Paige v. New York City Housing Authority
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-07481

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 15, 2019 at 1:55 PM ST (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo A.P., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Vinson F. Carter +1 810 496 1025 +1 810 963 0458 vinsonecf.rcclawgroup@gmail.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Steven Robert Yourke +1 510 839 5200 syourke3@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by A. Daniel Woska & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Rachel Lawrence Mor +1 405 562 7771 +1 405 282 9350 rmor@woskalawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Karyn L Rotker +1 414 272 4032 +1 414 272 0182 krotker@aclu-wi.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Juvenile Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jessica R. Feierman +1 215 625 0551 jfeierman@jlc.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Marsha L. Levick +1 215 625 0551 mlevick@jlc.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Karen U. Lindell +1 215 625 0551 klindell@jlc.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John L. Burris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , John L. Burris +1 510 839 5200 +1 510 839 3882 john.burris@johnburrislaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Levy Konigsberg Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Corey M. Stern +1 212 605 6298 +1 212 605 6290 cstern@levylaw.com
, , , , , , Corey M. Stern +1 212 605 6298 +1 212 605 6290 cstern@levylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Berkman Law Office, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , PHV Robert Tolchin +1 718 855 3627 +1 718 855 4696 rtolchin@berkmanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Firm Of Tamara Roff, Pc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Tamara J. Roff +1 646 722 3829 tammi@rofflaw.com
No Logo Brian Clarke, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bisceglie & Associates, Pc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Angelo R. Bisceglie, Jr. +1 516 414 2900 +1 888 688 4206 angelo@bisceglieassociates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Herzfeld & Rubin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , PETER J. KURSHAN +1 973 535 8840 pkurshan@chaselawnj.com
, , , , , Wendy L. Prince +1 212 471 8458 wprince@herzfeld-rubin.com
, , , , , Miriam Skolnik +1 212 471 8500 mskolnik@herzfeld-rubin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jodi Westbrook Flowers +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jflowers@motleyrice.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTIC Robert Turner Haefele +1 843 216 9184 +1 843 216 9450 rhaefele@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , William James Taylor, Jr. +1 212 416 8426 +1 212 416 6009 william.taylor@ag.ny.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Simmons Browder Gianaris Angelides & Barnerd LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jayne Conroy +1 212 784 6400 +1 212 213 5949 jconroy@simmonsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spivak Lipton Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/14/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/14/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/14/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/14/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/14/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED Lauren B. McGlothlin +1 410 206 2432 +1 212 765 8954 lmcglothlin@outtengolden.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORN Hope Allison Pordy +1 212 765 2100 +1 212 541 5429 hpordy@spivaklipton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 6

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , G. Gordon Atcheson +1 913 362 8650 +1 913 362 8652 gga@atchesonlaw.com
No Logo Jahlisa Greene, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levy Konigsberg Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Brendan E. Little +1 212 605 6282 blittle@levylaw.com
, , , , , , Corey M. Stern +1 212 605 6298 +1 212 605 6290 cstern@levylaw.com
No Logo Luis Ponce, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Harold Dunne +1 734 542 3444 +1 734 542 3704 hdunne@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Herzfeld & Rubin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , PETER J. KURSHAN +1 973 535 8840 pkurshan@chaselawnj.com
, , , , , Wendy L. Prince +1 212 471 8458 wprince@herzfeld-rubin.com
, , , , , Miriam Skolnik +1 212 471 8500 mskolnik@herzfeld-rubin.com
No Logo Michael Kelly, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/02/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/02/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Bernell Zisser +1 510 665 8644 +1 510 665 8511 aaronzisser@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Gail Lynne Reich +1 847 291 0200 +1 847 291 9230 greich@okgc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , John Albert Basinger +1 212 626 4463 +1 212 310 1624 john.basinger@bakermckenzie.com
, , , , , , , , , Charles Bart Cummings +1 212 891 3780 +1 212 310 1634 charles.b.cummings@bakernet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bowditch & Dewey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Louis M. Ciavarra +1 508 926 3408 +1 508 929 3011 lciavarra@bowditch.com
, , , , , AiVi Nguyen +1 508 926 3402 +1 508 929 3023 anguyen@bowditch.com

Toggle Switch Represented by BURNS & LEVINSON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Shepard Davidson +1 617 345 3000 +1 617 345 3299 sdavidson@burnslev.com
, , , , , , , Andrea L. Martin +1 617 345 3000 +1 617 345 3299 amartin@burnslev.com

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Ashley Caroline Kosztya +1 312 744 6922 +1 312 744 3989 ashley.kosztya@cityofchicago.org
, , , , , , , Alec Meacham McAusland +1 312 744 4038 amcausland@cityofchicago.org

Toggle Switch Represented by CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Leonard Anthony Bennett +1 757 930 3660 +1 757 930 3662 lenbennett@clalegal.com
, , , Susan Mary Rotkis +1 757 930 3660 +1 757 930 3662 srotkis@clalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DeVerna Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Paul Deverna +1 212 321 0025 jpd@mynylawyer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 312-814-5376

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Marni M. Malowitz +1 312 814 3700 mmalowitz@atg.state.il.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Disability Rights Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY Mary-Lee Eileen Kimber +5106 658 644 x114 mkimber@dralegal.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 07/25/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 07/25/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 07/25/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 07/25/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 07/25/2017, ATTORNEY T Julia Zoog Marks +1 510 665 8644 jmarks@dralegal.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Megan Flynn +1 515 697 3636 +1 515 864 0209 flynn.megan@dorsey.com
, , , Bryan Martin McGarry +1 714 800 1400 +1 714 800 1499 mcgarry.bryan@dorsey.com
, , , , , , , Kent Jeffrey Schmidt +1 714 800 1400 +1 714 800 1499 santos.maria@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DRZ Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Daniel R. Zmijewski +1 816 665 2073 +1 816 523 5667 dan@drzlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freeborn & Peters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Terrence J. Sheahan +1 312 360 6000 tsheahan@freebornpeters.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaines, Novick, Ponzini, Cossu & Venditti, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jaazaniah Asahguii +1 914 831 6255 +1 914 288 0850 jasahguii@gainesllp.com
, , , , , , , , John Martin Murtagh, Jr. +1 914 288 9595 +1 914 288 0850 jmurtagh@gainesllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Generally Admitted

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin K. Morrissey +1 618 656 0257 mmorrissey@reedarmstrong.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Herzfeld & Rubin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , PETER J. KURSHAN +1 973 535 8840 pkurshan@chaselawnj.com
, , , , , Wendy L. Prince +1 212 471 8458 wprince@herzfeld-rubin.com
, , , , , Miriam Skolnik +1 212 471 8500 mskolnik@herzfeld-rubin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Humphrey, Farrington, & McClain

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael S Kilgore +1 816 836 5050 +8368 836 836 8966 msk@hfmlegal.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kenneth Blair McClain +1 816 836 5050 +8368 836 836 8966 kbm@hfmlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Garneau LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Terence J. Gallagher, III. +1 203 965 7700 +1 203 977 7301 tgallagher@jonesgarneau.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly & Crandall, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Andrew Joseph Guzzo +1 703 424 7576 +1 703 591 0167 aguzzo@kellyandcrandall.com
, , , Kristi Cahoon Kelly +1 703 424 7572 +1 703 591 1067 kkelly@kellyandcrandall.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kent Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Trinette G Kent +1 480 247 9644 +1 480 717 4781 tkent@kentlawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Madison County

