Holdings, LLC v. AMP Group Holdings, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-07401

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 1, 2019 at 2:30 PM DT (1.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (87) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None Statement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None ERRATA
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Notice of Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Dismiss (cause or other)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Dismiss Case
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None Status Conference - optional html form
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/4/2019, Entered: None Motion Related Document
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/4/2019, Entered: None Continue
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/4/2019, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/4/2019, Entered: None Set Aside Default
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Status Conference - optional html form
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Clerk to Enter Default
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Clerk to Enter Default
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Clerk to Enter Default
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Clerk to Enter Default
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Clerk to Enter Default
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Clerk to Enter Default
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Status Conference - optional html form
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Clerk to Enter Default
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Clerk to Enter Default
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Dismiss Case
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Dismiss (cause or other)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Dismiss Case
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Allan Berkley on behalf of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attorney David Allan Berkley added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Berkley, David) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 response
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Reko Holdings, LLC Plaintiffs Response To Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Yaspan, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (jtil) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Certification & Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,. (Beebe, Tod) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                                                                                                                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,. (Beebe, Tod)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior, case number BC647661 Receipt No: 0973-22306149 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 01 - Pltf's Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 02 - Pltf's Civil Cover & ADR Pkg., # 3 Exhibit Ex. 03 - Pltf's Summons onComplaint, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 04 - Pltf's Peremptory Challenge, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 05 - LASC's Minute Order re Challenge, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 06 - WFB's Answer to Complaint, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 07 - LASC's OSC re POS, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 08 - LASC's Notice of CMC, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 09 - Pltf's POS of S&C on HJK Trading, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 10 - Pltf's POS of S&C on WFB, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 11 - Pltf's POS of S&C on Empire, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 12 - Pltf's POS of S&C on Alpine, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 13 - Pltf's POS of S&C on Hanin, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 14 - Pltf's POS of S&C on ACAP, # 15 Exhibit Ex. 15 - Pltf's POS of S&C on AMP, # 16 Exhibit Ex. 16 - Pltf's POS of S&C on JPMC, # 17 Exhibit Ex. 17 - Pltf's POS of OSC and CMC Notice, # 18 Exhibit Ex. 18 - JPMC's Demurrer to Complaint, # 19 Exhibit Ex. 19 - Pltf's POS on Citibank, # 20 Exhibit Ex. 20 - Pltf's Opp'n to JPMC's Demurrer, # 21 Exhibit Ex. 21 - JPMC's Reply re Demurrer, # 22 Exhibit Ex. 22 - LASC's Tentative Order re Demurrer, # 23 Exhibit Ex. 23 - Pltf's Notice of Ruling re JPMC's Demurrer, # 24 Exhibit Ex. 24 - LASC's