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William B. Starnes, II +1 618 656 0257 +1 618 692 4416 wstarnes@reedarmstrong.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael, Kelly

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Kelly

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Schirger, LLC - KCMO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph M. Feierabend +1 816 561 6501 jfeierabend@millerschirger.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Peter Chadwell Koch +1 312 814 7203 pkoch@atg.state.il.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Illinois Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James Allen Lang +1 312 814 5694 jlang@atg.state.il.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Nassau County Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Andrew Reginald Scott +1 516 571 3056 +1 516 571 3058 ascott@nassaucountyny.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Joseph Emanuel Clark +1 310 284 4536 +1 310 557 2193 jclark@proskauer.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Russell Laurence Hirschhorn +1 212 969 3286 +1 212 969 2900 rhirschhorn@proskauer.com
, , , , , , , Shawn Scott Ledingham, Jr. +1 310 284 5659 +1 310 557 2193 sledingham@proskauer.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Myron D Rumeld +1 212 969 3021 +1 212 969 2900 MRumeld@Proskauer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Steven O. Kramer +1 213 620 1780 +1 213 620 1398 skramer@sheppardmullin.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jonathan David Moss +1 213 620 1780 +1 213 620 1398 jmoss@sheppardmullin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1800

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , S. Ann Walls +1 312 870 6902 awalls@ahalelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Audrey Benison Hemesath +1 916 554 2729 +1 916 554 2886 audrey.hemesath@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by WATTS AND HERRING LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, M Stan Herring, Jr. +1 205 714 4443 +1 888 522 7167 stan@wattsherring.com
, John G Watts +1 205 879 2447 john@wattsherring.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Woodley & McGillivary

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Sara Lyn Faulman +1 202 833 8855 +1 202 452 1090 slf@wmlaborlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Gregory Keith McGillivary +1 202 833 8855 +1 202 452 1090 gkm@wmlaborlaw.com
No Logo N.C., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Vinson F. Carter +1 810 496 1025 +1 810 963 0458 vinsonecf.rcclawgroup@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Levy Konigsberg Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Corey M. Stern +1 212 605 6298 +1 212 605 6290 cstern@levylaw.com
, , , , , , Corey M. Stern +1 212 605 6298 +1 212 605 6290 cstern@levylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space N.C.
No Logo P.G., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levy Konigsberg Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Corey M. Stern +1 212 605 6298 +1 212 605 6290 cstern@levylaw.com
No Logo Sherron Paige, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levy Konigsberg Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Corey M. Stern +1 212 605 6298 +1 212 605 6290 cstern@levylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Levy Koningsberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Brendan E. Little +1 212 605 6282 blittle@levylaw.com
Space Renner Kincaid Walker +1 515 556 7125 rwalker@levylaw.com
v.
No Logo Atc Associates, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Lee Henig Elona +1 973 549 2520 lhenig-elona@gordonrees.com
De Blasio, Bill De Blasio, Bill, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bill De Blasio"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Norman H. Siegel +1 212 532 7586 +1 212 448 0066 siegelnorman@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Matthew Joseph Connahan, III +1 212 356 4078 +1 212 356 2089 mconnaha@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , Emily Stitelman +1 212 356 2011 +1 212 356 2019 estitelm@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Gabriel Herrmann +1 212 351 3974 +1 212 351 6251 gherrmann@gibsondunn.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , RANDY MICHAEL MASTRO +1 212 351 4000 +1 212 351 5219 rmastro@gibsondunn.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jim Walden +1 212 351 4000 +1 212 351 4035 jwalden@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Housing Authority

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Jeffrey Loperfido +1 212 356 2384 +1 212 356 3509 jloperfido@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Melanie Vogel Sadok +1 212 676 6051 +1 212 791 9714 msadok@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Mark W. Muschenheim +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 791 9714 mmuschen@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Max R. Sarinsky +1 212 356 4017 +1 212 356 2019 msarinsk@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard A. Bierschbach
No Logo City Of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Joshua Joseph Lax +1 212 442 6831 +1 212 788 9776 joshua_lax@hotmail.com
, , , Jorge M. Marquez-San Martin +1 787 525 8895 +1 212 356 3509 jorge.marquez.sm@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by 99 Park Avenue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Ryan Michael Cleary +1 212 286 8585 +1 212 490 8966 rcleary@hpmb.com
, , , , , , , , Austa Starr Devlin +1 212 286 8585 +1 212 490 8966 adevlin@hpmb.com
Space Tucker Christian Kramer +1 212 286 8585 +1 212 490 8966 tkramer@hpmb.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Daryl Paxson +1 914 522 2068 +1 914 949 1160 dpaxson@hpmb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman Senterfitt LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Jordan Michael Smith +1 212 880 3800 +1 212 880 8965 jordan.smith@akerman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Peter John Fogarty +1 212 356 3514 pfogarty@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Bilal Husain Haider +1 212 356 3549 +1 212 356 3509 bhaider@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Beth Jenifer Hoffman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Beth Jenifer Hoffman

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Dara Lynn Weiss +1 212 676 1307 +1 212 788 9776 DAWEISS@LAW.NYC.GOV

Toggle Switch Represented by Corporation Counsel Office City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Rhiana L. Swartz +1 212 356 2382 +1 212 356 3509 rswartz@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, P.C.(NY)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Joshua Adam Stein +1 212 351 4660 +1 212 878 8600 JStein@ebglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heidell Pittoni Murphy & Bach, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Alejandra Rosa Gil +1 914 559 3100 agil@hpmb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heidell, Pittoni, Murphy & Bach, LLP (WP)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Daniel Gerard May +1 212 471 4653 +1 212 490 8966 dmay@hpmb.com
, , , , , , , , Ana Maria Vizzo +1 212 471 4661 +1 212 883 7929 avizzo@hpmb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Joshua Mathew Friedman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Joshua Mathew Friedman

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Department Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Karl Joseph Ashanti +1 212 227 0414 +1 212 788 9776 kashanti@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Danielle Marie Dandrige +1 212 788 0889 +1 212 788 0877 Ddandrig@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , Brendan Michael Horan +1 212 356 1174 +1 212 356 4360 brhoran@law.nyc.gov
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur Gabriel Larkin, III +1 212 788 1599 +1 212 788 9776 alarkin@ahalelaw.com
, Elisa Lee +1 781 636 8967 +1 212 356 3582 ellee@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Gary Moy +1 212 356 3522 +1 212 788 9776 gmoy@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Daniel H. Oliner +1 212 356 2329 +1 212 256 3509 doliner@law.nyc.gov
, Rachel Amy Seligman +1 212 788 0784 +1 212 788 9776 rseligma@law.nyc.gov
, , , Scott Craig Silverman +1 212 356 2450 ssilverm@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alana Danielle Sisnett +1 909 633 1515 asisnett@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Depart. Office of the Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kerrin Ann Bowers +1 212 356 2473 +1 212 356 2089 kbowers@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , Evan F. Jaffe +1 212 356 2354 evjaffe@law.nyc.gov
, , Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Fayola Naila Alibey +1 212 356 2334 +1 212 356 3509 falibey@law.nyc.gov
, , , Joseph Anci +1 212 356 1106 +1 212 788 5650 janci@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Suzanne Emily Aribakan +1 212 232 1300 +1 212 232 1399 saribaka@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , Christopher Gregory Arko +1 212 788 0303 carko@law.nyc.gov
, , , Karl Joseph Ashanti +1 212 227 0414 +1 212 788 9776 kashanti@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Richard Bahrenburg +1 212 356 2338 +1 212 356 3509 rbahrenb@law.nyc.gov
, , , Elizabeth Barrett Bardauskis +1 212 356 3159 +1 212 356 3509 ebardaus@law.nyc.gov
, , , Nikki Lynn Barker +1 212 676 0992 nbarker@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , Zachary Russell Bergman +1 212 356 5051 zbergman@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Shira M. Blank +1 212 356 2475 +1 212 788 3770 sblank@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Cassandra Natasha Branch +1 212 356 4074 cbranch@law.nyc.gov
, , , Daniel Michael Braun +1 212 356 3548 +1 212 356 3509 dbraun@law.nyc.gov
, , , Cherie Nicole Brown +1 212 356 5054 chebrown@law.nyc.gov
, Kyle C. Bruno +1 732 674 3172 kbruno@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Evan Brustein +1 212 356 2651 +1 212 356 3509 ebrustei@law.nyc.gov
, , , Katherine Abigail Byrns +1 212 356 3549 +1 212 356 3509 kbyrns@law.nyc.gov
Space John Corbin Carter +1 212 356 2078 jocarter@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Johana Castro +1 212 788 0976 +1 212 788 9776 jcastro@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Colin M. Ceriello +1 212 356 5052 +1 212 356 3509 cceriell@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacqueline Carolina Chavez +1 212 356 1000 jchavez@law.nyc.gov
, , , Megan Patricia Conger +1 212 356 3504 +1 212 356 3509 mconger@law.nyc.gov
, , , David Allen Cooper +1 212 356 3535 +1 212 356 3509 dcooper@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Alexandra Corsi +1 212 788 1090 +1 212 788 9776 acorsi@law.nyc.gov
, , , Theresa Jeanine D'Andrea +1 212 356 3187 +1 212 356 3509 tdandrea@law.nyc.gov
, , , Elizabeth M. Daitz +1 212 788 0775 +1 212 788 9776 edaitz@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Elizabeth Carolyn Degori +1 212 356 3586 edegori@law.nyc.gov
, Carolyn Kay Depoian +1 212 442 1048 +1 212 788 9776 cdepoian@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTI Anthony Matthew Disenso +1 212 442 6618 +1 212 788 9776 adisenso@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Hannah Victoria Faddis +1 212 356 2486 +1 212 356 1148 hfaddis@law.nyc.gov
, , , Courtney Patrice Fain +1 212 356 1000 +1 212 356 1148 cfain@law.nyc.gov
, Kaitlin Elizabeth Fitzgibbon +1 212 356 5057 kfitzgib@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Michael Friel Fleming +1 212 356 2471 +1 212 788 3770 mfleming@law.nyc.gov
, , , Brian Christopher Francolla +1 212 788 0988 +1 212 788 9776 bfrancol@law.nyc.gov
, Philip Sebastian Frank +1 212 788 0893 +1 212 788 9776 pfrank@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N John L. Garcia +1 212 356 5053 +1 212 356 3509 johgarci@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Ashley Rebecca Garman +1 212 768 4900 +1 212 768 3629 agarman@law.nyc.gov
, Holly Rachel Gerstenfeld +1 212 788 0710 +1 212 788 0937 hgersten@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/20/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/20/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/20/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY Brachah Goykadosh +1 212 356 3523 +1 212 356 3509 bgoykado@law.nyc.gov
, , , Joseph Aaron Gutmann +1 212 356 2659 +1 212 356 3509 jgutmann@law.nyc.gov
Space John Paul Guyette +1 212 356 2455 +1 212 356 2089 jguyette@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Douglas William Heim +1 212 788 1298 +1 212 788 9776 dheim@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Maurice L Hudson +1 212 788 8684 +1 212 788 9776 mhudson@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Elissa Beth Jacobs +1 212 341 9892 +1 212 788 9776 ejacobs@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Paul Hasan Johnson +1 212 356 1000 +1 212 356 1148 pajohnso@law.nyc.gov
, Christopher Michael Katsimagles +1 609 558 7656 ckatsima@law.nyc.gov
, Melissa Kim +1 310 985 1524 mkim@law.nyc.gov
, , , Elizabeth Norris Krasnow +1 212 335 3997 +1 212 335 4390 krasnowe@dany.nyc.gov
, , , , , Ben Kuruvilla +1 212 788 6405 +1 212 788 9776 bkuruvil@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nelson Leese +1 212 356 4361 nleese@law.nyc.gov
, Ariel Shaun Lichterman +1 212 513 7927 +1 212 788 9776 alichter@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Jeffrey Loperfido +1 212 356 2384 +1 212 356 3509 jloperfido@law.nyc.gov
Space Andrew W Manoff +1 212 356 3283 amanoff@law.nyc.gov
, Paul Frederick Marks +1 212 788 0884 +1 212 788 8877 pmarks@law.nyc.gov
, , , Heather Marie Martone +1 212 356 1000 +1 212 356 1148 hmartone@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , Joseph Anthony Marutollo +1 212 788 1300 +1 212 788 0367 jmarutol@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , Max Oliver McCann +1 212 788 0861 +1 212 788 9776 mmccann@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joanne Maureen McLaren +1 212 801 3197 +1 212 801 6400 jmclaren@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , Linda Margareta Mindrutiu +1 212 788 1177 +1 212 788 9776 lmindrut@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alison Sue Mitchell +1 212 356 3514 amitchel@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Andrew Thomas Myerberg +1 212 788 0869 +1 212 788 9776 amyerber@law.nyc.gov