Notice of CMC, # 25 Exhibit Ex. 25 - Pltf's First Amended Complaint, # 26 Exhibit Ex. 26 - Pltf's POS of FAC, # 27 Exhibit Ex. 27 - Pltf's POS of CMC Notice, # 28 Exhibit Ex. 28 - HJK Defts' Pro Hac Vice App., # 29 Exhibit Ex. 29 - Citibank's CMC Stmt, # 30 Exhibit Ex. 30 - Pltf's CMC Stmt, # 31 Exhibit Ex. 31 - HJK Defts' CMC Stmt, # 32 Exhibit Ex. 32 - WFB's CMC Stmt, # 33 Exhibit Ex. 33 - JPMC's CMC Stmt, # 34 Exhibit Ex. 34 - Alpine's CMC Stmt, # 35 Exhibit Ex. 35 - Citibank's Answer to FAC, # 36 Exhibit Ex. 36 - JPMC's Answer to FAC, # 37 Exhibit Ex. 37 - WFB's Answer to FAC, # 38 Exhibit Ex. 38 - LASC's Minute Order re CMC Continuance, # 39 Exhibit Ex. 39 - Alpine's Demurrer to FAC, # 40 Exhibit Ex. 40 - Empire's Answer to FAC, # 41 Exhibit Ex. 41 - LASC's Minute Order Granting Pro Hac Vice, # 42 Exhibit Ex. 42 - ACAP's & Alpine's Notice of Ruling re Demurrer to FAC, # 43 Exhibit Ex. 43 - Hanin's Answer to FAC, # 44 Exhibit Ex. 44 - HJK's Answer to FAC, # 45 Exhibit Ex. 45 - Kostandyan's Answer to FAC, # 46 Exhibit Ex. 46 - Pltf's MP&As in Opp'n to Demurrer to FAC, # 47 Exhibit Ex. 47 - Alpine's Reply to Opp'n to Demurrer to FAC, # 48 Exhibit Ex. 48 - LASC's Minute Order re Dismissal of Unserved Defendants, # 49 Exhibit Ex. 49 - LASC's Ruling on Demurrer to FAC, # 50 Exhibit Ex. 50 - LASC's Order Appointing Court Reporter, # 51 Exhibit Ex. 51 - Pltf's Notice of Ruling re Demurrer to FAC, # 52 Exhibit Ex. 52 - Pltf's Req for Dismissal of Alpine - only, # 53 Exhibit Ex. 53 - HJK Defts' Sub of Atty, # 54 Exhibit Ex. 54 - Empire's CMC Stmt, # 55 Exhibit Ex. 55 - Kostandyan's Sub of Atty, # 56 Exhibit Ex. 56 - HJK's Sub of Atty, # 57 Exhibit Ex. 57 - Hanin's Sub of Atty, # 58 Exhibit Ex. 58 - Pltf's Req for Dismissal of GSS Group - only, # 59 Exhibit Ex. 59 - HJK Defts' Motion for Relief, # 60 Exhibit Ex. 60 - HJK Defts' Decl. ISO Motion for Relief, # 61 Exhibit Ex. 61 - HJK Defts' Proposed Order re Motion for Relief, # 62 Exhibit Ex. 62 - Pltf's POS of S&C of FAC on Kozlov, # 63 Exhibit Ex. 63 - Pltf's Req for Entry of Default re Kozlov, # 64 Exhibit Ex. 64 - Pltf's Req for Entry of Default of AMP, # 65 Exhibit Ex. 65 - Pltf's Civil Deposit Form, # 66 Exhibit Ex. 66 - Pltf's Notice of Posting Jury Fees, # 67 Exhibit Ex. 67 - LASC's Minute Order re CMC, # 68 Exhibit Ex. 68 - LASC's Notice of Ruling re CMC, # 69 Exhibit Ex. 69 - Shirinyan's Answer to FAC, # 70 Exhibit Ex. 70 - Pltf's Sub of Atty, # 71 Exhibit Ex. 71 - Kozlov's Sub of Atty, # 72 Exhibit Ex. 72 - HJK's Sub of Atty, # 73 Exhibit Ex. 73 - Hanin's Sub of Atty, # 74 Exhibit Ex. 74 - Kostandyan's Sub of Atty, # 75 Exhibit Ex. 75 - Shirinyan's Sub of Atty, # 76 Exhibit Ex. 76 - Pltf's Req for Dismissal of Empire - only, # 77 Exhibit Ex. 77 - Stip & Entered Order DenyingTrial Continuance, # 78 Exhibit Ex. 78 - HJK's Joint Ex Parte App re Trial Continuance, # 79 Exhibit Ex. 79 - Pltf's Menachian Decl ISO Ex Parte App re Trial Continuance, # 80 Exhibit Ex. 80 - Pltf's Yaspan Decl ISO Ex Parte App re Trial Continuance, # 81 Exhibit Ex. 81 - HJK's Hakala Decl ISO Ex Parte App re Trial Continuance, # 82 Exhibit Ex. 82 - LASC's Minute Order Denying Ex Parte App to Continue Trial, # 83 Exhibit Ex. 83 - WFB's Notice & Motion of MSJ, # 84 Exhibit Ex. 84 - WFB's MP&As ISO MSJ, # 85 Exhibit Ex. 85 - WFB's Separate Statement ISO MSJ, # 86 Exhibit Ex. 86 - WFB's Sartori Decl ISO MSJ, # 87 Exhibit Ex. 87 - WFB's Wraight Decl & Exhs ISO MSJ - Part 1 of 2, # 88 Exhibit Ex. 87 - WFB's Wraight Decl ISO MSJ, Part 2 of 2, # 89 Exhibit Ex. 88 - WFB's POS of MSJ, # 90 Exhibit Ex. 89 - WFB's POS of MSJ on Pltf, # 91 Exhibit Ex. 90 - Pltf's Ex Parte App to File Second Amended Complaint, Part 1 of 2, # 92 Exhibit Ex. 90 - Pltf's Ex Parte App to File Second Amended Complaint, Part 2 of 2, # 93 Exhibit Ex. 91 - LASC's Minute Order Granting Ex Parte re Filing SAC, # 94 Exhibit Ex. 92 - LASC's Ruling on Ex Parte, # 95 Exhibit Ex. 93 - LASC's Order re All Parties Stipulation re Filing SAC, # 96 Exhibit Ex. 94 - Pltf's Second Amended Complaint, # 97 Exhibit Ex. 95 - Pltf's Civil Case Cover Sheet re SAC, # 98 Exhibit Ex. 96 - Pltf's Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum re SAC, # 99 Exhibit Ex. 97 - Pltf's Notice of Errata re Caption to Second Amended Complaint, # 100 Exhibit Ex. 98 - Pltf's Corrected Second Amended Complaint, # 101 Exhibit Ex. 99 - Pltf's Summons on Corrected Second Amended Complaint, # 102 Exhibit Ex. 100 - Pltf's POS of Corrected SAC) (Attorney Tod V Beebe added to party JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,(pty:dft))(Beebe, Tod) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?