, Michael Nacchio +1 212 356 2726 mnacchio@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Kathleen Erin Naughton +1 212 788 9567 +1 212 788 9776 knaughto@law.nyc.gov
, , , Alexander Macrae Noble +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 356 3509 anoble@law.nyc.gov
, , , Daniel Louis Passeser +1 212 227 6339 +1 212 788 9776 dpassese@law.nyc.gov
Space Evan Michael Piercey +1 212 356 2428 epiercey@law.nyc.gov
, , , Lucienne Pierre +1 212 356 2415 +1 212 356 3509 lpierre@law.nyc.gov
Space Andrew James Rauchberg +1 212 788 0889 +1 212 788 0940 arauchbe@law.nyc.gov
Space Justin Warren Reiter +1 212 356 3580 jreiter@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Sean Robert Renaghan +1 212 356 2452 srenagha@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , Wilda Jacqueline Rodriguez +1 212 356 4361 +1 212 356 3508 wrodrigu@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Erin T. Ryan +1 212 365 5056 +1 212 356 3509 eryan@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Daniel G. Saavedra +1 212 356 0892 +1 212 356 3509 dsaavedr@law.nyc.gov
, , , Melanie Vogel Sadok +1 212 676 6051 +1 212 791 9714 msadok@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Suvarna S. Sampale +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 788 9776 ssampale@law.nyc.gov
, , , Nana Kwame Sarpong +1 212 356 0827 +1 212 356 3508 nsarpong@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Susan P. Scharfstein +1 212 227 4071 +1 212 788 9776 sscharfs@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , Omar Javed Siddiqi +1 212 356 2381 osiddiqi@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , Valerie Elizabeth Smith +1 212 356 2398 vsmith@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Melanie Mary Speight +1 212 788 0577 +1 212 788 9776 mspeight@law.nyc.gov
, , , Kathryn M Sprovieri +1 212 356 2383 +1 212 356 3509 ksprovie@law.nyc.gov
, Noreen M. Stackhouse +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 9776 nstackho@law.nyc.gov
, , , Matthew Stein +1 212 356 2105 +1 212 356 2105 mstein@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , Pernell Michael Telfort +1 212 341 2652 +1 212 788 3824 ptelfort@law.nyc.gov
, Kavin Suresh Thadani +1 212 356 2351 +1 212 356 3509 kthadani@law.nyc.gov
, Omar Hani Tuffaha +1 212 356 0896 +1 212 788 0877 otuffaha@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , Melissa Wachs +1 718 222 2332 +1 718 802 2540 mwachs@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Jane Weall +1 212 356 1000 +1 212 356 3509 kweall@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua Alan Weiner +1 212 356 1000 +1 212 356 1148 jweiner@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Angharad Wilson +1 212 356 2572 awilson@law.nyc.gov
, Lamar DeVaughn Winslow +1 212 356 2579 +1 212 356 3558 lwinslow@law.nyc.gov
, , , Christopher John Yee Coyne +1 212 356 1180 +1 212 356 2089 ccoyne@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph P. Zangrilli +1 212 356 2657 +1 212 356 1148 jzangril@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Law Dept.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Issac Klepfish +1 212 788 0897 +1 212 788 8000 iklepfis@law.NYC.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Ryan Glenn Shaffer +1 212 788 1041 +1 212 788 9776 rshaffer@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Shlomit Aroubas +1 212 442 2715 +1 212 788 9776 saroubas@law.nyc.gov
, Tanya N Blocker +1 212 356 3177 +1 212 780 3770 tblocker@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephanie Marie Breslow +1 212 788 1575 +1 212 788 9776 sbreslow@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , Matthew Bridge +1 212 356 2347 +1 212 356 3509 mbridge@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , Peter William Brocker +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 356 3509 pbrocker@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , Elizabeth Colette Connelly +1 212 356 2547 +1 212 356 1148 econnell@law.nyc.gov
, , , Tavish Coryell Deatley +1 212 356 2409 tdeatley@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , Maria Fernanda DeCastro +1 212 356 2658 +1 212 356 3509 mdecastr@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , Eviana Linnea Frances Englert +1 212 356 5055 eenglert@law.nyc.gov
, , , Aimee Kara Lulich +1 212 788 0725 +1 212 788 9776 alulich@law.nyc.gov
, Matthew William McQueen +1 212 356 2423 +1 212 356 3509 mmcqueen@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Suzanna Publicker Mettham +1 212 788 1103 +1 212 788 9776 smettham@law.nyc.gov
, , Okwede N Okoh +1 212 356 3271 +1 212 788 9776 ookoh@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Alan Howard Scheiner +1 212 788 0600 +1 212 788 0367 ascheine@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark David Zuckerman +1 212 442 8248 +1 212 788 9776 mzuckerm@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , William Keaupuni Akina +1 212 356 2377 +1 212 356 3509 wakina@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO B Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kristen Monet McIntosh +1 212 356 2394 +1 212 356 3582 kmcintos@law.nyc.gov
, Mark W. Muschenheim +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 791 9714 mmuschen@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Andrea Mary O'Connor +1 212 676 2750 +1 212 788 8877 aoconnor@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , Kathleen Deborah Reilly +1 212 356 2663 +1 212 356 2663 kareilly@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Max R. Sarinsky +1 212 356 4017 +1 212 356 2019 msarinsk@law.nyc.gov
, Qiana Charmaine Smith +1 212 788 1588 +1 212 788 9776 qwilliam@law.nyc.gov
, , , Emily Stitelman +1 212 356 2011 +1 212 356 2019 estitelm@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Office of Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , David Ferrari +1 212 356 5058 dferrari@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Keith Gertzer +1 212 788 0786 +1 212 788 9776 mgertzer@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur Gabriel Larkin, III +1 212 788 1599 +1 212 788 9776 alarkin@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Brian Guenther Maxey +1 212 788 0987 +1 212 788 9776 bmaxey@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Corporation Counsel NYC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Jeffrey Scott Dantowitz +1 212 788 0939 +1 212 788 8877 jdantowi@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Marie Savino +1 212 788 0987 +1 212 788 9776 ksavino@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Elissa Paulette Fudim +1 212 356 2425 +1 212 356 1148 efudim@law.nyc.gov
, Aviva Yocheved Horowitz +1 917 868 1122 ahorowit@law.nyc.gov
, , , Sumit Sud +1 212 788 1096 +1 212 788 0367 ssud@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The Corporation Counsel, Nyc Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Amatullah Khaliha Booth +1 212 356 3534 +1 212 356 3509 abooth@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/03/2017, TERMINATED: 01/03/2017, TERMINATED: 01/03/2017 Amanda Shoffel +1 212 416 8576 +1 212 416 6009

Toggle Switch Represented by Philip Rudolph DePaul

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Philip Rudolph DePaul

Toggle Switch Represented by Sadis & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Jennifer Amy Rossan +1 212 788 0867 +1 212 788 9776 jrossan@sglawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tzipora Esther Teichman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tzipora Esther Teichman
No Logo Hermina Polacio, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Mark W. Muschenheim +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 791 9714 mmuschen@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Max R. Sarinsky +1 212 356 4017 +1 212 356 2019 msarinsk@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Maria Torres-Springer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Mark W. Muschenheim +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 791 9714 mmuschen@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Max R. Sarinsky +1 212 356 4017 +1 212 356 2019 msarinsk@law.nyc.gov
No Logo New York City Housing Authority, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alan D. Aviles

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Joan Pannell

Toggle Switch Represented by Armienti, DeBellis & Whiten, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Silvana DeBellis +1 212 809 7074 +1 212 809 7713 sdebellis@adwlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jeffrey Marc Niederhoffer +1 212 776 5259 +1 212 776 5404 niederhj@nycha.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Herzfeld & Rubin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , PETER J. KURSHAN +1 973 535 8840 pkurshan@chaselawnj.com
, , , , , Wendy L. Prince +1 212 471 8458 wprince@herzfeld-rubin.com
, , , , , Miriam Skolnik +1 212 471 8500 mskolnik@herzfeld-rubin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , John A. Snyder, II +1 212 545 4054
, Laura Mccabe Bedson +1 212 545 4016 laura.bedson@jacksonlewis.com
Space Felice Barbara Ekelman +1 212 545 4005 +1 212 972 3213 ekelmanf@jacksonlewis.com
, , Matthew A. Steinberg +1 212 545 4091 +1 212 972 3213 matthew.steinberg@akerman.com
, , Jason Alan Zoldessy +1 212 545 4021 +1 212 972 3213 zoldessj@jacksonlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Department Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna Murphy +1 212 776 5244 +1 212 776 5404 donna.murphy@nycha.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Housing Authority

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Adam W. Eagle +1 212 776 5255
, , , Tonya Jenerette +1 212 788 0993 +1 212 788 0367 tjeneret@law.nyc.gov
, Kathleen Marie Kilduff +1 212 788 0893 +1 212 788 9776 kkilduff@law.nyc.gov
, , , Jane Elizabeth Lippman +1 212 776 5259 jane.lippman@nycha.nyc.gov
, , Donna Marie Murphy +1 212 776 5244 +1 212 776 5404 murphyd@nycha.nyc.gov
, Steven Jay Rappaport +1 212 776 5152 +1 212 776 5401 rappapos@nycha.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Jon Lawless +1 212 490 3000 +1 212 490 3038 patrick.lawless@wilsonelser.com
, Richard E. Lerner +1 212 490 3000 +1 212 490 3038 lernerr@wemed.com
No Logo Shola Olatoye, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Herzfeld & Rubin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , PETER J. KURSHAN +1 973 535 8840 pkurshan@chaselawnj.com
, , , , , Wendy L. Prince +1 212 471 8458 wprince@herzfeld-rubin.com
, , , , , Miriam Skolnik +1 212 471 8500 mskolnik@herzfeld-rubin.com
No Logo Alicia Glenn, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Mark W. Muschenheim +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 791 9714 mmuschen@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Max R. Sarinsky +1 212 356 4017 +1 212 356 2019 msarinsk@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Evelyn Gray, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Levy Konigsberg Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Corey M. Stern +1 212 605 6298 +1 212 605 6290 cstern@levylaw.com
No Logo Jay Krantz, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Herzfeld & Rubin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , PETER J. KURSHAN +1 973 535 8840 pkurshan@chaselawnj.com
, , , , , Wendy L. Prince +1 212 471 8458 wprince@herzfeld-rubin.com
, , , , , Miriam Skolnik +1 212 471 8500 mskolnik@herzfeld-rubin.com
No Logo Mary Travis Bassett, M.D., Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Mark W. Muschenheim +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 791 9714 mmuschen@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Max R. Sarinsky +1 212 356 4017 +1 212 356 2019 msarinsk@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Taneequa Carrington, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Levy Konigsberg Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Corey M. Stern +1 212 605 6298 +1 212 605 6290 cstern@levylaw.com
No Logo ATC Group Services, LLC, Cross Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Lee Henig Elona +1 973 549 2520 lhenig-elona@gordonrees.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (264) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None Transcript
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 9/21/2019, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Letter
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Quash
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Proposed Consent Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Proposed Consent Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Quash
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Conference
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Crossclaim
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Report
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Crossclaim
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  OPINION & ORDER re: 199 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs' procedural due process, substantive due p rocess, and First Amendment claims are dismissed. Plaintiffs' claims under the FHA and RLPHRA remain, but the RLPHRA claims brought by Evelyn Gray and K.D. are dismissed. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 199. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 8/14/2018) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Internet Citation
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Miriam Skolnik dated March 19, 2018. Document filed by Brian Clarke, Michael Kelly, Jay Krantz, New York City Housing Authority, Shola Olatoye, Luis Ponce.(Skolnik, Miriam) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 178 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Mark Muschenheim dated 3/16/18. Document filed by Mary Travis Bassett, M.D., City Of New York, Bill De Blasio, Alicia Glenn, Hermina Polacio, Maria Torres-Springer.(Sarinsky, Max) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 186 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: Application granted. The pre-motion conference scheduled for March 23, 2018 is adjourned to March 28, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 3/28/2018 at 01:00 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/13/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for March 23, 2018 addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Mark W. Muschenheim dated March 12, 2018. Document filed by Mary Travis Bassett, M.D., City Of New York, Bill De Blasio, Alicia Glenn, Hermina Polacio, Maria Torres-Springer.(Muschenheim, Mark) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 181 Letter Motion for Conference; granting 182 Letter Motion for Conference. Application granted. The parties shall appear for a pre-motion conference to discuss NYCHA and the City's anticipated motions on March 23, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel for ATC shall also attend. Pre-Motion Conference set for 3/23/2018 at 02:00 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/9/2018) (mro) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  OPINION & ORDER re: 164 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Sherron Paige, A.P. The bureaucratic malfeasance described in this lawsuit is appalling. NYCHA's numerous problems are well-documented, and this case offers a paradigm of the agency's abject failure to ensure the safety and well-being of its tenants. While this Court appreciates the compelling societal interest in protecting children, it cannot impose such an extraordinary remedy without assuring itself that a federal claim lies here. Plaintiffs acknowledge that their claims are novel. And the Municipal Defendants maintain that when those claims are distilled, they sound in breach of contract and personal injury, matters suited for resolution in state court. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction and the appointment of an independent monitor is denied at this time. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 164. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/9/2018) (mro) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Brendan Little dated March 6, 2018 re: Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by A.P., Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.).(Little, Brendan) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 163 Amended Complaint,,, addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Mark W. Muschenheim dated February 27, 2018. Document filed by Mary Travis Bassett, M.D., City Of New York, Bill De Blasio, Alicia Glenn, Hermina Polacio, Maria Torres-Springer.(Muschenheim, Mark) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 163 Amended Complaint,,, addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Miriam Skolnik dated February 27, 2018. Document filed by Brian Clarke, Michael Kelly, Jay Krantz, New York City Housing Authority, Shola Olatoye, Luis Ponce.(Skolnik, Miriam) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 179 Motion for Renner Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/27/2018) (rjm) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Renner Kincaid Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Renner Walker, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (Iowa), # 4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (California Supreme Court))(Walker, Renner) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 163 Amended Complaint,,,., CROSSCLAIM against All Parties. Document filed by ATC Group Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 cert of service)(Henig-Elona, Lee) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ATC Group Services, LLC.(Henig-Elona, Lee) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 164 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by A.P., Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Little, Brendan) (Entered: 02/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/31/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/31/2018 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/22/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Miriam Skolnik in Opposition re: 164 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Brian Clarke, Michael Kelly, Jay Krantz, New York City Housing Authority, Shola Olatoye, Luis Ponce. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Skolnik, Miriam) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 164 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Brian Clarke, Michael Kelly, Jay Krantz, New York City Housing Authority, Shola Olatoye, Luis Ponce. (Skolnik, Miriam) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 164 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by New York City Housing Authority. (Skolnik, Miriam) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Miriam Skolnik in Opposition re: 164 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by New York City Housing Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Memorandum of Law)(Skolnik, Miriam) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 164 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Mary Travis Bassett, M.D., City Of New York, Bill De Blasio, Alicia Glenn, Hermina Polacio, Maria Torres-Springer. (Muschenheim, Mark) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Renner Kincaid Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14718681. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Renner Walker, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit California Certificate of Good Standing, # 4 Exhibit Iowa Certificate of Good Standing)(Walker, Renner) Modified on 2/20/2018 (ma). (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/16/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/16/2018 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/28/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 164 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by A.P., Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CDC Report, # 2 Exhibit NYCHA Fact Sheet, # 3 Exhibit DOI Report, # 4 Exhibit NYCHA DOH Public Press Release, # 5 Exhibit Civil Investigative Demand, # 6 Exhibit Order on Civil Investigative Demand, # 7 Exhibit Committee Report on Public Housing, # 8 Exhibit Transcript from Public Hearing on Public Housing, # 9 Exhibit Sherron Paige Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Evelyn Gray Declaration, # 11 Exhibit Taneequa Carrington Declaration, # 12 Exhibit A.P. Declaration, # 13 Exhibit NYCHA Statement & City Re Free Lead Testing, # 14 Exhibit NYC Annual Lead Paint Report)(Stern, Corey) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by A.P., Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.).(Stern, Corey) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 5 Complaint, 84 Amended Complaint,,, against ATC Associates, Inc., ATC Group Services, LLC, Mary Travis Bassett, M.D., City Of New York, Brian Clarke, Bill De Blasio, Alicia Glenn, Michael Kelly, Jay Krantz, New York City Housing Authority, Shola Olatoye, Hermina Polacio, Luis Ponce, Maria Torres-Springer with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.), A.P.. Related document: 5 Complaint, 84 Amended Complaint,,,.(Stern, Corey) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Jay Kurshan on behalf of Brian Clarke, Michael Kelly, Jay Krantz, Luis Ponce. (Kurshan, Peter) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Miriam Skolnik on behalf of Brian Clarke. (Skolnik, Miriam) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wendy L. Prince on behalf of Brian Clarke. (Prince, Wendy) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Miriam Skolnik on behalf of Jay Krantz, Luis Ponce. (Skolnik, Miriam) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wendy L. Prince on behalf of Michael Kelly, Jay Krantz, Luis Ponce. (Prince, Wendy) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 155 Letter, filed by N.C., Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene, Sherron Paige, P.G. ENDORSEMENT: In light of Plaintiffs' response letter, the parties shall appear for a conference on January 31, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. (Status Conference set for 1/31/2018 at 03:00 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/30/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 153 Letter filed by N.C., Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene, Sherron Paige, P.G. ENDORSEMENT: This Court already fixed a briefing schedule on Plaintiffs' proposed motion for a preliminary injunction. After consideration of Plaintiffs' letter and NYCHA's response, this Court declines to shorten it. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/26/2018) (mro) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Corey M. Stern dated January 26, 2018 re: Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant NYCHA's Response to request for conference/relief. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.).(Stern, Corey) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Miriam Skolnik dated January 26, 2018 Document filed by New York City Housing Authority, Shola Olatoye.(Skolnik, Miriam) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Corey M. Stern dated 1/26/18 re: request for a temporary restraining order. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.).(Stern, Corey) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,. Jay Krantz served on 1/16/2018, answer due 2/6/2018. Service was accepted by C. Stokes. Document filed by Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); N.C.; Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.); Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.); Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.); Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.); P.G.; Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,. Luis Ponce served on 1/16/2018, answer due 2/6/2018. Service was accepted by C. Stokes. Document filed by Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); N.C.; Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.); Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.); Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.); Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.); P.G.; Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,. Brian Clarke served on 1/16/2018, answer due 2/6/2018. Service was accepted by C. Stokes. Document filed by Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); N.C.; Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.); Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.); Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.); Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.); P.G.; Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lee Henig-Elona on behalf of ATC Associates, Inc., ATC Group Services, LLC. (Henig-Elona, Lee) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties having appeared for a status conference on January 16, 2018, this Court adopts the following schedule: 1. Plaintiffs shall file any Second Amended Complaint by February 6, 2018. 2. Plaintiffs shall file any motion for a preliminary injunction, with a statement providing the basis for this Courts jurisdiction, by February 6, 2018. 3. Defendants shall file any opposition papers by February 20, 2018. 4. Plaintiffs' shall file any reply brief by February 24, 2018. 5. Defendants shall file any response to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by February 27, 2018. 6. The parties shall appear for oral argument on February 28, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. Amended Pleadings due by 2/6/2018. Motions due by 2/6/2018. Responses due by 2/20/2018 Replies due by 2/24/2018. Oral Argument set for 2/28/2018 at 05:00 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/16/2018) (mro) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/16/2018) (kgo) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Confidentiality . Document filed by New York City Housing Authority, Shola Olatoye.(Skolnik, Miriam) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,. ATC Group Services, LLC served on 1/5/2018, answer due 1/26/2018. Service was accepted by Sheri Griffin. Document filed by Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); N.C.; Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.); Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.); Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.); Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.); P.G.; Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,. ATC Associates, Inc. served on 1/5/2018, answer due 1/26/2018. Service was accepted by Sheri Griffin. Document filed by Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); N.C.; Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.); Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.); Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.); Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.); P.G.; Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Michael Kelly waiver sent on 1/15/2018, answer due 3/16/2018. Document filed by Michael Kelly. (Skolnik, Miriam) (Entered: 01/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Miriam Skolnik on behalf of Michael Kelly. (Skolnik, Miriam) (Entered: 01/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: The status conference scheduled for January 16, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. is rescheduled to January 16, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 1/16/2018 at 04:00 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/12/2018) (ama) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Corey M. Stern dated January 12, 2018 re: 129 LETTER MOTION for Conference on City Defendants' Anticipated Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Mark W. Muschenheim dated January 10, 2018. . Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Corey M. Stern dated January 11, 2018 re: 128 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Miriam Skolnik dated January 10, 2018. . Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Corey M. Stern dated January 11, 2018 re: 127 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Miriam Skolnik dated January 10, 2018. . Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Maria Torres-Springer waiver sent on 1/3/2018, answer due 3/5/2018. Document filed by Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.); Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.); Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.); Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.); Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Hermina Polacio waiver sent on 1/3/2018, answer due 3/5/2018. Document filed by Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.); Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.); Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.); Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.); Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Michael Kelly waiver sent on 1/3/2018, answer due 3/5/2018. Document filed by Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.); Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.); Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.); Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.); Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Alicia Glenn waiver sent on 1/3/2018, answer due 3/5/2018. Document filed by Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.); Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.); Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.); Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.); Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Mary Travis Bassett, M.D. waiver sent on 1/3/2018, answer due 3/5/2018. Document filed by Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.); Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.); Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.); Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.); Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Max R. Sarinsky on behalf of Mary Travis Bassett, M.D., City Of New York, Bill De Blasio, Alicia Glenn, Hermina Polacio, Maria Torres-Springer. (Sarinsky, Max) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The parties' pre-motion conference letters pending at ECF Nos. 12730 will be addressed at the status conference scheduled for January 16, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/11/2018) (ap) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SECOND LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 35 Order,, Regarding Lead-Based Paint Inspections and Request for Emergent Relief addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Corey M. Stern dated January 10, 2018. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.).(Stern, Corey) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Conference on City Defendants' Anticipated Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Mark W. Muschenheim dated January 10, 2018. Document filed by Mary Travis Bassett, M.D., City Of New York, Bill De Blasio, Alicia Glenn, Hermina Polacio, Maria Torres-Springer.(Muschenheim, Mark) Modified on 3/14/2018 (ldi). (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Miriam Skolnik dated January 10, 2018. Document filed by New York City Housing Authority, Shola Olatoye.(Skolnik, Miriam) Modified on 3/14/2018 (ldi). (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Miriam Skolnik dated January 10, 2018. Document filed by New York City Housing Authority, Shola Olatoye.(Skolnik, Miriam) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/18/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/18/2017 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/24/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/3/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alicia Glenn. (pc) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ATC Group Services, LLC. (pc) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jay Krantz. (pc) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Luis Ponce. (pc) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mary Travis Bassett, M.D.. (pc) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maria Torres-Springer. (pc) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brian Clarke. (pc) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Kelly. (pc) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hermina Polacio. (pc) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ATC Associates, Inc.. (pc) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MICHAEL KELLY, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MARIA TORRES-SPRINGER, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LUIS PONCE, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JAY KRANTZ, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HERMINA POLACIO, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BRIAN CLARKE, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MARY TRAVIS BASSETT, M.D., re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ATC GROUP SERVICES, LLC, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ATC ASSOCIATES, INC., re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALICIA GLENN, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MICHAEL KELLY, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/28/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MARIA SPRINGER, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/28/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LUIS PONCE, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/28/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JAY KRANTZ, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/28/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HERMINIA POLACIO, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/28/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BRIAN CLARKE, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/28/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MARY TRAVIS BASSETT, M.D., re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/28/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ATC GROUP SERVICES, LLC, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/28/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ATC ASSOCIATES, INC., re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/28/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALICIA GLENN, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(Individually; on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/28/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Kelly, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/26/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MARIA SPRINGER, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/26/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LUIS PONCE, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/26/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JAY KRANTZ, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/26/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HERMINIA POLACIO, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/26/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BRIAN CLARKE, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/26/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MARY TRAVIS BASSETT, M.D., re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/26/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ATC GROUP SERVICES, LLC, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/26/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ATC ASSOCIATES, INC., re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/26/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALICIA GLENN, re: 84 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/26/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 73 Amended Complaint,,, against ATC Associates, Inc., ATC Group Services, LLC, Mary Travis Bassett, M.D., City Of New York, Brian Clarke, Bill De Blasio, Alicia Glenn, Michael Kelly, Jay Krantz, New York City Housing Authority, Shola Olatoye, Hermina Polacio, Luis Ponce, Maria Torres-Springer with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Evelyn Gray, Taneequa Carrington(on behalf of her minor child N.C.), Sherron Paige(individually), Evelyn Gray(on behalf of her minor child P.G.), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.), Taneequa Carrington. Related document: 73 Amended Complaint,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulation)(Stern, Corey) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to MICHAEL KELLY, re: 73 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.)., REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MICHAEL KELLY, re: 73 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/22/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MARIA SPRINGER, re: 73 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/22/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LUIS PONCE, re: 73 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/22/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JAY KRANTZ, re: 73 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/22/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HERMINIA POLACIO, re: 73 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/22/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BRIAN CLARKE, re: 73 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/22/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MARY TRAVIS BASSETT, M.D., re: 73 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/22/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ATC GROUP SERVICES, LLC, re: 73 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/22/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ATC ASSOCIATES, INC., re: 73 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/22/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALICIA GLENN, re: 73 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/22/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 48 Amended Complaint,, against ATC Associates, Inc., ATC Group Services, LLC, Mary Travis Bassett, M.D., City Of New York, Brian Clarke, Bill De Blasio, Alicia Glenn, Michael Kelly, Jay Krantz, New York City Housing Authority, Shola Olatoye, Hermina Polacio, Luis Ponce, Maria Torres-Springer with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Evelyn Gray, N.C., Sherron Paige(individually), Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.), P.G., Taneequa Carrington. Related document: 48 Amended Complaint,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulation)(Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/22/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Kelly, re: 48 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/21/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maria Springer, re: 48 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/21/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LUIS PONCE, re: 48 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/21/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JAY KRANTZ, re: 48 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/21/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HERMINIA POLACIO, re: 48 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/21/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BRIAN CLARKE, re: 48 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/21/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MARY TRAVIS BASSETT, M.D., re: 48 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/21/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ATC GROUP SERVICES, LLC, re: 48 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/21/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ATC ASSOCIATES, INC., re: 48 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/21/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALICIA GLENN, re: 48 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/21/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: 48 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.).(Stern, Corey) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/30/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/30/2017 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALICIA GLENN, re: 48 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/20/2017 (vf). (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ATC ASSOCIATES, INC., re: 48 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/20/2017 (vf). (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ATC GROUP SERVICES, LLC, re: 48 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/20/2017 (vf). (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MARY TRAVIS BASSETT, M.D., re: 48 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/20/2017 (vf). (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BRIAN CLARKE, re: 48 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/20/2017 (vf). (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HERMINIA POLACIO, re: 48 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/20/2017 (vf). (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JAY KRANTZ, re: 48 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/20/2017 (vf). (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LUIS PONCE, re: 48 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/20/2017 (vf). (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MARIA SPRINGER, re: 48 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/20/2017 (vf). (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MICHAEL KELLY, re: 48 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Taneequa Carrington, Evelyn Gray, Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), N.C., P.G., Sherron Paige(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.). (Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/20/2017 (vf). (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties having appeared for an initial pre-trial conference on December 18, 2017, this Court adopts the following schedule: 1. Defendants shall produce the reports generated at the lead paint inspections that Plaintiffs' expert attended by December 22, 2017. 2. Plaintiffs shall produce any expert report created and photographs taken by their expert by January 5, 2018. 3. Any Defendant wishing to move to dismiss shall file a letter providing the basis for such a motion by close of business on January 10, 2018. 4. Plaintiffs shall file any reply by close of business on January 12, 2018. 5. The parties shall appear for a status conference on January 16, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. (Status Conference set for 1/16/2018 at 05:00 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/18/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 5 Complaint, against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), Sherron Paige(individually), Evelyn Gray, N.C., P.G., Taneequa Carrington. Related document: 5 Complaint,.(Stern, Corey) Modified on 12/18/2017 (sj). Modified on 12/21/2017 (pc). Modified on 12/21/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 45 Letter, filed by New York City Housing Authority, Shola Olatoye. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The Defendants' proffered motions for a stay (ECF No. 45 and 46) will be addressed at the initial pre-trial conference on December 18, 2017. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/14/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Mark W. Muschenheim dated December 13, 2017 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference on City Defendants' Anticipated Motion to Stay Discovery. Document filed by City Of New York, Bill De Blasio.(Muschenheim, Mark) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        THIRD LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Peter J. Kurshan, Esq. dated December 12, 2017 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference and leave to file a motion for a stay of discovery. Document filed by New York City Housing Authority, Shola Olatoye.(Kurshan, Peter) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNECE proceeding held on 11/30/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/30/2017 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/11/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/12/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.), Sherron Paige(individually).(Stern, Corey) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 37 Letter Motion for Conference ; granting 38 Letter Motion for Conference. Application granted. This Court will address the arguments raised in both NYCHS's and the City Defendants' letters at the initial pre-trial conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/6/2017) (anc) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Corey M. Stern dated 12/6/2017 re: response to defendants request for a pre-motion conference. Document filed by Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.), Sherron Paige(individually).(Stern, Corey) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: At a teleconference with the parties on December 4, 2017, this Court ordered that Plaintiffs' expert(s) may take photographs in connection with their observation of lead paint inspections by Defendant New York City Housing Authority. However, Plaintiffs' expert(s) may not photograph the inspectors themselves or any other persons present in the apartments. Plaintiffs' counsel are directed to provide copies of the photographs to Defendants and both parties are directed to maintain those photographs confidentially subject to further order of this Court. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/4/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Conference on City Defendants' anticipated Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Mark W. Muschenheim dated December 4, 2017. Document filed by City Of New York, Bill De Blasio.(Muschenheim, Mark) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SECOND LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Miriam Skolnik dated December 4, 2017. Document filed by New York City Housing Authority, Shola Olatoye.(Skolnik, Miriam) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Expert Designation. Document filed by Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), Sherron Paige(individually). (Little, Brendan) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Following a conference on the record in open court, this Court orders Plaintiffs to designate an expert(s) to observe lead paint inspections of eight apartments during Defendant New York City Housing Authority's current round of inspections on December 4 and/or 5, 2017. Defendant New York City Housing Authority is directed to provide the lead paint inspection schedule for December 4 and 5, 2017 to Plaintiffs' counsel and permit Plaintiffs' expert(s) to accompany ATC Inspectors on eight lead paint inspections of Plaintiffs' choosing. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/30/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 30 Letter Motion to Expedite; granting 30 Letter Motion for Conference: Application granted. The parties shall appear for a conference in Courtroom 20B on November 30, 2017 at 2:15 p.m.(Status Conference set for 11/30/2017 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/28/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Miriam Skolnik dated November 28, 2017 re: Paige v. NYCHA, et al. Document filed by New York City Housing Authority, Shola Olatoye.(Prince, Wendy) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brendan E. Little on behalf of Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.), Sherron Paige(individually). (Little, Brendan) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wendy L. Prince on behalf of New York City Housing Authority, Shola Olatoye. (Prince, Wendy) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION to Expedite addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Corey M. Stern dated 11/27/17., FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Inspections and Discovery addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Corey M. Stern dated 11/27/17. Document filed by Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.), Jahlisa Greene(individually), Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.), Sherron Paige(individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit NYCHA Inspection Document)(Stern, Corey) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 28 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: Application granted. The initial pre-trial conference scheduled for December 14, 2017 is adjourned to December 18, 2017 at 2:30 p.m. (Initial Conference set for 12/18/2017 at 02:30 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/27/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference on December 14, 2017 addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Mark W. Muschenheim dated November 22, 2017. Document filed by City Of New York, Bill De Blasio.(Muschenheim, Mark) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Miriam Skolnik on behalf of Shola Olatoye. (Skolnik, Miriam) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Miriam Skolnik on behalf of New York City Housing Authority. (Skolnik, Miriam) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 23 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Application granted. The City Defendants shall respond to the complaint by December 4, 2017. (City Of New York answer due 12/4/2017; Bill De Blasio answer due 12/4/2017.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/17/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Application granted. The Movant Defendants shall respond to the complaint by December 4, 2017. (New York City Housing Authority answer due 12/4/2017; Shola Olatoye answer due 12/4/2017.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/17/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 5 Complaint, addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Mark W. Muschenheim dated October 17, 2017. Document filed by City Of New York, Bill De Blasio.(Muschenheim, Mark) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 19 Affidavit of Service Complaints, 11 Summons Issued, 7 Request for Issuance of Summons, 13 Summons Issued, 5 Complaint, 9 Request for Issuance of Summons, 16 Affidavit of Service Complaints, addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Peter J. Kurshan, Esq. dated October 17, 2017. Document filed by New York City Housing Authority, Shola Olatoye.(Kurshan, Peter) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Jay Kurshan on behalf of New York City Housing Authority, Shola Olatoye. (Kurshan, Peter) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark W. Muschenheim on behalf of City Of New York, Bill De Blasio. (Muschenheim, Mark) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Shola Olatoye served on 10/3/2017, answer due 10/24/2017. Service was accepted by J. Brown, Clerk. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Sherron Paige(individually); Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.); Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.); Jahlisa Greene(individually). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/14/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge William H. Pauley III, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/11/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. City Of New York served on 10/3/2017, answer due 10/24/2017. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck, Clerk. Document filed by Sherron Paige(individually); Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.); Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.); Jahlisa Greene(individually). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. New York City Housing Authority served on 10/3/2017, answer due 10/24/2017. Service was accepted by REFUSED FULL NAME, Clerk. Document filed by Sherron Paige(individually); Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.); Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.); Jahlisa Greene(individually). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Bill De Blasio served on 10/3/2017, answer due 10/24/2017. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck, Clerk. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Sherron Paige(individually); Jahlisa Greene(on behalf of her minor child J.W.); Sherron Paige(on behalf of her minor child K.D.); Jahlisa Greene(individually). (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bill De Blasio. (sj) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shola Olatoye. (sj) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York. (sj) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Housing Authority. (sj) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BILL DE BLASIO, re: 5 Complaint,. Document filed by Bill De Blasio. (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SHOLA OLATOYE, re: 5 Complaint,. Document filed by Shola Olatoye. (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE CITY OF NEW YORK, re: 5 Complaint,. Document filed by CITY OF NEW YORK. (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEW YORK CITY HOUSING AUTHORITY, re: 5 Complaint,. Document filed by New York City Housing Authority. (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against CITY OF NEW YORK, Bill De Blasio, New York City Housing Authority, Shola Olatoye. Document filed by Sherron Paige, J.W., Jahlisa Greene, K.D.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Class Complaint NYCHA Lead Paint Facts)(Stern, Corey) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Corrected Civil Cover Sheet re: 2 Civil Cover Sheet. Document filed by Jahlisa Greene, J.W., K.D., Sherron Paige. (Stern, Corey) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Corrected Original Complaint re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Jahlisa Greene, J.W., K.D., Sherron Paige. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Class Complaint)(Stern, Corey) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Stern, Corey) Modified on 10/2/2017 (sj). (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING COMPLAINT against Sherron Paige, J.W., Jahlisa Greene, K.D.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14190044)Document filed by Sherron Paige, J.W., Jahlisa Greene, K.D.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Class Complaint)(Stern, Corey) Modified on 10/2/2017 (sj). (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 37 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?